Aaron White v. Best Buy, et al
Defendant / Appellee: APPLE, INC., GOOGLE, BEST BUY, WALMART CORPORATION, AMAZON.COM, INC. and YOUTUBE, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: AARON DEMARCUS WHITE
Case Number: 20-12674
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Notice of receipt: Notice to the Court as to Appellant Aaron Demarcus White - NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN. [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:04 PM]
September 4, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Aaron Demarcus White. [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:02 PM]
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Aaron Demarcus White. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:35 AM]
August 28, 2020 DOCKETED IN ERROR.--[Edited 08/28/2020 by TLS] [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:34 AM]
August 5, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Aaron Demarcus White. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/09/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:24 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Aaron Demarcus White. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:33 PM]
August 5, 2020 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Filer: Aaron D. White, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 07/31/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 07/16/2020. [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:29 PM]
August 5, 2020 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Aaron Demarcus White was filed on 07/16/2020. Docket Entry 20. [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:25 PM]
July 29, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Aaron D. White, Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 07/16/2020. [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:28 AM]
July 21, 2020 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Aaron White was filed on 07/17/2020. Docket Entry 15. [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:22 PM]
July 17, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Aaron White on 07/17/2020. Fee Status: IFP Pending. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/31/2020 as to Appellant Aaron White [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aaron White v. Best Buy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEST BUY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALMART CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YOUTUBE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON DEMARCUS WHITE
Represented By: Aaron Demarcus White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?