Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Arthur Roebuck, III, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PATRICIA R. SWINDLE, Trustee, d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza, LESLIE J. FRYE, II, RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza, ARTHUR R. ROEBUCK, III and SCRIBE ENTERPRISES, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza
Plaintiff / Appellant: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-12257
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 12, 2020 Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Arthur R. Roebuck, III, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael C. Foster for Appellees Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 07/09/2019 05:07 PM]
June 27, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicola Gelormino for Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Patricia R. Swindle TRS, Riviera Trading & Marketing and Scribe Enterprises,Inc. [19-12257] (ECF: Nicola Gelormino) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:13 AM]
June 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael C. Foster for Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:19 PM]
June 14, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:06 PM]
June 14, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:33 PM]
June 14, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:29 PM]
June 14, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:51 PM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carol M. Rooney for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:49 PM]
June 13, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 06/12/2019 as to Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:22 PM]
June 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company on 06/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/26/2019 as to Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/10/2019 as to Appellee Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc. [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Arthur Roebuck, III, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA R. SWINDLE, Trustee, d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza
Represented By: Michael C. Foster
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE J. FRYE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza
Represented By: Michael C. Foster
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARTHUR R. ROEBUCK, III
Represented By: Michael C. Foster
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCRIBE ENTERPRISES, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza
Represented By: Michael C. Foster
Represented By: Nicola Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Fay E. Ryan
Represented By: Carol M. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?