Jon Johnson v. K. Lang, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JON L. JOHNSON
Defendant / Appellee: COMMISSIONER, K. LANG, GRANTT CULLIVER, NURSE WALL and WARDEN
Case Number: 19-14278
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip Guy Piggott for Nurse Wall. [19-14278] (ECF: James Axon) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:58 PM]
December 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Philip Piggott for Ellen Gray, Ashley Wall, Tamekia Young and Lisa Taylor Morgan Attorney Philip Guy Piggott for Appellee Nurse Wall. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14278] (ECF: Philip Piggott) [Entered: 12/23/2019 01:01 PM]
December 23, 2019 Consent Form filed by Appellant Jon L. Johnson. [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:32 PM]
December 23, 2019 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal construed from appellants consent form filed by Appellant Jon L. Johnson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8966159-1] [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:35 PM]
December 16, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jon L. Johnson. [Entered: 12/17/2019 10:23 AM]
December 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jon L. Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:11 AM]
December 6, 2019 USDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 12/06/2019. Docket Entry 63. [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:02 PM]
November 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jon L. Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/29/2019 08:44 AM]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Steven Marshall for Grantt Culliver, Commissioner, Warden and K. Lang and Philip Guy Piggott for Nurse Wall. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:58 PM]
November 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jon L. Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:03 PM]
October 28, 2019 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jon L. Johnson on 10/28/2019. Fee Status: IFP Pending USDC motion Pending: Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, DE # 56 10/28/2019. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jon Johnson v. K. Lang, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON L. JOHNSON
Represented By: Jon L. Johnson
Represented By: Holman CF Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMISSIONER
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. LANG
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRANTT CULLIVER
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE WALL
Represented By: Philip Guy Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?