Jeffery Bell v. Sheriff of Broward County
Defendant / Appellee: SHERIFF OF BROWARD COUNTY, Gregory Tony
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEFFERY R. BELL
Case Number: 20-11958
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Carmen Maria Rodriguez for Appellee Sheriff of Broward County. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11958] (ECF: Carmen Rodriguez) [Entered: 05/29/2020 04:22 PM]
May 29, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carmen Maria Rodriguez for Sheriff of Broward County. [20-11958] (ECF: Carmen Rodriguez) [Entered: 05/29/2020 04:18 PM]
May 28, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert Buschel for Jeffery R. Bell Attorney Robert C. Buschel for Appellant Jeffery R. Bell. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11958] (ECF: Robert Buschel) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:51 PM]
May 28, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert C. Buschel for Appellant Jeffery R. Bell. [20-11958] (ECF: Robert Buschel) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:26 PM]
May 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Buschel for Jeffery R. Bell Robert C. Buschel for Jeffery R. Bell. [20-11958] (ECF: Robert Buschel) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:22 PM]
May 28, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Robert C. Buschel for Appellant Jeffery R. Bell. No hearings. [20-11958] (ECF: Robert Buschel) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:20 PM]
May 26, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jeffery R. Bell on 05/23/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/06/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/09/2020 as to Appellant Jeffery R. Bell. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/23/2020 as to Appellee Sheriff of Broward County [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffery Bell v. Sheriff of Broward County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERIFF OF BROWARD COUNTY, Gregory Tony
Represented By: David L. Ferguson
Represented By: Carmen Maria Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFERY R. BELL
Represented By: Eugene George Gibbons
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?