Anthony Fails v. Secretary, Florida Department
Respondent / Appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner / Appellant: ANTHONY J. FAILS
Case Number: 19-12235
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED: A motion submitted by Anthony J. Fails is returned unfiled because the appeal is closed. [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:39 PM]
August 5, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Anthony J. Fails has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:05 AM]
August 2, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections [19-12235] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:37 PM]
July 19, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Anthony J. Fails. [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:06 PM]
July 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Howland Duffy for Secretary [19-12235] (ECF: Thomas Duffy) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:54 PM]
June 24, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Anthony J. Fails. [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:35 PM]
June 11, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Anthony J. Fails on 06/10/2019 Appellant brief due 40 days from 06/11/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Fails v. Secretary, Florida Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Ashley Moody
Represented By: Thomas Howland Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANTHONY J. FAILS
Represented By: Anthony J. Fails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?