AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMG TRADE & DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Case Number: 19-12311
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC [19-12311] (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:27 PM]
July 30, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Nissan North America, Inc. [19-12311] (ECF: Thor Urness) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:33 PM]
July 16, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Robert John Becerra for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC and Andres H. Lopez for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:31 PM]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8817457-2 ] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:26 PM]
July 16, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:51 PM]
July 15, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thor Y. Urness for Appellee Nissan North America, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12311] (ECF: Thor Urness) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:42 AM]
July 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly Michelle Ingram for Nissan North America, Inc.. [19-12311] (ECF: Kimberly Ingram) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:47 AM]
July 8, 2019 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Andres H. Lopez for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Appellants brief due on 08/12/2019 as to Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Appendix due on 08/19/2019 as to Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [Entered: 07/08/2019 04:24 PM]
July 8, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert John Becerra for AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [19-12311] (ECF: Robert Becerra) [Entered: 07/08/2019 04:12 PM]
July 8, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC (Appellant) Andres H. Lopez for AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [19-12311] (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:52 PM]
July 8, 2019 Amended Motion [8819288-2] filed by Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [19-12311] (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:48 PM]
July 8, 2019 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** MOTION Motion to file the Civil Statement filed by AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8819288-1] [19-12311]--[Edited 07/09/2019 by CJ] (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:43 PM]
July 5, 2019 Notice of deficient Motion to file Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Andres H. Lopez for AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Document does not contain a Certificate of Interested Persons. See 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-5. Counsel must file a corrected motion using the Amend, Correct or Supplement Motion event within 3 days. Counsel must also immediately file an appearance of counsel form in order for the motion to be processed. Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 07/05/2019 09:23 AM]
July 3, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ANDRES H. LOPEZ REPRESENT AMG TRADE & DISTRIBUTION LLC Attorney Andres H. Lopez for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12311] (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/03/2019 05:21 PM]
July 3, 2019 MOTION to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [8817457-1] [19-12311]--[Edited 07/05/2019 by CJ] Corrected relief. (ECF: Andres Lopez) [Entered: 07/03/2019 05:17 PM]
July 3, 2019 Robert John Becerra for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC and Andres H. Lopez for Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC have been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should be filed at this time with the Civil Appeal Statement attached to the motion as an exhibit. [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:05 AM]
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert John Becerra for AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC and Andres H. Lopez for AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **** All attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and return an appearance of counsel form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-5. Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:43 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thor Y. Urness for Nissan North America, Inc.. [19-12311] (ECF: Thor Urness) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:59 AM]
June 18, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 06/18/2019 as to Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:54 PM]
June 17, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC on 06/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/01/2019 as to Appellant AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/15/2019 as to Appellee Nissan North America, Inc. [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMG Trade & Distribution, LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Thor Y. Urness
Represented By: Diana Nicole Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Ingram
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMG TRADE & DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: Robert John Becerra
Represented By: Andres H. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?