Anthony Swain v. Daniel Junior, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: BAYARDO CRUZ, RONNIEL FLORES, ANTHONY SWAIN, WINFRED HILL and ALEN BLANCO
Defendant / Appellant: DANIEL JUNIOR and MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Amicus Curiae: MARTIN HORN, EMMITT SPARKMAN, JOHN PFAFF, ALEXANDER A. REINERT, SHARON DOLOVICH, BETSY GINSBERG, MARGO SCHLANGER, DAN PACHOLKE, BRIE WILLIAMS, ELDON VAIL, RICHARD MORGAN, STEVE MARTIN, PHIL STANLEY, JOSEPH GOLDENSON, AARON LITTMAN and ROBERT L. COHEN
Case Number: 20-11622
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 5, 2020 Summary Swain v. Junior
June 15, 2020 Summary Swain v. Junior

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file request for rehearing filed by Appellees Anthony Swain, Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores and Winfred Hill is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9113304-2 ] Petition for Rehearing due on 07/13/2020. [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:24 PM]
June 16, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file request for rehearing to 07/13/2020 filed by Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. Motion is Opposed. [9113304-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 06/16/2020 12:34 PM]
June 15, 2020 Judgment entered as to Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [Entered: 06/15/2020 11:20 AM]
June 15, 2020 Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Decision: Vacated and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 06/15/2020 11:12 AM]
June 11, 2020 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:40 PM]
June 10, 2020 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 06/10/2020 10:32 PM]
June 10, 2020 Response filed by Zachary Edward Vosseler for Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County pursuant to court order dated 06/09/2020. [20-11622] (ECF: Zachary Vosseler) [Entered: 06/10/2020 04:56 PM]
June 10, 2020 Response filed by Emma Simson for Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain pursuant to court order dated 06/09/2020. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 06/10/2020 04:46 PM]
June 9, 2020 Public Communication: The parties are directed to respond to the following question: By its terms, the district courts preliminary injunction, dated April 29, 2020, was set to expire 45 days from entry, which is Saturday, June 13, 2020. Will this case be moot on the following Monday, June 15, 2020? See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(1). Relatedly, does this Courts May 5, 2020 order stay the running of the 45-day period? (see attached letter for complete direction). [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:58 PM]
June 9, 2020 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Miami-Dade County and Daniel Junior and Emma Simson for Appellees Anthony Swain, Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores and Winfred Hill. [Entered: 06/09/2020 11:54 AM]
June 8, 2020 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellees Anthony Swain, Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores and Winfred Hill. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 06/07/2020 01:57 PM]
June 5, 2020 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Zachary Vosseler) [Entered: 06/05/2020 04:29 PM]
June 2, 2020 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curium Sharon Dolovich, Betsy Ginsberg, Aaron Littman, John Pfaff, Alexander A. Reinert and Margo Schlanger. Service date: 06/02/2020 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Giller, Jefferis, Kim; Attorney for Appellants: Greenberg, Hochstadt, Pastor, Rosenthal, Viciana, Vosseler, Zaron; Attorney for Appellees: Barnet, Karakatsanis, Rodriguez-Taseff, Sanoja, Simson, Smith, Volchok; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Harvey, Hubbard, Jagannath, Twinem, Yang. [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:59 AM]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file amicus brief of Eighth Amendment Scholars is GRANTED. [ # 9100234-2 ] BBM [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:24 AM]
June 1, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:38 PM]
June 1, 2020 Reply Brief filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:36 PM]
June 1, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Andrew Kim for Not Parties Sharon Dolovich, Betsy Ginsberg, Aaron Littman, John Pfaff, Alexander A. Reinert and Margo Schlanger. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Andrew Kim) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:39 AM]
June 1, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Andrew Kim for Not Parties Sharon Dolovich, Betsy Ginsberg, Aaron Littman, John Pfaff, Alexander A. Reinert and Margo Schlanger. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Andrew Kim) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:25 AM]
June 1, 2020 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Emma Simson for Appellees Deondre Willis and Peter Bernal Attorney Emma Simson for Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 06/01/2020 10:15 AM]
May 29, 2020 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Andrew Kim for Sharon Dolovich, Betsy Ginsberg, Aaron Littman, John Pfaff, Alexander A. Reinert and Margo Schlanger. [9100234-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Andrew Kim) [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:25 PM]
May 29, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Kim for Sharon Dolovich, Betsy Ginsberg, Aaron Littman, John Pfaff, Alexander A. Reinert and Margo Schlanger [20-11622] (ECF: Andrew Kim) [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:06 PM]
May 29, 2020 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curium M.D., M.D. and M.D.,M.S.. Service date: 05/29/2020 email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Giller; Attorney for Appellants: Greenberg, Hochstadt, Pastor, Rosenthal, Viciana, Vosseler, Zaron; Attorney for Appellees: Barnet, Karakatsanis, Rodriguez-Taseff, Sanoja, Simson, Smith, Volchok; Attorney for Not Party: Jefferis; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Harvey, Hubbard, Jagannath, Twinem, Yang. [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:30 PM]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Corrections Expert leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9098652-2 ] BBM [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:23 PM]
May 29, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Giller for Amicus Curium M.D., M.D. and M.D.,M.S.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11622] (ECF: David Giller) [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:21 PM]
May 29, 2020 Amicus Brief filed by Not Parties M.D., M.D. and M.D.,M.S.. Service date: 05/29/2020 email - Attorney for Appellants: Greenberg, Hochstadt, Pastor, Rosenthal, Viciana, Vosseler, Zaron; Attorney for Appellees: Barnet, Karakatsanis, Rodriguez-Taseff, Sanoja, Simson, Smith, Volchok; Attorney for Not Parties: Giller, Jefferis; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Harvey, Hubbard, Jagannath, Twinem, Yang. [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:40 PM]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file Public Health and Human Rights amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9098350-2 ] BBM [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:31 PM]
May 29, 2020 Corrected Appendix filed [2 volumes - 1 copies] by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Miami-Dade County and Daniel Junior. Service: 05/29/2020 email - Attorney for Appellants: Greenberg, Hochstadt, Pastor, Rosenthal, Viciana, Vosseler, Zaron; Attorney for Appellees: Barnet, Karakatsanis, Rodriguez-Taseff, Sanoja, Simson, Smith, Volchok; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Harvey, Hubbard, Jagannath, Twinem, Yang [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:24 AM]
May 29, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Danielle Jefferis for Not Parties Mr. Martin Horn, Mr. Steve Martin, Mr. Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Mr. Emmitt Sparkman, Mr. Phil Stanley and Eldon Vail. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Danielle Jefferis) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:19 AM]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellants Miami-Dade County and Daniel Junior is GRANTED. [ # 9098601-2 ] BBM [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:13 AM]
May 28, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Emma Simson for Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:23 PM]
May 28, 2020 Supplemental Appendix [2 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:21 PM]
May 28, 2020 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:09 PM]
May 28, 2020 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Danielle C. Jefferis for corrections experts Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, and Eldon Vail as amici curiae. [9098652-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Danielle Jefferis) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:16 PM]
May 28, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:58 PM]
May 28, 2020 MOTION to correct appendix filed by Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9098601-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:55 PM]
May 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Danielle C. Jefferis for corrections experts Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, and Eldon Vail as amici curiae [20-11622] (ECF: Danielle Jefferis) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:34 PM]
May 28, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney David Giller for Not Parties M.D., M.D. and M.D.,M.S.. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: David Giller) [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:56 PM]
May 28, 2020 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by David Giller for Amicus Parties Robert L. Cohen, M.D.; Joseph Goldenson, M.D.; and Brie Williams, M.D., M.S.. [9098350-1] [20-11622] (ECF: David Giller) [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:52 PM]
May 28, 2020 Corrected Appellant Initial brief filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Service date: 05/28/2020 email - Attorney for Appellants: Greenberg, Hochstadt, Pastor, Rosenthal, Viciana, Vosseler, Zaron; Attorney for Appellees: Barnet, Karakatsanis, Rodriguez-Taseff, Sanoja, Simson, Smith, Volchok; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Harvey, Hubbard, Jagannath, Twinem, Yang. [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:17 AM]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file corrected initial brief filed by Appellants Miami-Dade County and Daniel Junior is GRANTED. [ # 9097344-2 ] BBM [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:15 AM]
May 27, 2020 MOTION to correct or amend brief filed by Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9097344-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:59 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Giller for Amicus Parties Robert L. Cohen, M.D.; Joseph Goldenson, M.D.; and Brie Williams, M.D., M.S. [20-11622] (ECF: David Giller) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:44 PM]
May 26, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/26/2020 06:46 PM]
May 26, 2020 ***docketed in error***Corrected Appellant's Brief filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622]--[Edited 05/27/2020 by ST] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/26/2020 06:45 PM]
May 22, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:01 AM]
May 22, 2020 Appendix filed [FIVE VOLUMES] by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:00 AM]
May 20, 2020 Attorney Emma Simson for Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 06/09/2020. Emma Simson, 202-663-6026 will present argument. [20-11622] (ECF: Emma Simson) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:40 AM]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Daniel Volchok, Emma Simson and Emily Barnet each be allowed to file an appearance of counsel to represent the appellees in this appeal filed by Appellees Anthony Swain, Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores and Winfred Hill is GRANTED. [ # 9087388-2 ] Attorney(s) Daniel Stephen Volchok, Emma Simson, Emily Barnet for party(s) Appellee Winfred Hill Appellee Alen Blanco Appellee Bayardo Cruz Appellee Anthony Swain Appellee Ronniel Flores, in case 20-11622. David J. Smith, ENTERED FOR THE COURT-BY DIRECTION [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:11 AM]
May 18, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:47 PM]
May 18, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:46 PM]
May 18, 2020 Public Communication: Notice of telephonic arguments. [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:45 PM]
May 14, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9087388-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff) [Entered: 05/14/2020 05:47 PM]
May 7, 2020 Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 06/09/2020. Ezra Greenberg, 305-375-2994 will present argument. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:47 PM]
May 7, 2020 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 06/09/2020 Argument Location: Miami, FL. [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:46 AM]
May 7, 2020 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 06/08/2020 in Miami, Florida. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:03 AM]
May 6, 2020 Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Patricia Sanders as to Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Appeal "EXPEDITED" Transcript is due to be filed in District Court as soon as possible. [Entered: 05/06/2020 05:45 PM]
May 6, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:55 PM]
May 5, 2020 PUBLISHED ORDER: In conclusion, the defendants motion for a stay pending appeal and motion to expedite the appeal are GRANTED. The plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Oral Argument on Appellants Emergency Motion to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal is DENIED. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to expedite the appeal for merits disposition purposes and to schedule it for oral argument before the earliest available panel. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: the initial brief is due on May 18, 2020, the response brief is due on May 28, 2020, and the reply brief is due on June 1, 2020. No motions for extensions of time will be considered.(see attached Order for complete text) [ # 9076610-2 ] CRW, WHP and ELB: Wilson, Dissenting. [Entered: 05/05/2020 04:12 PM]
May 4, 2020 Notice of Completing the Record re: Emergency Motion to Stay filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/04/2020 03:29 PM]
May 4, 2020 Notice of Filing Additional Evidence In Support Of Appellees' Opposition To Emergency Motion To Stay Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Attorney Lida Rodriguez-Taseff for Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff) [Entered: 05/03/2020 07:54 PM]
May 4, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to request or set oral argument.sets oral argument filed by Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. Motion is Opposed. [9076610-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Alec Karakatsanis) [Entered: 05/02/2020 10:39 PM]
May 1, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Zachary Vosseler) [Entered: 05/01/2020 08:42 PM]
May 1, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County [ # 9075255-2 ] filed by Attorney Alec George Karakatsanis for Appellees Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Alec Karakatsanis) [Entered: 05/01/2020 04:53 PM]
May 1, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Daniel Junior, Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 04/06/2020 - 04/17/2020, Other Hearings 04/27/2020 - 04/28/2020. [Entered: 05/01/2020 04:44 PM]
May 1, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alec George Karakatsanis for Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff) [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:30 PM]
May 1, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lida Rodriguez-Taseff for Alen Blanco, Bayardo Cruz, Ronniel Flores, Winfred Hill and Anthony Swain. [20-11622] (ECF: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff) [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:28 PM]
May 1, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:01 PM]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Before this court is "Appellants' Opposed Emergency Motion to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal." Appellees' response to the motion is due by 5:00 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, May 1, 2020. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION [Entered: 04/30/2020 06:19 PM]
April 30, 2020 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Volumes XI-XX filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 04/30/2020 05:40 PM]
April 30, 2020 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal Volumes I-X filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 04/30/2020 05:24 PM]
April 30, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION for stay of injunction filed by Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. Motion is Opposed. [9075255-1] [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:01 PM]
April 30, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ezra Saul Greenberg for Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:14 PM]
April 30, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Zachary Edward Vosseler for Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Zachary Vosseler) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:03 PM]
April 30, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bernard Pastor for Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Bernard Pastor) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:01 PM]
April 30, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ezra Saul Greenberg for Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County. [20-11622] (ECF: Ezra Greenberg) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:49 PM]
April 30, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Oren Rosenthal for Appellant [20-11622] (ECF: Oren Rosenthal) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:43 PM]
April 30, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 04/29/2020 as to Appellant Daniel Junior. [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:24 PM]
April 30, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Daniel Junior and Miami-Dade County on 04/29/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/14/2020 as to Appellant Daniel Junior. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2020 as to Appellee Anthony Swain [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anthony Swain v. Daniel Junior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BAYARDO CRUZ
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Katherine A. Sanoja
Represented By: Meena Jagannath
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Rodney Quinn Smith II
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Volchok
Represented By: Emma Simson
Represented By: Emily Barnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONNIEL FLORES
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Katherine A. Sanoja
Represented By: Meena Jagannath
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Rodney Quinn Smith II
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Volchok
Represented By: Emma Simson
Represented By: Emily Barnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY SWAIN
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Katherine A. Sanoja
Represented By: Meena Jagannath
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Rodney Quinn Smith II
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Volchok
Represented By: Emma Simson
Represented By: Emily Barnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WINFRED HILL
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Katherine A. Sanoja
Represented By: Meena Jagannath
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Rodney Quinn Smith II
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Volchok
Represented By: Emma Simson
Represented By: Emily Barnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEN BLANCO
Represented By: Thomas B. Harvey
Represented By: Lida Rodriguez-Taseff
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Katherine A. Sanoja
Represented By: Meena Jagannath
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Rodney Quinn Smith II
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Volchok
Represented By: Emma Simson
Represented By: Emily Barnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DANIEL JUNIOR
Represented By: Erica S. Zaron
Represented By: Ana Angelica Viciana
Represented By: Jennifer L. Hochstadt
Represented By: Ezra Saul Greenberg
Represented By: Bernard Pastor
Represented By: Oren Rosenthal
Represented By: Zachary Edward Vosseler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Represented By: Erica S. Zaron
Represented By: Ana Angelica Viciana
Represented By: Jennifer L. Hochstadt
Represented By: Ezra Saul Greenberg
Represented By: Bernard Pastor
Represented By: Oren Rosenthal
Represented By: Zachary Edward Vosseler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN HORN
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMMITT SPARKMAN
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN PFAFF
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALEXANDER A. REINERT
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHARON DOLOVICH
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BETSY GINSBERG
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARGO SCHLANGER
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN PACHOLKE
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIE WILLIAMS
Represented By: David Giller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELDON VAIL
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD MORGAN
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVE MARTIN
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHIL STANLEY
Represented By: Danielle Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSEPH GOLDENSON
Represented By: David Giller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARON LITTMAN
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT L. COHEN
Represented By: David Giller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?