Douglas Jackson v. Mark Inch, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOUGLAS MARSHALL JACKSON
Defendant / Appellee: G. L. WOODARD, d.b.a. Trustee and Asst. Warden-Programs Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC), Inc.,, J. BALDRIDGE, d.b.a. Trustee and Warden Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc., and MARK INCH, d.b.a. d/b/a Trustee and Secretary Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.,
Case Number: 19-13935
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:08 PM]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8917229-2 ] [Entered: 11/05/2019 02:06 PM]
October 24, 2019 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8917229-1] [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:38 PM]
October 24, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:36 PM]
October 18, 2019 Appellate fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL086217 was paid on 10/18/2019 as to Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson. [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:14 AM]
October 3, 2019 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. (Amended) Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Douglas Marshall Jackson on 10/02/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Douglas Jackson v. Mark Inch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOUGLAS MARSHALL JACKSON
Represented By: Sumter CI Warden
Represented By: Douglas Marshall Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. L. WOODARD, d.b.a. Trustee and Asst. Warden-Programs Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC), Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BALDRIDGE, d.b.a. Trustee and Warden Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK INCH, d.b.a. d/b/a Trustee and Secretary Corporate Officer for Fla. Dept. of Corrections (FDOC) Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?