Daniel Cobble v. Cobb County District Attorney, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: DANIEL ERIC COBBLE
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, includes all GA District Judges, SUMTER COUNTY SHERIFF, ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF GEORGIA, COBB COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY and GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 19-14342
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8962022-1] [Entered: 12/18/2019 01:56 PM]
December 5, 2019 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in this Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 12/05/2019 08:06 AM]
December 2, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brett Joseph Talley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:53 PM]
December 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Brett Joseph Talley for USA and U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:43 PM]
November 25, 2019 Notice of filing: Notice of More Evidence as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/27/2019 08:25 AM]
November 18, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:56 PM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION for clerk to file all motions as future brief filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941831-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:53 PM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION Illegible Motion filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941825-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:51 PM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION for attorney's fees or costs filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941780-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:40 PM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION Motion for U.S. Court of Appeals to Rule filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941769-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:34 PM]
November 18, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brett J. Talley for USA [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:34 PM]
November 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Daniel Eric Cobble. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/15/2019 07:45 AM]
October 31, 2019 USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble was filed on 10/31/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:56 PM]
October 31, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble on 10/21/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Cobble v. Cobb County District Attorney, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DANIEL ERIC COBBLE
Represented By: Daniel Eric Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, includes all GA District Judges
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama
Represented By: Brett Joseph Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SUMTER COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: COBB COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?