George Spencer, et al v. R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Defendant / Appellee: LOCAL 1408, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO
Not Yet Classified: ROMIA JOHNSON, GEORGE SPENCER and FRED WAKEFIELD
Case Number: 19-13539
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Attorney Michael R. Yokan for Appellants George Spencer, Fred Wakefield and Romia Johnson has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:39 PM]
October 29, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Noel Gifford Lawrence for Appellee Local 1408, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13539] (ECF: Noel Lawrence) [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:37 PM]
October 17, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ronnie S. Carter for R. Alexander Acosta, Noel Gifford Lawrence for Local 1408, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO and U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for R. Alexander Acosta. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:55 PM]
October 8, 2019 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. [Entered: 10/08/2019 03:07 PM]
October 7, 2019 Attorney Michael R. Yokan for Appellants George Spencer, Fred Wakefield and Romia Johnson has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:23 PM]
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael R. Yokan for George Spencer, Fred Wakefield and Romia Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:24 AM]
September 10, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Romia Johnson, George Spencer and Fred Wakefield on 09/09/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/24/2019 as to Appellant Romia Johnson. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/08/2019 as to Appellees R. Alexander Acosta and Local 1408, International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO [Entered: 09/12/2019 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Spencer, et al v. R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Ronnie S. Carter
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOCAL 1408, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Noel Gifford Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROMIA JOHNSON
Represented By: Michael R. Yokan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GEORGE SPENCER
Represented By: Michael R. Yokan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FRED WAKEFIELD
Represented By: Michael R. Yokan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?