Wanda Crowder v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES, LLC, DELTA AIR LINES, INC. and ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: WANDA CROWDER
Case Number: 19-12342
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 26, 2020 Summary Crowder v. The Delta Air Line, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Wanda Crowder. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:29 AM]
August 1, 2019 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Wanda Crowder. [19-12342] (ECF: Paul Sharman) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:46 PM]
July 29, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Wanda Crowder. [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:42 AM]
July 29, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Wanda Crowder. [19-12342] (ECF: Paul Sharman) [Entered: 07/27/2019 12:16 PM]
July 17, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Timothy McDonald for Appellees Administrative Committee of Delta Air lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12342] (ECF: John McDonald) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:30 PM]
July 12, 2019 Response to Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Timothy McDonald for Appellees Administrative Committee of Delta Air lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. [19-12342]--[Edited 07/12/2019 by JC] (ECF: John McDonald) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:24 PM]
July 2, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Paul Joseph Sharman for Appellant Wanda Crowder. [19-12342] (ECF: Paul Sharman) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:53 AM]
July 2, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Paul Joseph Sharman for Appellant Wanda Crowder. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12342] (ECF: Paul Sharman) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:46 AM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Joseph Sharman for Wanda Crowder. [19-12342] (ECF: Paul Sharman) [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:49 AM]
June 27, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Timothy McDonald for The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan; The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.; and Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC John Timothy McDonald for Administrative Committee of Delta Air lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. [19-12342] (ECF: John McDonald) [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:03 PM]
June 19, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Wanda Crowder on 06/18/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/03/2019 as to Appellant Wanda Crowder. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/17/2019 as to Appellee Delta Air Lines, Inc. [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wanda Crowder v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA CROWDER
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?