Jesus Gutierrez-Rios v. USA
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner / Appellant: JESUS GUTIERREZ-RIOS
Case Number: 19-12238
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jesus Gutierrez-Rios. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8832131-1] [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:05 PM]
July 3, 2019 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Jesus Gutierrez-Rios was filed on 06/28/2019. Docket Entry 90. [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:58 AM]
July 1, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Noah Ross Schechtman for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12238] (ECF: Noah Schechtman) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:22 AM]
June 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Schechtman for USA [19-12238] (ECF: Noah Schechtman) [Entered: 06/28/2019 08:42 AM]
June 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Jesus Gutierrez-Rios. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:17 PM]
June 20, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jesus Gutierrez-Rios. [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:16 PM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for USA [19-12238] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:06 AM]
June 11, 2019 USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Jesus Gutierrez-Rios was filed on 03/04/2019. Docket Entry 80. [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:37 PM]
June 11, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jesus Gutierrez-Rios on 06/03/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Gutierrez-Rios v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
Represented By: Noah Ross Schechtman
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth McBath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JESUS GUTIERREZ-RIOS
Represented By: Jesus Gutierrez-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?