Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp. v. 50509 Marine LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellant: LIBERTY ANALYTICAL CORPORATION, AMH GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC, LIBERTY POLYGLASS, INC., LIBERTY ACQUISITIONS, FPB, LLC, BAJA MARINE, INC., DONZI MARINE, LLC, PRO-LINE OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., LIBERTY PROPERTIES AT CAREY, LLC, FOUNTAIN POWERBOATS, LLC, FOUNTAIN DEALERS FACTORY SUPER STORE, INC., PRO-LINE BOATS, LLC, LIBERTY PROPERTIES AT BEDFORD, LLC, FOUNTAIN POWERBOAT INDUSTRIES, INC., LIBERTY PARK FINANCIAL, LLC, BUFFALO POWER ELECTRONICS CENTER, INC., 50509 MARINE LLC, BEDFORD MATERIALS COMPANY, INC., LIBERTY ASSOCIATES, LC, AMERICAN MARINE HOLDINGS, LLC and PALMETTO PARK FINANCIAL LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION
Case Number: 19-14968
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Thursday, 09/24/2020 Argument Location: Jacksonville, FL. [Entered: 07/14/2020 06:10 PM]
July 13, 2020 Attorney Merrill D. Boone for Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 07/13/2020. Merrill D. Boone, (202) 229-3656 will present argument. [19-14968] (ECF: Merrill Boone) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:49 PM]
July 9, 2020 Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Palmetto Park Financial LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 09/24/2020. Robert J. Hauser / (561) 714 0055 (mobile) / 561 514 0900 Ext. 102 (office) will present argument. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 07/09/2020 03:55 PM]
July 9, 2020 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 09/21/2020 in Jacksonville, Florida. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 07/09/2020 03:29 PM]
June 22, 2020 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 30 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:33 PM]
June 11, 2020 Assigned to tentative calendar number 30 in Jacksonville during the week of September 21, 2020. [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:37 AM]
March 9, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Palmetto Park Financial LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:10 AM]
March 6, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Palmetto Park Financial LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 03/06/2020 01:19 PM]
February 24, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants Liberty Associates, LC, 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC, Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc. and Palmetto Park Financial LLC. Updated Reply Brief. Due on 03/16/2020 as to Appellant 50509 Marine LLC. [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:01 PM]
February 19, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:09 PM]
February 18, 2020 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [19-14968] (ECF: Merrill Boone) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:38 AM]
February 11, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [Entered: 02/11/2020 03:43 PM]
February 10, 2020 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [19-14968] (ECF: Merrill Boone) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:29 PM]
January 8, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Merrill Boone for the Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14968] (ECF: Merrill Boone) [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:04 AM]
January 6, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. 6 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:33 AM]
January 6, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Simon J. Torres for Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. Appellee's Brief due on 02/10/2020 as to Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation.. [Entered: 01/06/2020 12:45 PM]
January 3, 2020 Appendix filed [6 VOLUMES] by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:32 PM]
January 2, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. Appellee's brief is due on or before 01/27/2020. The Supplemental Appendix, if any, is due on 02/03/2020 as to Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:18 AM]
January 2, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:02 AM]
December 31, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants Liberty Associates, LC, 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:50 AM]
December 30, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:45 PM]
December 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Simon J. Torres for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [19-14968] (ECF: Simon Torres) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:23 PM]
December 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paula J. Connelly for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [19-14968] (ECF: Paula Connelly) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:12 PM]
December 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Merrill D. Boone for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [19-14968] (ECF: Merrill Boone) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:08 PM]
December 27, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 12/27/2019 01:30 PM]
December 20, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:29 PM]
December 20, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:42 AM]
December 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Robert J. Hauser for Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:41 AM]
December 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert J. Hauser for 50509 Marine LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc.. [19-14968] (ECF: Robert Hauser) [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:39 AM]
December 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants 50509 Marine LLC, AMH Government Services, LLC, American Marine Holdings, LLC, Baja Marine, Inc., Bedford Materials Company, Inc., Buffalo Power Electronics Center, Inc., Donzi Marine, LLC, Fountain Dealers Factory Super Store, Inc., Fountain Powerboat Industries, Inc., Fountain Powerboats, LLC, Liberty Acquisitions, FPB, LLC, Liberty Analytical Corporation, Liberty Associates, LC, Liberty Park Financial, LLC, Liberty Polyglass, Inc., Liberty Properties at Bedford, LLC, Liberty Properties at Carey, LLC, Pro-Line Boats, LLC and Pro-Line of North Carolina, Inc. on 12/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/26/2019 as to Appellant 50509 Marine LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/09/2020 as to Appellee Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation [Entered: 12/19/2019 12:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp. v. 50509 Marine LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY ANALYTICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMH GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY POLYGLASS, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY ACQUISITIONS, FPB, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BAJA MARINE, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONZI MARINE, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PRO-LINE OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY PROPERTIES AT CAREY, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FOUNTAIN POWERBOATS, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FOUNTAIN DEALERS FACTORY SUPER STORE, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PRO-LINE BOATS, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY PROPERTIES AT BEDFORD, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FOUNTAIN POWERBOAT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY PARK FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BUFFALO POWER ELECTRONICS CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 50509 MARINE LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEDFORD MATERIALS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIBERTY ASSOCIATES, LC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN MARINE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: Douglas C. Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PALMETTO PARK FINANCIAL LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION
Represented By: Simon J. Torres
Represented By: Paula J. Connelly
Represented By: Merrill D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?