Willie Sullen v. Jefferson Dunn, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ANGIE BAGGETT, Director of Classification, in her professional and individual capacity, SANDRA CONWAY, Director of Classification, in her professional and individual capacity, HURT, Bullock Classification Dept., in her professional and individual capacity, JEFFERSON S. DUNN, Commissioner, in his professional and individual capacity and LAWSON, Central Records, in her professional and individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE ARTHUR SULLEN
Case Number: 20-11486
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to J. Matt Bledsoe for Lawson, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sandra Conway, Angie Baggett and Hurt and Steven Marshall for Lawson, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sandra Conway, Angie Baggett and Hurt. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/19/2020 07:32 AM]
May 13, 2020 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen. [Entered: 05/15/2020 07:15 AM]
May 7, 2020 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9082516-1] [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:29 AM]
May 7, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen. [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:26 AM]
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Willie Arthur Sullen. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/05/2020 07:57 AM]
April 22, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen was filed on 04/21/2020. Docket Entry 59. [Entered: 04/22/2020 11:53 AM]
April 20, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen on 04/16/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/04/2020 as to Appellant Willie Arthur Sullen. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/18/2020 as to Appellee Angie Baggett [Entered: 04/22/2020 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie Sullen v. Jefferson Dunn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGIE BAGGETT, Director of Classification, in her professional and individual capacity
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA CONWAY, Director of Classification, in her professional and individual capacity
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HURT, Bullock Classification Dept., in her professional and individual capacity
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERSON S. DUNN, Commissioner, in his professional and individual capacity
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWSON, Central Records, in her professional and individual capacity
Represented By: J. Matt Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE ARTHUR SULLEN
Represented By: Willie Arthur Sullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?