Lyncoln Danglar v. Hassel, et al
Respondent / Appellee: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, JAY E. TOWN, SCOTT HASSEL, JONATHAN HORTON, Sheriff, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and JOHNATHON HORTON, Sheriff
Petitioner / Appellant: LYNCOLN DANGLAR
Case Number: 19-14948
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for stay of removal filed by Appellant Lyncoln Danglar is DENIED. [ # 8981323-2 ] CRW, AJ and JP [Entered: 02/04/2020 05:32 PM]
January 27, 2020 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Lyncoln Danglar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8992281-1] [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:50 PM]
January 13, 2020 MOTION for stay of removal filed by Appellant Lyncoln Danglar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8981323-1] [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:44 AM]
January 10, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Lyncoln Danglar was filed on 01/06/2020. Docket Entry 30. [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:28 AM]
January 9, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sarah Stevens Wilson for Appellees Department of Homeland Security, Jay E. Town and U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14948] (ECF: Sarah Wilson) [Entered: 01/09/2020 01:55 PM]
January 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for U.S. Attorney General, Department of Homeland Security and Jay E. Town and Sarah Stevens Wilson for U.S. Attorney General, Department of Homeland Security and Jay E. Town. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/09/2020 08:18 AM]
January 6, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Lyncoln Danglar. [Entered: 01/08/2020 08:20 AM]
January 2, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Wilson for Appellees [19-14948] (ECF: Sarah Wilson) [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:35 PM]
December 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lyncoln Danglar. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:38 AM]
December 18, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Holt for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for Department of Homeland Security, Jay E. Town and U.S. Attorney General. [19-14948] (ECF: Elizabeth Holt) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:15 AM]
December 12, 2019 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Lyncoln Danglar was filed on 12/10/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:29 PM]
December 11, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lyncoln Danglar on 12/09/2019 12/10/2019. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyncoln Danglar v. Hassel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JAY E. TOWN
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SCOTT HASSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JONATHAN HORTON, Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JOHNATHON HORTON, Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: LYNCOLN DANGLAR
Represented By: Lyncoln Danglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?