E. Drake v. ACCC Insurance Company, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ORLINDA NARANJO, TREY HARLIN, PC, JOHN BURTON, EDITH B CLEMENT, ERIC MOYE, LORA LIVINGSTON, JAMES L DENNIS, SCOT GRAYDON, SCOTT JENKINS, SIM LAKE, WAYNE SALVANT, MIKE HRABAL, DALLAS COUNTY, STEPHEN A HIGGINSON, JANE BOYLE, STATE OF TEXAS, CARL GINSBERG, TIMOTHY SULAK, ACCC INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE ETHICS COMMISSION, GEORGE HANKS, JR., STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, SIDNEY A FITZWATER, CAROLINE M CRAVEN, DAVID LAWRENCE HORAN, TARRANT COUNTY, EWING WERLEIN, JR., JEFFREY C MANSKE, ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF TEXAS, BLAKE A. HAWTHORNE, WARREN LLOYD VAVRA, GREG ABBOTT, CARL E STEWART, JACK WIENER, STATE COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, ALFRED H BENNETT, JEFF ROSE, EDITH JONES, TRAVIS COUNTY, CAROLYN WRIGHT, JEFFREY L CURETON, MARY LOU ROBINSON, AMY CLARK MEACHUM, MELISSA GOODWIN, ED KINKEADE, TERRY R MEANS, LYNN HUGHES, LESLIE H SOUTHWICK, MARTIN HOFFMAN, MARK PITTMAN, VANESSA GILMORE, NATHAN HECHT, CHARLES RAMSAY, REED O'CONNOR, SCOTT FIELD, LAW OFFICE OF JAMES M. STANLEY, STEVEN WOLENS, VELVA PRICE, MARIA QUIROZ, SEANA WILLING, HAROLD LILLER, JOHN R. BURTON, PC, JACK HENRY IKENAGA, JR., VALERIE E. ERTZ and OFFICE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL
Plaintiff / Appellant: E. V. DRAKE
Case Number: 19-12361
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mr. Anthony J. Nelson for Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva Price, Travis County and Warren Lloyd Vavra. [19-12361] (ECF: Anthony Nelson) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:26 PM]
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick T. Pope for Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva Price, Travis County and Warren Lloyd Vavra. [19-12361] (ECF: Patrick Pope) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:24 PM]
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to E. V. Drake. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:40 AM]
August 2, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cave, Maren R Appellees State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm General Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Maren Cave) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:58 AM]
July 30, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant E. V. Drake was filed on 07/30/2019. Docket Entry 70. [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:56 AM]
July 29, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Daniel Hamilton) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:12 PM]
July 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Enrique Varela for Blake Hawthorne; Greg Abbott; Ken Paxton; Scot Graydon; Harold Liller; Steven Wolens; Seana Willing; Valerie E. Ertz; Mark Pittman; Scott Field; Jeff Rose; Melissa Goodwin; Carl Ginsberg; Wayne Salvant; Nathan Hecht; Carolyn Wright; Orl Attorney Enrique M. Varela for Appellees Greg Abbott, Valerie E. Ertz, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake A. Hawthorne, Nathan Hecht, Harold Liller, Amy Clark Meachum, Orlinda Naranjo, Office of Texas Attorney General, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Timothy Sulak, Seana Willing, Steven Wolens and Carolyn Wright. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Enrique Varela) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:20 AM]
July 25, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mark H. Glidewell for Appellees John R. Burton, PC and Law Office of James M. Stanley. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Mark Glidewell) [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:15 PM]
July 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Melvin Keith Ogle for Appellees Mike Hrabal and Tarrant County. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Melvin Ogle) [Entered: 07/23/2019 05:18 PM]
July 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Enrique M. Varela for Greg Abbott, Valerie E. Ertz, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake A. Hawthorne, Nathan Hecht, Harold Liller, Amy Clark Meachum, Orlinda Naranjo, Office of Texas Attorney General, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Timothy Sulak, Seana Willing, Steven Wolens and Carolyn Wright. [19-12361] (ECF: Enrique Varela) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:51 PM]
July 19, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Nancy Greenwood for Appellees Alfred H Bennett, Vanessa Gilmore, Lynn Hughes, Sim Lake, Jeffrey C Manske, Carl E Stewart and Ewing Werlein, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: Nancy Greenwood) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:19 PM]
July 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Maren Cave for State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. [19-12361] (ECF: Maren Cave) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:20 AM]
July 18, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melvin Keith Ogle for Mike Hrabal and Tarrant County. [19-12361] (ECF: Melvin Ogle) [Entered: 07/18/2019 05:00 PM]
July 18, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David M. Atkinson for ACCC Insurance Company. [19-12361] (ECF: David Atkinson) [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:59 PM]
July 18, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David M. Atkinson for Appellee ACCC Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12361] (ECF: David Atkinson) [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:48 PM]
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to E. V. Drake. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:15 PM]
July 17, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nancy C. Greenwood U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia for Alfred H Bennett, Jane Boyle, Edith B Clement, Caroline M Craven, Jeffrey L Cureton, James L Dennis, Sidney A Fitzwater, Vanessa Gilmore, George Hanks, Jr., Stephen A Higginson, David Lawrence Horan, Lynn Hughes, Edith Jones, Ed Kinkeade, Sim Lake, Jeffrey C Manske, Terry R Means, Reed O'Connor, Mary Lou Robinson, Leslie H Southwick, Carl E Stewart, Ewing Werlein, Jr. and Jack Wiener. [19-12361] (ECF: Nancy Greenwood) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:53 PM]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Anthony J. Nelson is GRANTED by clerk. [8824290-2] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:02 PM]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Patrick T. Pope is GRANTED by clerk. [8824226-2] [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:47 PM]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Enrique M. Varela is GRANTED by clerk. [8824117-2] [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:14 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Melvin Keith Ogle for Appellee Tarrant County in 19-12361, Attorney Melvin Keith Ogle for Appellee Mike Hrabal in 19-12361. [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:23 PM]
July 11, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Anthony J. Nelson for Appellees Scott Jenkins, Warren Lloyd Vavra, Lora Livingston, Travis County and Velva Price. [8824290-1] [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:57 PM]
July 11, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Patrick T. Pope for Appellees Scott Jenkins, Warren Lloyd Vavra, Lora Livingston, Travis County and Velva Price. [8824226-1] [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:38 PM]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Melvin Keith Ogle is GRANTED by clerk. [8822819-2] [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:54 PM]
July 10, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Enrique M. Varela for Appellees Greg Abbott, Carl Ginsberg, Wayne Salvant, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Timothy Sulak, Amy Clark Meachum, Jeff Rose, Scott Field, Melissa Goodwin, Carolyn Wright, Scot Graydon, Nathan Hecht, Blake A. Hawthorne, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Orlinda Naranjo, Harold Liller, Steven Wolens, Seana Willing, Valerie E. Ertz and Office of Texas Attorney General. [8824117-1] [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:58 PM]
July 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel W. Hamilton for Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Travis County and Warren Lloyd Vavra. [19-12361] (ECF: Daniel Hamilton) [Entered: 07/10/2019 04:18 PM]
July 9, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Melvin Keith Ogle for Appellees Mike Hrabal and Tarrant County. [8822819-1] [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:52 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark H. Glidewell, Esq., Attorney for Defendants John R. Burton, PC and Law Office of James M. Stanley [19-12361] (ECF: Mark Glidewell) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:16 PM]
June 20, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant E. V. Drake on 06/20/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/05/2019 as to Appellant E. V. Drake. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/18/2019 as to Appellee ACCC Insurance Company [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. Drake v. ACCC Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORLINDA NARANJO
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREY HARLIN, PC
Represented By: William D. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BURTON
Represented By: David Royce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDITH B CLEMENT
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC MOYE
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORA LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES L DENNIS
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOT GRAYDON
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT JENKINS
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIM LAKE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYNE SALVANT
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE HRABAL
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Represented By: Melvin Keith Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALLAS COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN A HIGGINSON
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE BOYLE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL GINSBERG
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY SULAK
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACCC INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE ETHICS COMMISSION
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE HANKS, JR.
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Maren Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIDNEY A FITZWATER
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROLINE M CRAVEN
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID LAWRENCE HORAN
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARRANT COUNTY
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Represented By: Melvin Keith Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EWING WERLEIN, JR.
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY C MANSKE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAKE A. HAWTHORNE
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARREN LLOYD VAVRA
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG ABBOTT
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL E STEWART
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK WIENER
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALFRED H BENNETT
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF ROSE
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDITH JONES
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS COUNTY
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROLYN WRIGHT
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY L CURETON
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY LOU ROBINSON
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMY CLARK MEACHUM
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA GOODWIN
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ED KINKEADE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY R MEANS
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNN HUGHES
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE H SOUTHWICK
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTIN HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK PITTMAN
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VANESSA GILMORE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Nancy Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHAN HECHT
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES RAMSAY
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REED O'CONNOR
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT FIELD
Represented By: Jason Samuel Naunas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW OFFICE OF JAMES M. STANLEY
Represented By: Mark H. Glidewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN WOLENS
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VELVA PRICE
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA QUIROZ
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEANA WILLING
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAROLD LILLER
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. BURTON, PC
Represented By: Mark H. Glidewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK HENRY IKENAGA, JR.
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALERIE E. ERTZ
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E. V. DRAKE
Represented By: E. V. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?