Douglas Jackson v. Mark Inch, et al
Defendant / Appellee: G. L. WOODARD, d.b.a. Trustee and Asst. Warden-Programs Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc., J. BALDRIDGE, d.b.a. Trustee and Warden Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Correctons (FDOC) Inc. and MARK INCH, d.b.a. Trustee and Secretary Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOUGLAS MARSHALL JACKSON
Case Number: 19-13648
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 14, 2020 Douglas Marshall Jackson v. Mark Inch, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellants Petition to Compel Injunctive Relief, which seeks to compel this Courts ruling on Appellants pending motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction, is DENIED. The Court will address by separate order Appellants pending motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. [ # 8928512-2 ] ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [Entered: 11/15/2019 08:34 AM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson is GRANTED. [ # 8928508-2 ] Appellants brief due on 01/16/2020. BCG [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:10 PM]
November 12, 2019 MOTION Permission Sought by the Church to file "Initial Brief" in Current Talbet Format Provide by the Government, Second Petition to Compel Injuctive Relief to compel filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8934077-1] [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:26 PM]
November 7, 2019 Public Communication: Notice of Inquiry regarding filing fee and pending motion for injunction. [Entered: 11/07/2019 12:33 PM]
November 4, 2019 MOTION to compel filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8928512-1] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:13 PM]
November 4, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 01/16/2020 filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8928508-1] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:11 PM]
October 30, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/09/2019. [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:42 AM]
October 29, 2019 Appellate fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL086217 was paid on 10/18/2019 as to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:26 PM]
October 28, 2019 Notice of filing: Notice to this court that the appeal fililng fee is paid as to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:33 PM]
October 10, 2019 MOTION Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary restraining order filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8910944-1] --Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8910944-1][Edited 10/29/2019 by DEO] [Entered: 10/18/2019 03:30 PM]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to pay filing fee filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson is GRANTED. [ # 8896631-2 ] Filing fee due on 12/09/2019. ELB [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:18 PM]
October 7, 2019 Notice of filing: Notice to the court that a withdrawal form, for appeal filing fee, has been submitted to prison officials as to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:57 AM]
September 30, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:08 PM]
September 30, 2019 MOTION for extension of time, of sixty (60) days to pay the filing fee filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8896631-1] [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:06 PM]
September 17, 2019 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson on 09/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Douglas Jackson v. Mark Inch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. L. WOODARD, d.b.a. Trustee and Asst. Warden-Programs Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BALDRIDGE, d.b.a. Trustee and Warden Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Correctons (FDOC) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK INCH, d.b.a. Trustee and Secretary Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOUGLAS MARSHALL JACKSON
Represented By: Sumter CI Warden
Represented By: Douglas Marshall Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?