Katherine Leemon, et al v. US Stem Cell Clinic, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: US STEM CELL, INC., a Florida profit corporation, KRISTIN C. COMELLA, individually, US STEM CELL CLINIC, LLC, a Florida limited liability company and THEODORE GRADEL
Not Yet Classified: FRANK POUCHER, CHRISTEN STREUFERT, ANN-TOY BROUGHTON, DEBORAH SIMMONS, NANCY WEAVER, JUDITH SMITH, MANNY CAMACHO, MARY SCZEPANIAK, ROSS JOHNSON, JOHN M. TEMPLE, KURT WUELLNER, BERNADETTE NEWLON, DAWN WASHKEWICZ, JOYCE YEARGAN, DAVID H. BUCKLES, PAM WASHKEWICZ, IRA LEEMON, CHARLES YEARGAN, LYDIA CRONIN, SCOT SIMPSON, SUZANNE M. LAWRENCE, ROBERT I. ORENSTEIN, STEPHAN SPENCER, ANTHONY J. THYNNE, MOLLIE N. THIBODEAU, LUZ C. HERNANDEZ, CHARMIE SMITH, THOMAS THIBODEAU, JAN AITKEN, CAMILLA J. FOREMAN, LAUREL L. HODORY, ALLEN HEWITT, DARCY GOETTE, KURT WELLNER, KURT WIMBERG, FRANCIS MAGENNIS, MICHAEL K. POOL, ENRIQUE CORRAL, FAY MAGENNIS, TARA RUSSELL, NAOTA HASHIMOTO, STEPHANIE CIARAMITARO, SHARON KUSTER, JAMES POROWSKI, GAY D. SURNEY, KATHRYN L. O'HARROW, MARGARITA MATTINGLY, JAMES L. JEFFRIES, OLIVIA NEWSOME GRIECO, KATHRYN MORROW, ALLISON L. CRONIN, CAROL BARROWS, CHLOE SPENCER, VIRGINIA POROWSKI, GEORGE NEMECZ, SADA FENTON, MAUREEN JONES, JEAN HEWITT, DAWN WINSLOW, LINDA T. TAYLOR, ANGIE MARTIN, GREG MASKE, ALAN D. HUDSON, LISA BRADY GRANT, BARBARA BURNS, ROBERT DEMANE, PORTER BROUGHTON, KAREN J. JEFFRIES, DOOLEY MING, SARAH ANDERSON, MICHAEL L. KELBY, EVELYN L. CLOUGH, KATHLEEN ROGERS, RENATE WILSON, JAYNE FEDERMEYER, GAIL GRILL, AMANDA A. CAMACHO, LEAH SIMPSON, SHANNON E. SETH, MARY KLUCARICH, JAN GIMIAN, REID RUNZHEIMER, DARRO GRIECO, SAMUEL COLACURIO, JEFFERY MASTERS, GREGORY O. HUDGINS, ERIC C. CONGIARDO, DEANNA M. LAWRENCE, PAUL DECKER, STEVEN WATERMAN, KATHERINE LEEMON, EDWIN NOBLE and ELAINE MURIN
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-13381
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Paul Decker, Maureen Jones, Jan Aitken, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Lydia Cronin, Allison L. Cronin, Robert Demane, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darro Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, Karen J. Jeffries, James L. Jeffries, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Elaine Murin, Bernadette Newlon, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Christen Streufert, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Joyce Yeargan, Charles Yeargan, Sada Fenton, Darcy Goette, Fay Magennis, Edwin Noble, Frank Poucher, Kurt Wuellner, Sarah Anderson, Dooley Ming, Sharon Kuster, Kathryn Morrow, George Nemecz, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer and Mollie N. Thibodeau is GRANTED. [ # 8889861-2 ] Appellants brief due on 11/14/2019. BCG [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:59 PM]
September 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joshua Revesz for the United States of America. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13381] (ECF: Joshua Revesz) [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:56 AM]
September 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Revesz for the United States of America [19-13381] (ECF: Joshua Revesz) [Entered: 09/26/2019 10:54 AM]
September 25, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 11/14/2019 filed by Jan Aitken, Sarah Anderson, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Allison L. Cronin, Lydia Cronin, Paul Decker, Robert Demane, Sada Fenton, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darcy Goette, Darro Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, James L. Jeffries, Karen J. Jeffries, Maureen Jones, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Sharon Kuster, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Fay Magennis, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Dooley Ming, Kathryn Morrow, Elaine Murin, George Nemecz, Bernadette Newlon, Edwin Noble, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Frank Poucher, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer, Christen Streufert, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Mollie N. Thibodeau, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Kurt Wuellner, Charles Yeargan and Joyce Yeargan. Motion is Unopposed. [8889861-1] [19-13381] (ECF: Esther Meisels) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:43 PM]
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kathleen Ann Daly for Katherine Leemon, Ira Leemon, Virginia Porowski, James Porowski, Angie Martin, Tara Russell, Greg Maske, Porter Broughton, Manny Camacho, Amanda A. Camacho, Jayne Federmeyer, Allen Hewitt, Jean Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Kurt Wimberg, Lisa Brady Grant and Ann-Toy Broughton. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel. [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:48 PM]
September 19, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jacob Joseph Givner for Appellants Jan Aitken, Sarah Anderson, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Allison L. Cronin, Lydia Cronin, Paul Decker, Robert Demane, Sada Fenton, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darcy Goette, Darro Grieco, Olivia Newsome Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, James L. Jeffries, Karen J. Jeffries, Maureen Jones, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Sharon Kuster, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Fay Magennis, Francis Magennis, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Dooley Ming, Kathryn Morrow, Elaine Murin, George Nemecz, Bernadette Newlon, Edwin Noble, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Frank Poucher, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer, Christen Streufert, Gay D. Surney, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Mollie N. Thibodeau, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Kurt Wuellner, Charles Yeargan and Joyce Yeargan. [19-13381] (ECF: Jacob Givner) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:18 AM]
September 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-13381] (ECF: Jacob Givner) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:13 AM]
September 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marissa Ximena Kaliman for Jan Aitken, Sarah Anderson, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Allison L. Cronin, Lydia Cronin, Paul Decker, Robert Demane, Sada Fenton, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darcy Goette, Darro Grieco, Olivia Newsome Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, James L. Jeffries, Karen J. Jeffries, Maureen Jones, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Sharon Kuster, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Fay Magennis, Francis Magennis, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Dooley Ming, Kathryn Morrow, Elaine Murin, George Nemecz, Bernadette Newlon, Edwin Noble, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Frank Poucher, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer, Christen Streufert, Gay D. Surney, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Mollie N. Thibodeau, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Kurt Wuellner, Charles Yeargan and Joyce Yeargan. [19-13381] (ECF: Marissa Kaliman) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:53 AM]
September 19, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor-Appellants, Katherine Leemon et al. Attorney Kathleen Ann Daly for Appellants Ann-Toy Broughton, Porter Broughton, Amanda A. Camacho, Manny Camacho, Jayne Federmeyer, Lisa Brady Grant, Allen Hewitt, Jean Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Ira Leemon, Katherine Leemon, Angie Martin, Greg Maske, James Porowski, Virginia Porowski, Tara Russell and Kurt Wimberg. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13381] (ECF: Kathleen Daly) [Entered: 09/19/2019 06:02 AM]
September 17, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jacob Joseph Givner for Appellants Jan Aitken, Sarah Anderson, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Allison L. Cronin, Lydia Cronin, Paul Decker, Robert Demane, Sada Fenton, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darcy Goette, Darro Grieco, Olivia Newsome Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, James L. Jeffries, Karen J. Jeffries, Maureen Jones, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Sharon Kuster, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Fay Magennis, Francis Magennis, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Dooley Ming, Kathryn Morrow, Elaine Murin, George Nemecz, Bernadette Newlon, Edwin Noble, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Frank Poucher, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer, Christen Streufert, Gay D. Surney, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Mollie N. Thibodeau, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Kurt Wuellner, Charles Yeargan and Joyce Yeargan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13381] (ECF: Jacob Givner) [Entered: 09/17/2019 02:25 PM]
September 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Esther S. Meisels for Intervenors Jan Aitken, et al. (see Exhibit A) [19-13381] (ECF: Jacob Givner) [Entered: 09/16/2019 02:13 PM]
September 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Esther Sarah Meisels for Intervenor Appellants Jan Aitken, et al. [19-13381] (ECF: Esther Meisels) [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:12 PM]
September 12, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Marissa Ximena Kaliman for Appellants Jan Aitken, Sarah Anderson, Carol Barrows, David H. Buckles, Barbara Burns, Stephanie Ciaramitaro, Evelyn L. Clough, Samuel Colacurio, Eric C. Congiardo, Enrique Corral, Allison L. Cronin, Lydia Cronin, Paul Decker, Robert Demane, Sada Fenton, Camilla J. Foreman, Jan Gimian, Darcy Goette, Darro Grieco, Olivia Newsome Grieco, Gail Grill, Naota Hashimoto, Luz C. Hernandez, Laurel L. Hodory, Gregory O. Hudgins, Alan D. Hudson, James L. Jeffries, Karen J. Jeffries, Maureen Jones, Michael L. Kelby, Mary Klucarich, Sharon Kuster, Deanna M. Lawrence, Suzanne M. Lawrence, Fay Magennis, Francis Magennis, Jeffery Masters, Margarita Mattingly, Dooley Ming, Kathryn Morrow, Elaine Murin, George Nemecz, Bernadette Newlon, Edwin Noble, Kathryn L. O'Harrow, Robert I. Orenstein, Michael K. Pool, Frank Poucher, Kathleen Rogers, Reid Runzheimer, Mary Sczepaniak, Shannon E. Seth, Deborah Simmons, Leah Simpson, Scot Simpson, Charmie Smith, Judith Smith, Chloe Spencer, Stephan Spencer, Christen Streufert, Gay D. Surney, Linda T. Taylor, John M. Temple, Mollie N. Thibodeau, Thomas Thibodeau, Anthony J. Thynne, Dawn Washkewicz, Pam Washkewicz, Steven Waterman, Nancy Weaver, Kurt Wellner, Renate Wilson, Dawn Winslow, Kurt Wuellner, Charles Yeargan and Joyce Yeargan. No hearings. [19-13381] (ECF: Marissa Kaliman) [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:01 PM]
September 11, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kathleen Ann Daly for Appellants Ann-Toy Broughton, Porter Broughton, Amanda A. Camacho, Manny Camacho, Jayne Federmeyer, Lisa Brady Grant, Allen Hewitt, Jean Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Ira Leemon, Katherine Leemon, Angie Martin, Greg Maske, James Porowski, Virginia Porowski, Tara Russell and Kurt Wimberg. [19-13381] (ECF: Kathleen Daly) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:37 AM]
September 11, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Kathleen Ann Daly for Appellants Ann-Toy Broughton, Porter Broughton, Amanda A. Camacho, Manny Camacho, Jayne Federmeyer, Lisa Brady Grant, Allen Hewitt, Jean Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Ira Leemon, Katherine Leemon, Angie Martin, Greg Maske, James Porowski, Virginia Porowski, Tara Russell and Kurt Wimberg. No hearings. [19-13381] (ECF: Kathleen Daly) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:31 AM]
September 11, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katherine Leemon, Ira Leemon, Virgina Porowski, James Porowski, Angie Martin, Tara Russell, Greg Maske, Porter Broughton, Ann-Toy Broughton, M. Camacho, A. Camocho, Jayne Federmeyer, Jean Hewitt, Allen Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Kurt Wimburg, Lisa Brady Grant Kathleen Ann Daly for Ann-Toy Broughton, Porter Broughton, Amanda A. Camacho, Manny Camacho, Jayne Federmeyer, Lisa Brady Grant, Allen Hewitt, Jean Hewitt, Ross Johnson, Ira Leemon, Katherine Leemon, Angie Martin, Greg Maske, James Porowski, Virginia Porowski, Tara Russell and Kurt Wimberg. [19-13381] (ECF: Kathleen Daly) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:01 AM]
September 4, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jan Aitken on 08/30/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/15/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/18/2019 as to Appellant Jan Aitken [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:24 PM]
August 30, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Porter Broughton on 08/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/09/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/13/2019 as to Appellant Porter Broughton. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/27/2019 as to Appellee Kristin C. Comella [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katherine Leemon, et al v. US Stem Cell Clinic, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US STEM CELL, INC., a Florida profit corporation
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Loren H. Cohen
Represented By: Michael S. Blume
Represented By: Todd A. Harrison
Represented By: Todd H. Halpern
Represented By: Mary M. Gardner
Represented By: Stephen Ray Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTIN C. COMELLA, individually
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Loren H. Cohen
Represented By: Michael S. Blume
Represented By: Todd A. Harrison
Represented By: Todd H. Halpern
Represented By: Mary M. Gardner
Represented By: Stephen Ray Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US STEM CELL CLINIC, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Loren H. Cohen
Represented By: Michael S. Blume
Represented By: Todd A. Harrison
Represented By: Todd H. Halpern
Represented By: Mary M. Gardner
Represented By: Stephen Ray Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THEODORE GRADEL
Represented By: Isaac Jaime Mitrani
Represented By: Loren H. Cohen
Represented By: Todd A. Harrison
Represented By: Todd H. Halpern
Represented By: Mary M. Gardner
Represented By: Stephen Ray Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FRANK POUCHER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHRISTEN STREUFERT
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANN-TOY BROUGHTON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEBORAH SIMMONS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NANCY WEAVER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JUDITH SMITH
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MANNY CAMACHO
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARY SCZEPANIAK
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROSS JOHNSON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN M. TEMPLE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KURT WUELLNER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BERNADETTE NEWLON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAWN WASHKEWICZ
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOYCE YEARGAN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVID H. BUCKLES
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAM WASHKEWICZ
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: IRA LEEMON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES YEARGAN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LYDIA CRONIN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCOT SIMPSON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SUZANNE M. LAWRENCE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROBERT I. ORENSTEIN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STEPHAN SPENCER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANTHONY J. THYNNE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MOLLIE N. THIBODEAU
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LUZ C. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARMIE SMITH
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THOMAS THIBODEAU
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAN AITKEN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CAMILLA J. FOREMAN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAUREL L. HODORY
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALLEN HEWITT
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DARCY GOETTE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KURT WELLNER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KURT WIMBERG
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FRANCIS MAGENNIS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL K. POOL
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENRIQUE CORRAL
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FAY MAGENNIS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TARA RUSSELL
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NAOTA HASHIMOTO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STEPHANIE CIARAMITARO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHARON KUSTER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES POROWSKI
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GAY D. SURNEY
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KATHRYN L. O'HARROW
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARGARITA MATTINGLY
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES L. JEFFRIES
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OLIVIA NEWSOME GRIECO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KATHRYN MORROW
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALLISON L. CRONIN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CAROL BARROWS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHLOE SPENCER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VIRGINIA POROWSKI
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GEORGE NEMECZ
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SADA FENTON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAUREEN JONES
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEAN HEWITT
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAWN WINSLOW
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LINDA T. TAYLOR
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANGIE MARTIN
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREG MASKE
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALAN D. HUDSON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LISA BRADY GRANT
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARBARA BURNS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROBERT DEMANE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PORTER BROUGHTON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KAREN J. JEFFRIES
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOOLEY MING
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SARAH ANDERSON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL L. KELBY
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EVELYN L. CLOUGH
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KATHLEEN ROGERS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RENATE WILSON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAYNE FEDERMEYER
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GAIL GRILL
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: AMANDA A. CAMACHO
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LEAH SIMPSON
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHANNON E. SETH
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARY KLUCARICH
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAN GIMIAN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REID RUNZHEIMER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DARRO GRIECO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAMUEL COLACURIO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFERY MASTERS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREGORY O. HUDGINS
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ERIC C. CONGIARDO
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEANNA M. LAWRENCE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL DECKER
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STEVEN WATERMAN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KATHERINE LEEMON
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EDWIN NOBLE
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ELAINE MURIN
Represented By: Jacob J. Givner
Represented By: Marissa X. Kaliman
Represented By: Marissa Ximena Kaliman
Represented By: Esther Sarah Meisels
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Givner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?