Shiyang Huang v. Brian Spector, et al
Defendant / Appellee: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, a foreign limited liability company, DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE, TRUSTED ID, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, LLC, EQUIFAX, INC. and DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellee: WILLIAM R. PORTER, JAMES MCGONNIGAL, RANDOLPH JEFFERSON CARY, III, ALBERT RUSCITTO, BRIAN F. SPECTOR, VICTORIA KEALY, JENNIFER PASCUCCI DEMARCO and ROBIN D. PORTER
Petitioner / Appellant: SHIYANG HUANG, CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS, ALICE M FLOWERS, DAVID R. WATKINS, GEORGE WILLARD COCHRAN, JR., MIKELL WEST, THEODORE H. FRANK, JOHN W. DAVIS and HARALD SCHMIDT
Amicus Curiae: JAY EDELSON
Case Number: 20-10249
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Party Shiyang Huang hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 04/20/2021. Shiyang Huang 314-669-1858 will present argument. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 02/16/2021 01:29 PM]
February 16, 2021 Attorney Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellant John W. Davis hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 04/20/2021. Eric Alan Isaacson (858) 263-9581 will present argument. [20-10249] (ECF: Eric Isaacson) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:23 PM]
February 12, 2021 Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 04/20/2021. Theodore H. Frank, (703) 203-3848 will present argument. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:31 PM]
February 12, 2021 Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 04/20/2021. David L. Balser (404) 572-2782; Sidney Stewart Haskins, II (Stewart) (404) 572-4687 will present argument. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 02/12/2021 06:55 PM]
February 10, 2021 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellee Randolph Jefferson Cary, III. [20-10249] (ECF: Norman Siegel) [Entered: 02/10/2021 02:26 PM]
February 10, 2021 Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield for Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 04/20/2021. Kenneth S. Canfield, telephone # 404-277-7578 will present argument. [20-10249] (ECF: Kenneth Canfield) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:08 AM]
February 8, 2021 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:06 PM]
February 5, 2021 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:05 AM]
February 2, 2021 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 04/20/2021 Argument Location: Miami, FL. [Entered: 02/02/2021 09:55 AM]
February 1, 2021 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 04/19/2021 in Miami, Florida. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 02/01/2021 10:56 AM]
January 21, 2021 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 16 and will be reassigned to tentative calendar #15 the week of April 19, 2021 in Miami, Florida. [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:22 AM]
January 20, 2021 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:11 PM]
January 19, 2021 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 01/19/2021 07:50 PM]
January 19, 2021 Amended Certificate of Service re Rule 28(j) Response filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 01/18/2021 08:39 PM]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to Harald Schmidt. CRW, BBM and RJL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:26 AM]
January 11, 2021 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 01/11/2021 02:40 PM]
December 23, 2020 Assigned to tentative calendar number 16 in Montgomery during the week of April 26, 2021. [Entered: 12/23/2020 01:21 PM]
December 18, 2020 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 13 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:07 AM]
December 4, 2020 FRAP 28(j) letter and opinion filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:52 AM]
December 3, 2020 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Harald Schmidt was filed on 11/24/2020. Docket Entry 1194. [Entered: 12/03/2020 08:12 AM]
December 2, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 12/02/2020 07:58 PM]
December 2, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:47 PM]
November 24, 2020 Assigned to tentative calendar number 13 in Atlanta during the week of March 22, 2021. [Entered: 11/24/2020 09:04 AM]
November 23, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Harald Schmidt. [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:35 AM]
November 18, 2020 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 10 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:22 PM]
November 18, 2020 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Harald Schmidt--[Edited 01/12/2021 by RAV] [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:09 AM]
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Harald Schmidt. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:32 AM]
November 5, 2020 Notice of Amended Certificate of Service of Filings to Pro Se Movant-Appellant Schmidt filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 11/05/2020 06:20 PM]
November 4, 2020 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:59 PM]
November 4, 2020 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellee Randolph Jefferson Cary, III. [20-10249] (ECF: Norman Siegel) [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:45 PM]
November 3, 2020 Assigned to tentative calendar number 10 in Atlanta during the week of February 8, 2021. [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:19 AM]
October 29, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Harald Schmidt on 10/26/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/12/2020 as to Appellant Harald Schmidt [Entered: 11/03/2020 05:02 PM]
October 29, 2020 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellant John W. Davis. [20-10249] (ECF: Eric Isaacson) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:46 PM]
October 26, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:47 PM]
October 20, 2020 Opposition to Plaintiffs' "Clarification" of the Record seeking relief under FRAP 10(e)(3). Huang is unable to link the opposition to the original motion, because Plaintiffs did not file it as a motion. filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:02 AM]
October 19, 2020 Notice to the Court of Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson's Opposition to Plaintiffs-Appellees' Clarification of the Record filed by Attorney Ryan D. Andrews for Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson. [20-10249] (ECF: Ryan Andrews) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:09 PM]
October 16, 2020 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins., Shiyang Huang, Mikell West, George Cochran and John Davis[20-10249]--[Edited 10/19/2020 by AGW] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 10/16/2020 05:02 PM]
October 15, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant John W. Davis. [Entered: 10/20/2020 02:45 PM]
October 14, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Mikell West. [Entered: 10/20/2020 11:21 AM]
October 13, 2020 Plaintiffs-Appellees' Clarification of the Record filed by Attorney Roy E. Barnes for Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:03 PM]
October 9, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellant John W. Davis. [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:00 PM]
October 9, 2020 Notice of Filing of Corrected Reply Brief on October 9, 2020 filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:37 PM]
October 9, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellant Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:15 PM]
October 9, 2020 Corrected Reply Brief filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 10/09/2020 09:57 PM]
October 9, 2020 ***ERROR-INCORRECT FONT***Reply Brief filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249]--[Edited 10/14/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:17 PM]
October 9, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Alan Isaacson, counsel for appellant John W. Davis in 20-11470, 20-10249-RR [20-10249] (ECF: Eric Isaacson) [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:54 PM]
October 8, 2020 Notice to the Court on Corrected Reply Brief Filed filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:14 AM]
October 8, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party Shiyang Huang. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:13 AM]
October 8, 2020 Corrected Reply Brief filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:12 AM]
October 7, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party Shiyang Huang. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:26 PM]
October 7, 2020 ***ERROR PAGES MISSING***Reply Brief filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang. [20-10249]--[Edited 10/08/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:25 PM]
October 5, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. 17 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:48 PM]
October 5, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson. [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:15 PM]
October 5, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:21 PM]
October 5, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellant George Willard Cochran, Jr..--[Edited 10/08/2020 by RAV]--[Edited 10/14/2020 by MLM removed 20-10249 from front of entry]--[Edited 10/14/2020 by MLM] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:20 PM]
October 2, 2020 Supplemental Appendix [17 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:23 PM]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order General Order 46 filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 10/02/2020 06:51 AM]
October 2, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 10/02/2020 06:49 AM]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to vacate court's order filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers is DENIED. [ # 9171793-2 ] AJ, KCN and BL [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:12 PM]
October 1, 2020 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson. Service date: 09/11/2020 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Andrews, Lawson; Attorney for Appellants: Clore, Frank, Froelich, Nutley, Andrews, Cochran, Davis, Flowers, Huang; Attorney for Appellees: Adler, Balser, Barnes, Bevis, Canfield, Drobny, Gilchrist, Griest, Haskins, Hawal, Keller, Levitt, McEntyre, Moore, Prater, Reid, Siegel, Sumner, Toro, Tribble, Vahle, Yanchunis; Attorney for Not Parties: Briskin, Chaiken, Cochran, Danzig, Evangelista, Marshall, McGregor, Messer, Worley; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Austin, Bolton, Burrows, Cacioppo, Campbell, Carpenter, Cooke, Corsale, Fischman, Gilbert, Glassman, Hamilton Cawley, Haugen, Isajiw, Jensen, Kisloff, Lawless, Lawver, Luckett, McGuire, Needleman, Peay, Ramirez, Roskovensky, Rowe, Scott, Wertheimer, Williams, Williams, Williams, Zorogastua; Attorney for Not Parties: Adams, Cable, Daniel, Gilchrist, Jenkins, Katona, Liftik, Madison, McCaffrey, Paltzik, Rinehimer, Sheena, Swetnam, Ujke. [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:25 PM]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file amicus brief (Jay Edelson) is GRANTED. [ # 9185949-2 ] AJ [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:20 PM]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to dismiss Christopher Andrews' appeal filed by Appellees Brian F. Spector, James McGonnigal, Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, Robin D. Porter and William R. Porter is CARRIED with the Case. [ # 9175505-2 ] RSR, KCN and BL [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:55 AM]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to file excess words/pages filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins is GRANTED. [ # 9192824-2 ] KCN [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:41 AM]
September 29, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:48 PM]
September 28, 2020 Reply to Response to Motion for Leave to Proceed as an Amicus filed by Aaron Lawson for amicus curiae Jay Edelson. [20-10249] (ECF: John Lawson) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:01 PM]
September 25, 2020 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:43 PM]
September 25, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:19 PM]
September 25, 2020 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:14 PM]
September 24, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant John W. Davis. [Entered: 09/25/2020 10:27 AM]
September 24, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam J. Levitt for Appellees David Sands, Larry Frazier, Kayla Ferrel, Pete Swiftbird, David Bielecki, Kyle Olson, and Mel. C. Orchard III [20-10249] (ECF: Adam Levitt) [Entered: 09/24/2020 06:11 PM]
September 21, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion for leave to file amicus brief [ # 9185949-2 ] filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:58 PM]
September 21, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion for leave to file amicus brief [ # 9185949-2 ] filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:18 PM]
September 21, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion for leave to file amicus brief [ # 9185949-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:50 PM]
September 21, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for excess words/pages filed by Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9192824-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:13 PM]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to file excess words/pages filed by Appellees Brian F. Spector, James McGonnigal, Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, Robin D. Porter and William R. Porter is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs-Appellees may file a response brief that contains no more than 20,000 words. [ # 9183571-2 ] KCN [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:22 PM]
September 15, 2020 Received JOINT paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants George Willard Cochran, Jr., John W. Davis, Theodore H. Frank, Shiyang Huang, David R. Watkins and Mikell West. 11 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:29 AM]
September 11, 2020 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Aaron Lawson for Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson. [9185949-1] [20-10249] (ECF: John Lawson) [Entered: 09/11/2020 08:00 PM]
September 11, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Aaron Lawson for Amicus Curiae Jay Edelson [20-10249] (ECF: John Lawson) [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:49 PM]
September 11, 2020 Joint Appendix filed [11 VOLUMES] by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins, Hunag, West, Cochran, & Davis . [20-10249]--[Edited 09/14/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:13 PM]
September 10, 2020 Removed from case: Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants David R. Watkins and Theodore H. Frank in 20-10249. [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:40 AM]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Melissa Holyoak is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9181338-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Not Party Service in 20-10249. [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:33 AM]
September 10, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Jerome J. Froelich, Jr. for Mikell West and Service is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:21 AM]
September 9, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Mikell West. [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:51 AM]
September 9, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:36 AM]
September 9, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for excess words/pages filed by Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9183571-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:21 PM]
September 8, 2020 Notice of Corrected Opening Brief Filed filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:59 PM]
September 8, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ryan D. Andrews for Jay Edelson, amicus curiae [20-10249] (ECF: Ryan Andrews) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:45 PM]
September 8, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jerome J. Froelich, Jr. for Service and Mikell West and Jerome J. Froelich, Jr. for Service and Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Jerome Froelich) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:18 AM]
September 8, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service and Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9181338-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 09/07/2020 05:13 PM]
September 8, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 09/05/2020 12:14 PM]
September 4, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 09/04/2020 09:26 PM]
September 4, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by John W. Davis. [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:47 PM]
September 4, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by George Willard Cochran, Jr.. [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:32 PM]
September 4, 2020 Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:16 PM]
September 4, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party Shiyang Huang. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:15 PM]
September 4, 2020 Corrected Appellant's Brief filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 05:15 PM]
September 4, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:18 PM]
September 4, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Party Shiyang Huang. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:17 PM]
September 4, 2020 ***ERROR***Appellant's brief filed by Shiyang Huang. [20-10249]--[Edited 09/10/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:16 PM]
September 4, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to vacate court's order filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers [ # 9171793-2 ] filed by Attorney Roy E. Barnes for Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:46 PM]
September 4, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:13 PM]
September 4, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to vacate court's order filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers [ # 9171793-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:57 PM]
September 3, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:06 PM]
September 3, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:54 AM]
September 2, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:30 PM]
September 2, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 09/02/2020 07:27 PM]
September 1, 2020 The appellant is unable to file paper copies of the appendix due to second hand exposure to Covid-19 recently. filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:41 PM]
September 1, 2020 Appendix filed [4 VOLUMES] by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:27 PM]
September 1, 2020 Correction to General Order 46 filing which now includes Certificate of Service. Appellant is unable to file paper copies of the brief due to second hand exposure to Covid-19. filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:36 AM]
August 31, 2020 Per General Order 46, the appellant is unable to file paper copies of the opening brief due to Covid-19 filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:16 AM]
August 31, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal as frivolous filed by Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector [ # 9175505-2 ] filed by Party Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 08/30/2020 11:13 AM]
August 31, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Christopher Andrews. [20-10249] (ECF: Christopher Andrews) [Entered: 08/30/2020 10:48 AM]
August 28, 2020 MOTION to dismiss appeal as frivolous filed by Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9175505-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 08/28/2020 05:39 PM]
August 28, 2020 3rd Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Appellant Mikell West and Not Party Service. [Entered: 08/28/2020 04:09 PM]
August 28, 2020 2nd Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party John W. Davis. [Entered: 08/28/2020 04:05 PM]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to correct in DC filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins is DENIED. [ # 9163568-2 ]; [ # 9163568-3 ] KCN [Entered: 08/26/2020 08:34 AM]
August 25, 2020 MOTION to vacate court's order filed by Alice M Flowers. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9171793-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Alice Flowers) [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:16 PM]
August 25, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 08/21/2020 as to Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 08/25/2020 08:22 AM]
August 25, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 08/25/2020 02:53 AM]
August 24, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN Receipt of payment Notice of receipt: Payment of filing fee to USDC as to Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 08/26/2020 08:56 AM]
August 24, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to correct in DC filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9163568-2 ], Motion to supplement the record filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9163568-3 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:44 PM]
August 24, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9163568-2 ], Motion filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9163568-3 ] filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:23 PM]
August 21, 2020 ***ERROR***.--[Edited 08/21/2020 by RAV]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by RAV] [Entered: 08/21/2020 08:57 AM]
August 18, 2020 3rd Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [Entered: 08/18/2020 10:22 AM]
August 14, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to correct the Record pursuant to Rule 10(e)(3), which improperly excludes ex parte communications between class counsel and the court. in district court, to supplement the record filed by Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Motion is Opposed. [9163568-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 08/14/2020 08:59 PM]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews is DENIED. [ # 9091646-2 ]; Motion to expedite disposition filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector is GRANTED. [ # 9085807-2 ] [ # 9085807-3 ]; Motion to seal documents filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector is GRANTED. [ # 9094262-2 ]; (See attached order for complete text). ELB [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:16 PM]
August 11, 2020 USDC order: The Motion for Clarification, or in the Alternative to Supplement the Record [Doc. 1134] of the Objectors Frank and Watkins is DENIED. as to Appellant David R. Watkins was filed on 08/07/2020. Docket Entry 1153. [Entered: 08/11/2020 09:33 AM]
August 5, 2020 MOTION MOOT: Motion for confession of error is MOOT [ # 9104209-2 ]; Motion to transfer case is MOOT [ # 9103590-2 ] due to this Court's order filed 08/05/2020. Motion filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers. [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:09 PM]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdictionas to Alice-Marie Flowers..; On its own motion, the court carries the jurisdictional issue with the case. ( See order for complete text) AJ, KCN and BL [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:08 PM]
July 20, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:21 PM]
July 2, 2020 USDC : MOTION for Clarification as to Appellant David R. Watkins was filed on 06/09/2020. Docket Entry 1134. [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:55 AM]
June 23, 2020 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party John W. Davis. [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:45 PM]
June 19, 2020 Response to plaintiffs and defendants response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:45 PM]
June 18, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant George Willard Cochran, Jr.. [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:33 PM]
June 17, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:26 PM]
June 17, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 06/17/2020 04:10 PM]
June 16, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Mikell West [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:26 AM]
June 15, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion for confession of error filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers [ # 9104209-2 ], Motion to transfer case filed by Appellant Alice M Flowers [ # 9103590-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 06/15/2020 10:44 PM]
June 15, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 06/15/2020 08:15 PM]
June 15, 2020 ***ERROR AS PER PARTY***Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang [20-10249]--[Edited 06/17/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 06/15/2020 07:58 PM]
June 15, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant John W. Davis [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 06/15/2020 06:42 PM]
June 15, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 06/14/2020 06:40 PM]
June 11, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 06/16/2020 11:01 AM]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for reconsideration of panel order filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins is DENIED. [ # 9090150-2 ] WHP, RSR and BL [Entered: 06/08/2020 09:04 AM]
June 5, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 06/05/2020 07:13 AM]
June 4, 2020 MOTION for confession of error filed by Alice M Flowers. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9104209-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Alice Flowers) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:31 AM]
June 3, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Alice M Flowers. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Alice Flowers) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:31 PM]
June 3, 2020 MOTION to transfer case filed by Alice M Flowers. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9103590-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Alice Flowers) [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:37 PM]
June 3, 2020 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 06/03/2020 10:10 AM]
June 1, 2020 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:19 AM]
June 1, 2020 2nd Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Appellant Mikell West and Not Party Service. [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:16 AM]
June 1, 2020 Corrected second Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:11 AM]
May 29, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion for reconsideration of panel order filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9090150-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:21 PM]
May 29, 2020 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:49 AM]
May 28, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Molly Renee Hamilton Cawley for Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC. Address has NOT been verified and NOT updated, and mail has NOT been re-sent. IN RE: 5/1 and dkt-2 [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:03 PM]
May 27, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9090150-2 ] filed by Attorney Roy E. Barnes for Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:52 PM]
May 26, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN This is a notice not a motion Notice of receipt: Notice to the Court-explanation of the erroneous manner for which my filings have been handled. as to Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers. [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:19 PM]
May 26, 2020 Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 05/25/2020 06:31 PM]
May 22, 2020 2nd Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:22 PM]
May 22, 2020 MOTION to seal filed by Brian F. Spector. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9094262-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:53 AM]
May 22, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews [ # 9091646-2 ] filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:39 AM]
May 20, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite disposition filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-2 ], Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-3 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:35 AM]
May 19, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for reconsideration of a panel order entered on 05/07/2020 filed by Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Motion is Opposed. [9090150-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:10 AM]
May 18, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Joann Needleman for Appellee EFX. Address has not been verified and not updated, and mail has not been re-sent. IN RE: 2/27/20 and DKT-2 [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:15 AM]
May 18, 2020 Returned Mail was received for John M. Williams for Appellee EFX and John M. Williams for Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC. Address has not been verified and updated, and mail has not been re-sent. IN RE: 5/1/20 and Dkt-2 [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:41 AM]
May 18, 2020 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9091646-1] [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:28 AM]
May 15, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Charles Henry Carpenter for Appellee EFX. Address has NOT been verified and updated, and mail has NOT been re-sent. IN RE: 5/1/20 and DKT-2 [Entered: 05/19/2020 07:58 AM]
May 15, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 05/15/2020 05:48 PM]
May 15, 2020 CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion to expedite disposition filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-2 ], Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-3 ] filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 05/15/2020 06:10 AM]
May 14, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-2 ], Motion filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9085807-3 ] filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 05/14/2020 07:56 PM]
May 13, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to expedite disposition, to expedite briefing filed by Brian F. Spector. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9085807-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:31 PM]
May 8, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party John W. Davis. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:13 AM]
May 8, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Christopher Andrews was filed on 05/07/2020. Docket Entry 1089. [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:19 AM]
May 7, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney John R. Lawless, Jr. for Appellees EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC. Address hasnot been verified and not updated, and mail has not been re-sent. IN RE: 5/1 and dkt-2 [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:10 AM]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: To the extent that the motion seeks to consolidate the appeals, the motion is DENIED AS MOOT.The motion to expedite briefing is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling such a motion after Appellant Christopher Andrews motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is resolved. The district court is requested to expedite consideration of this motion. [ # 9053511-2 ]; Motion for sanctions filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins is DENIED. [ # 9054693-2 ]; Motion to correct in DC filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins is DENIED. [ # 9066477-2 ]; WHP, RSR and BL [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:00 PM]
May 6, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Charles Benjamin Nutley for Appellant John W. Davis. [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:41 PM]
May 6, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party John W. Davis. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:28 AM]
May 5, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by C. Benjamin Nutley for John W. Davis. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 05/05/2020 07:58 PM]
May 5, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by C. Benjamin Nutley for John W. Davis [20-10249] (ECF: Charles Nutley) [Entered: 05/05/2020 07:53 PM]
May 4, 2020 Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service and Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 05/04/2020 03:25 PM]
May 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John William Davis. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/04/2020 09:03 AM]
April 30, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to correct in DC filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9066477-2 ] filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:55 PM]
April 30, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9066477-2 ] filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:58 PM]
April 30, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to correct in DC filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9066477-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 04/30/2020 09:14 PM]
April 29, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9066477-2 ] filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 04/29/2020 09:57 PM]
April 20, 2020 MOTION to correct the the Record to include omitted ex parte written communications, pursuant to FRAP 10(e)(2)(C) in district court filed by Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9066477-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 04/20/2020 07:59 PM]
April 15, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant John William Davis on 04/14/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2020 as to Appellant John William Davis [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:21 PM]
April 15, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:48 PM]
April 14, 2020 [20-10249]RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector in 20-10249 [ # 9053511-2 ] filed by Appellant George Willard Cochran, Jr..--[Edited 04/15/2020 by RAV] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:04 PM]
April 13, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9053511-2 ] filed by Attorney David L. Balser for Appellees Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:08 PM]
April 13, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion [ # 9053511-2 ] filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 04/13/2020 08:18 PM]
April 10, 2020 RESPONSE has been filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews to Motion for sanctions filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins in 20-10249 [ # 9054693-2 ]. [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:26 AM]
April 9, 2020 RESPONSE has been filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews to Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector in 20-10249 [ # 9053511-2 ]. [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:07 AM]
April 8, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellee Brian F. Spector [ # 9053511-2 ], Motion for sanctions filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [ # 9054693-2 ] filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 04/08/2020 03:39 AM]
April 7, 2020 Appeal clerically reinstated as to Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers because appeal was erroneously dismissed on 04/07/2020. The appellant paid the fee on 3/30.. [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:29 AM]
April 7, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 03/30/2020 as to Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers. [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:22 AM]
April 7, 2020 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Alice-Marie Flowers failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 04/07/2020 10:18 AM]
April 6, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing [ # 9053511-2 ] with incorporated MOTION to impose sanctions for damages and costs filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Motion is Opposed. [9054693-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 04/06/2020 04:20 PM]
April 6, 2020 ***ERROR***RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing [ # 9053511-2 ] with incorporated MOTION to impose sanctions for damages and costs filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9054649-1] [20-10249]--[Edited 04/07/2020 by RAV] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 04/06/2020 04:01 PM]
April 6, 2020 Regarding Motion of Plaintiffs-Appellees for Consolidation and to Expedite Appeals filed by Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller for Appellee Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 04/05/2020 10:33 PM]
April 3, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to expedite briefing filed by Brian F. Spector. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9053511-1] [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 04/03/2020 10:28 PM]
April 1, 2020 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [Entered: 04/01/2020 07:56 AM]
March 27, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers. [Entered: 03/31/2020 10:11 AM]
March 27, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Alice-Marie Flowers. No hearings. [Entered: 03/31/2020 10:03 AM]
March 23, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN He sent in another letter which said to cancel this request. Notice of receipt: missing documents as to Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:49 AM]
March 23, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN He does not have a request. Notice of receipt: Please cancel filing as to Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:29 AM]
March 20, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 03/20/2020 as to Appellant George Willard Cochran, Jr.. [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:14 PM]
March 20, 2020 USDC FRAP 4 Order as to Appellant Christopher Andrews in 20-10249 was filed on 03/17/2020. Docket Entry 1026 & 1027. [20-10249, 20-10613] [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:45 AM]
March 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Justin J. Hawal for Appellees David Sands, Larry Fraizer, Kayla Ferrel, Pete Swiftbird, David Bielecki, Kyle Olson and Mel C. Orchard III [20-10249] (ECF: Justin Hawal) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:18 PM]
March 18, 2020 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 03/18/2020 09:46 AM]
March 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Alice-Marie Flowers. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/18/2020 09:25 AM]
March 12, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service and Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:09 PM]
March 10, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 03/10/2020 02:54 PM]
March 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 03/09/2020 06:29 PM]
March 9, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 03/09/2020 06:26 PM]
March 9, 2020 Notice of address change filed by Party George Willard Cochran, Jr.. [20-10249] (ECF: George Cochran) [Entered: 03/09/2020 06:22 PM]
March 9, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 03/07/2020 09:58 PM]
March 6, 2020 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Diane Peede, Filer: Mikell West, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 12/20/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 12/19/2019. [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:53 PM]
March 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Christopher Andrews. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 03/05/2020 10:25 AM]
March 2, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 03/02/2020 10:30 PM]
March 2, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 03/02/2020 06:42 PM]
March 2, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Theodore H. Frank for Objectors-Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins [20-10249] (ECF: Theodore Frank) [Entered: 03/02/2020 06:13 PM]
March 2, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:19 PM]
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Christopher Andrews, George W. Cochran and Alice-Marie Flowers. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/02/2020 10:42 AM]
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert William Clore for Mikell West and Service and Melissa Holyoak for Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Service. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/02/2020 10:41 AM]
March 2, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Melissa Holyoak for Appellants Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Not Party Service. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 03/01/2020 08:33 PM]
March 2, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa Holyoak for Theodore H. Frank, David R. Watkins and Service. [20-10249] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 03/01/2020 08:30 PM]
February 28, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN 11th Cir. R. 33-1 (a) (3) Notice of receipt: Declaration of exemption from filing civil appeal statement as to Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:51 PM]
February 28, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews. [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:38 PM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Douglas Griest for EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Griest) [Entered: 02/28/2020 06:23 PM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Dees Adler for EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: Elizabeth Adler) [Entered: 02/28/2020 06:20 PM]
February 28, 2020 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Christopher Andrews was filed on 02/10/2020. Docket Entry 986. [Entered: 02/28/2020 12:10 PM]
February 28, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Mikell West, Court Reporter: Diane Peede, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 12/19/2019. [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:28 AM]
February 28, 2020 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Mikell West & Davis DE #: 969 & 978 [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:19 AM]
February 28, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Robert William Clore for Not Party Service and Appellant Mikell West. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:56 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert William Clore for Service and Mikell West. [20-10249] (ECF: Robert Clore) [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:21 AM]
February 27, 2020 The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Shiyang Huang is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): waiting until all notice of appeals have been docketed. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:29 AM]
February 24, 2020 Public Communication: The deficiency notices sent to David L. Balser and Phyllis B. Sumner on February 12, 2020 were sent by mistake and can be disregarded. Both attorneys are active members of the 11th Circuit Bar. [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:17 PM]
February 18, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sidney Stewart Haskins, II for Appellee EFX. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Sidney Haskins) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:57 PM]
February 18, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Roy E. Barnes for Appellees Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 02/18/2020 09:11 PM]
February 14, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers on 02/13/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/28/2020 as to Appellant Alice-Marie Flowers [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:35 PM]
February 14, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellant's brief is due on 03/16/2020. [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:15 PM]
February 14, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Sidney Stewart Haskins, II for EFX is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:44 PM]
February 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sidney Stewart Haskins, II for EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: Sidney Haskins) [Entered: 02/14/2020 01:37 PM]
February 13, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant George W. Cochran on 02/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/27/2020 as to Appellant George W. Cochran [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:00 PM]
February 13, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christopher Andrews on 02/10/2020. Fee Status: IFP Pending. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/27/2020 as to Appellant Christopher Andrews [Entered: 02/28/2020 12:03 PM]
February 12, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, David Lewis Balser for EFX and Equifax Information Services LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:15 AM]
February 12, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Phyllis Buchen Sumner for EFX is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:10 AM]
February 11, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mikell West on 02/11/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/25/2020 as to Appellant Mikell West [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:19 PM]
February 11, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Theodore H. Frank and David R. Watkins on 02/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/25/2020 as to Appellant Theodore H. Frank [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:32 PM]
February 11, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Toro for Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: John Toro) [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:45 PM]
February 11, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Phyllis Buchen Sumner for EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: Phyllis Sumner) [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:42 PM]
February 11, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Lewis Balser for Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [20-10249] (ECF: David Balser) [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:27 PM]
February 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amy E. Keller for Appellees David Sands, Larry Frazier, Kayla Ferrel, Pete Swiftbird, David Bielecki, Kyle Olson, and Mel. C. Orchard III [20-10249] (ECF: Amy Keller) [Entered: 02/04/2020 06:32 PM]
February 4, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Roy E. Barnes for Brian F. Spector, James McGonnigal, Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, Robin D. Porter and William R. Porter is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:35 PM]
February 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Cameron Tribble for Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: James Tribble) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:16 PM]
February 4, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roy E. Barnes for Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, James McGonnigal, Robin D. Porter, William R. Porter and Brian F. Spector. [20-10249] (ECF: Roy Barnes) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:14 PM]
February 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barrett Jay Vahle for Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, Robin D. Porter and William R. Porter. [20-10249] (ECF: Barrett Vahle) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:32 PM]
February 3, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Norman E. Siegel for Randolph Jefferson Cary, III, Robin D. Porter and William R. Porter. [20-10249] (ECF: Norman Siegel) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:29 PM]
January 31, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Shiyang Huang. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/02/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:45 PM]
January 31, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 01/29/2020 as to Appellant Shiyang Huang. [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:45 PM]
January 29, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kenneth S. Canfield for Brian Spector, et al. [20-10249] (ECF: Kenneth Canfield) [Entered: 01/29/2020 11:19 AM]
January 29, 2020 Letter to the Court regarding Exemption from filing a Civil Appeal Statement pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 33-1(a)(3) filed by Party Shiyang Huang. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 01/29/2020 01:04 AM]
January 29, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Party Shiyang Huang. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:49 AM]
January 29, 2020 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shiyang Huang, a Pro Se non-attorney Appellant, exempt from Web-based CIP Completion Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:44 AM]
January 28, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shiyang Huang (Pro Se), Appellant-Objector. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10249] (ECF: Shiyang Huang) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:34 PM]
January 21, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Shiyang Huang on 01/17/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/04/2020 as to Appellant Shiyang Huang. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/18/2020 as to Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC [Entered: 01/28/2020 12:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shiyang Huang v. Brian Spector, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, a foreign limited liability company
Represented By: Ralph Downing Scott III
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Represented By: Molly Renee Hamilton Cawley
Represented By: Joseph W. Lawver
Represented By: John C. Toro
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Represented By: Christopher J. Haugen
Represented By: Rachel M. Wertheimer
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: Zachary Andrew McEntyre
Represented By: Patricia Williams
Represented By: Jayna Morse Cacioppo
Represented By: Bradley Austin
Represented By: William O. Luckett Jr.
Represented By: Edith Ramirez
Represented By: John M. Williams
Represented By: John R. Lawless Jr.
Represented By: Robert Douglas Griest
Represented By: Elizabeth Dees Adler
Represented By: David L. Balser
Represented By: Phyllis B. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRUSTED ID, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Kirkland E. Reid
Represented By: Phyllis B. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQUIFAX, INC.
Represented By: Ralph Downing Scott III
Represented By: Peter Corsale
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Molly Renee Hamilton Cawley
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Michelle Anne I Kisloff
Represented By: Melissa A. Campbell
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Robert Douglas Griest
Represented By: Noam B. Fischman
Represented By: Joseph W. Lawver
Represented By: Peter Isajiw
Represented By: Joann Needleman
Represented By: Phyllis Buchen Sumner
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Represented By: John C. Toro
Represented By: Alicia Bliss Gilbert
Represented By: Adam Cooke
Represented By: Christopher J. Haugen
Represented By: Rachel M. Wertheimer
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: G. Gabriel Zorogastua
Represented By: Patricia Williams
Represented By: Daniel D. McGuire
Represented By: Jayna Morse Cacioppo
Represented By: Benjamin C. Jensen
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater IV
Represented By: Stephen P. Drobny
Represented By: William O. Luckett Jr.
Represented By: Stewart O. Peay
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Represented By: Edith Ramirez
Represented By: John M. Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth Dees Adler
Represented By: Sidney Stewart Haskins II
Represented By: John R. Lawless Jr.
Represented By: Michelle Anne Kisloff
Represented By: David L. Balser
Represented By: Phyllis B. Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Alan M. Briskin
Represented By: Edward Andrew Paltzik
Represented By: Michael E. Liftik
Represented By: Meghan A. McCaffrey
Represented By: David M. Messer
Represented By: Jerome J. Froelich Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Adams III
Represented By: Danny M. Sheena
Represented By: Aaron M. Danzig
Represented By: Douglas Scott Swetnam
Represented By: James Nixon Daniel
Represented By: Robert William Clore
Represented By: Steven G. Madison
Represented By: Sara Cable
Represented By: Dave Ujke
Represented By: Melissa Holyoak
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Represented By: Edward Alexander Marshall
Represented By: Jared Andrew Rinehimer
Represented By: David M. Chaiken
Represented By: Anthony L. Cochran
Represented By: Corinne Gilchrist
Represented By: John W. Davis
Represented By: David J. Worley
Represented By: Christian A. Jenkins
Represented By: Kristi Stahnke McGregor
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM R. PORTER
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Barrett Jay Vahle
Represented By: John R. Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES MCGONNIGAL
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Marisa Kendra Glassman
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John R. Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDOLPH JEFFERSON CARY, III
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Barrett Jay Vahle
Represented By: John R. Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALBERT RUSCITTO
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Coomes
Represented By: Christian A. Jenkins
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Goldenberg
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN F. SPECTOR
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Marisa Kendra Glassman
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John R. Bevis
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Justin Hawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTORIA KEALY
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: David J. Worley
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost
Represented By: Kristi Stahnke McGregor
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER PASCUCCI DEMARCO
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: David J. Worley
Represented By: Howard Theodore Longman
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBIN D. PORTER
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: John Austin Moore
Represented By: Barrett Jay Vahle
Represented By: John R. Bevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SHIYANG HUANG
Represented By: Shiyang Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS
Represented By: Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ALICE M FLOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DAVID R. WATKINS
Represented By: Theodore H. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GEORGE WILLARD COCHRAN, JR.
Represented By: George Willard Cochran Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MIKELL WEST
Represented By: Jerome J. Froelich Jr.
Represented By: Robert William Clore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: THEODORE H. FRANK
Represented By: Theodore H. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOHN W. DAVIS
Represented By: John W. Davis
Represented By: Charles Benjamin Nutley
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HARALD SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAY EDELSON
Represented By: Ryan D. Andrews
Represented By: John Aaron Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?