Andrew Bennett, et al v. Jefferson County, Alabama
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARLYN R. CULPEPPER, SHARON OWENS, SHARON RICE, REGINALD THREADGILL, WILLIAM R. MUHAMMAD, DAVID RUSSELL, JOHN W. ROGERS, Alabama State Legislator, ANDREW BENNETT, FREDDIE H. JONES, II, Lt. Col. Rt., RICKEY DAVIS, JR., ANGELINA BLACKMON, RODERICK V. ROYAL, Former Birmingham City Council President and MARY MOORE, Alabam State Legislator
Defendant / Appellee: JEFFERSON COUNTY, ALABAMA
Case Number: 19-13577
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:34 PM]
October 23, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/23/2019 12:50 AM]
October 15, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:57 PM]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File civil appeal statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8905958-2 ] [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:28 PM]
October 15, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James B. Bailey for Appellee Jefferson County, Alabama. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13577] (ECF: James Bailey) [Entered: 10/14/2019 04:20 PM]
October 15, 2019 Supplemental to Motion to file Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time [ # 8905958-2 ], Motion to file civil appeal statement form [ # 8905958-3 ], Motion to file civil appeal statement form out of time [ # 8905958-4 ] filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by CRL, to correct docket text and correct relief] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/12/2019 05:15 PM]
October 15, 2019 MOTION for leave to file civil appeal statement out of timefiled by Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8905958-1] [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/12/2019 12:01 AM]
October 11, 2019 Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice. please file a motion to file out of time as per the notice sent to you on 10/7. [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:08 PM]
October 10, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Andrew Bennett, et al Attorney Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:37 PM]
October 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:39 PM]
October 7, 2019 Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice and David A. Sullivan for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:09 PM]
September 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David A. Sullivan for Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: David Sullivan) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:41 PM]
September 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James B. Bailey for Jefferson County, Alabama. [19-13577] (ECF: James Bailey) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:59 PM]
September 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Howard Lembke for Jefferson County, Alabama. [19-13577] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:53 PM]
September 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:06 AM]
September 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill on 08/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/26/2019 as to Appellant Andrew Bennett. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/10/2019 as to Appellee Jefferson County, Alabama [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Bennett, et al v. Jefferson County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLYN R. CULPEPPER
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON OWENS
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON RICE
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REGINALD THREADGILL
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM R. MUHAMMAD
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID RUSSELL
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN W. ROGERS, Alabama State Legislator
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW BENNETT
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FREDDIE H. JONES, II, Lt. Col. Rt.
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKEY DAVIS, JR.
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGELINA BLACKMON
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RODERICK V. ROYAL, Former Birmingham City Council President
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY MOORE, Alabam State Legislator
Represented By: David A. Sullivan
Represented By: Calvin Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERSON COUNTY, ALABAMA
Represented By: Jay Robert Bender
Represented By: Matthew Howard Lembke
Represented By: R. Aaron Chastain
Represented By: James B. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?