Kelvin Spencer v. Specialty Foundry Products Inc, et al
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Defendant / Appellant: PORTER WARNER INDUSTRIES LLC, WEDRON SILICA COMPANY, ALPHA RESINS LLC, ASHLAND OIL COMPANY, IMERYS MINERALS USA INC, SOUTHERN PRECISION SANDS INC., HILL & GRIFFITH COMPANY, SPECIALTY FOUNDRY PRODUCTS INC. and ASK CHEMICALS LP
Plaintiff / Appellee: KELVIN SPENCER
Case Number: 19-14427
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Attorney Robert R. Baugh for Appellant Ashland Oil Company hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 03/03/2020. Robert Baugh (205) 930-5307 or someone designated by defendants will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Baugh) [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:26 PM]
December 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert Franklin Prince for Kelvin Spencer. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/09/2019 03:38 PM]
December 3, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Elliott B. Monroe for Appellant Specialty Foundry Products Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Elliott Monroe) [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:04 PM]
November 27, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert R. Baugh for Appellant Ashland Oil Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Baugh) [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:54 PM]
November 27, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bret L. Thompson for Porter Warner Industries LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Bret Thompson) [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:05 PM]
November 27, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: William Fleming) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:30 AM]
November 27, 2019 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher S. Berdy for Appellants Alpha Resins LLC and Wedron Silica Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Christopher Berdy) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:11 AM]
November 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY: Please file the CIP AND WEB CIP, they are needed for all parties. Please do so within 7 days of today. This appeal is expedited. Thank you. [Entered: 11/27/2019 10:42 AM]
November 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ROBERT F. PRINCE FOR KELVIN SPENCER, ET AL.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Prince) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:31 PM]
November 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14427] (ECF: Brian Kappel) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:09 PM]
November 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by ROBERT PRINCE FOR KELVIN SPENCER ET AL. Robert Franklin Prince for Kelvin Spencer. [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Prince) [Entered: 11/26/2019 11:20 AM]
November 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert R. Baugh for Ashland Oil Company. [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Baugh) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:27 PM]
November 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meghan Salvati Cole for Ashland Oil Company. [19-14427] (ECF: Meghan Cole) [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:15 PM]
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Patronas for Specialty Foundry Products, Inc. Patrick Patronas for Specialty Foundry Products Inc.. [19-14427] (ECF: Patrick Patronas) [Entered: 11/22/2019 05:01 PM]
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by E. Britton Monroe for Specialty Foundry Products, Inc. Elliott B. Monroe for Service. [19-14427] (ECF: Elliott Monroe) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:59 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bret L. Thompson for Porter Warner Industries LLC [19-14427] (ECF: Charles Cavender) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:31 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allan R. Wheeler for Porter Warner Industries LLC. [19-14427] (ECF: Charles Cavender) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:26 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles Paul Cavender for Porter Warner Industries LLC. [19-14427] (ECF: Charles Cavender) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:19 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Todd Lowther for Ask Chemicals LP. [19-14427] (ECF: Matthew Lowther) [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:49 AM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ronald Bruce Barze, Jr. for Ask Chemicals LP. [19-14427] (ECF: Ronald Barze) [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:39 AM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Henegan for Alpha Resins LLC and Wedron Silica Company [19-14427] (ECF: John Henegan) [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:03 AM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward B. McDonough, Jr. for Southern Precision Sands Inc.. [19-14427] (ECF: Edward McDonough) [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:53 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-14427] (ECF: John Johnson) [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:08 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-14427] (ECF: Christopher Berdy) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:59 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Xan Peyton Ingram for Wedron Silica Company. [19-14427] (ECF: Xan Flowers) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:25 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Mellor Bains Fleming, III for Hill & Griffith Company William Mellor Bains Fleming, III for Hill & Griffith Company. [19-14427] (ECF: William Fleming) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:23 PM]
November 20, 2019 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 03/03/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (CST): Argument Location: Birmingham, AL. [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:18 PM]
November 20, 2019 Attorney William Mellor Bains Fleming, III for Appellant Hill & Griffith Company hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/20/2019. William Mellor Bains Fleming, III and/or counsel for Co-Defendants/Appellants will present argument. 205-328-6643 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: William Fleming) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:45 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian P. Kappel for Imerys Minerals USA Inc. [19-14427] (ECF: Brian Kappel) [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:10 PM]
November 19, 2019 Attorney Patrick Patronas for Appellant Specialty Foundry Products Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 03/03/2020. E. Britton Monroe Office: (205) 967-8822 Cell: (205) 907-4414 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Patrick Patronas) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:09 PM]
November 19, 2019 Attorney Robert Franklin Prince for Appellee Kelvin Spencer hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 03/03/2020. Robert F. Prince, (205) 345-1234 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Prince) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:22 PM]
November 19, 2019 Attorney Matthew Todd Lowther for Appellant Ask Chemicals LP hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/19/2019. M. Todd Lowther and R. Bruce Barze, Jr. 205-872-1032 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Matthew Lowther) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:17 PM]
November 19, 2019 Attorney Brian P. Kappel for Appellant Imerys Minerals USA Inc hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 03/03/2020. Brian P. Kappel, 205.949.6394 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Brian Kappel) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:13 PM]
November 19, 2019 NOTE: Counsel must be logged into Eleventh Circuit CM/ECF before attempting to view the attached calendar. Calendar issued as to this case to be orally argued on 03/03/2020 in Birmingham, Alabama. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:29 AM]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant-Appellant Imerys Minerals USA, Inc. and Plaintiffs-Appellees Kelvin Spencer, et al.s Joint Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The briefing schedule is as the parties requested: January 21, 2020 Appellants Brief and Appendix Due January 31, 2020 Appellees Brief and Appendix Due February 7, 2020 Appellants Reply Brief Due To accommodate scheduling conflicts of the Panel, the Oral argument will be held at 9 a.m. on March 3, 2020 in the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203. SO ORDERED, this 18th day of November, 2019, ENTERED FOR THE COURT-BY DIRECTION [ # 8934120-2 ] [ # 8934120-3 ] [ # 8934120-4 ] . [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:03 PM]
November 18, 2019 Attorney Robert R. Baugh for Appellant Ashland Oil Company hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/11/2019. Because there are multiple Defendants, it is likely that one or two lawyers will present the argument on behalf of all the Defendants. If individual argument is required on behalf of Ashland, Robert Baugh will present the argument. (205) 930-5307. will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Robert Baugh) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:56 PM]
November 18, 2019 Attorney Patrick Patronas for Appellant Specialty Foundry Products Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/11/2019. E. Britton Monroe Office: (205) 967-8822 Cell: (205) 907-4414 will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: Patrick Patronas) [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:13 AM]
November 15, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/21/2020, for extension of time to file appellee's brief to 01/31/2020, for extension of time to file appendix to 01/21/2020 filed by Imerys Minerals USA Inc. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8934120-1] [19-14427] (ECF: Brian Kappel) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:38 PM]
November 15, 2019 Attorney William Mellor Bains Fleming, III for Appellant Hill & Griffith Company hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/15/2019. William Mellor Bains Fleming, III and/or counsel for Co-Defendants/Appellants will present argument. [19-14427] (ECF: William Fleming) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:26 PM]
November 13, 2019 NOTE: Counsel must be logged into Eleventh Circuit CM/ECF before attempting to view the attached calendar. Calendar issued as to this appeal to be orally argued on12/11/2019 in Birmingham, Alabama. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:49 PM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, oral argument for this appeal will be held in the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203. The specific date and time of oral argument...will be provided by separate notice from the Clerk's Office.. EEC [Entered: 11/13/2019 09:57 AM]
November 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Alpha Resins LLC, Ashland Oil Company, Ask Chemicals LP, Hill & Griffith Company, Imerys Minerals USA Inc, Porter Warner Industries LLC, Southern Precision Sands Inc., Specialty Foundry Products Inc. and Wedron Silica Company on 11/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants' brief and appendix are due on or before 11/22/2019. Appellee's brief is due on or before 12/02/2019. Appellants' reply brief is due December 9, 2019. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/26/2019 as to Appellant Alpha Resins LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/10/2019 as to Appellee Kelvin Spencer [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelvin Spencer v. Specialty Foundry Products Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Elliott B. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PORTER WARNER INDUSTRIES LLC
Represented By: Allan R. Wheeler
Represented By: Charles Paul Cavender
Represented By: Bret L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WEDRON SILICA COMPANY
Represented By: Xan Peyton Ingram
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Represented By: Xan Ingram Flowers
Represented By: John C. Henegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALPHA RESINS LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Represented By: Xan Ingram Flowers
Represented By: John C. Henegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ASHLAND OIL COMPANY
Represented By: Robert R. Baugh
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IMERYS MINERALS USA INC
Represented By: Elizabeth Humphrey Huntley
Represented By: Brian P. Kappel
Represented By: John Mann Johnson
Represented By: Zachary Pelham Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOUTHERN PRECISION SANDS INC.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HILL & GRIFFITH COMPANY
Represented By: William Mellor Bains Fleming III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SPECIALTY FOUNDRY PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By: Patrick Patronas
Represented By: Elliott B. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ASK CHEMICALS LP
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Barze Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Todd Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KELVIN SPENCER
Represented By: Robert Franklin Prince
Represented By: Joshua P. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?