Roderick Lester v. USA
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner / Appellant: RODERICK RANDOLPH LESTER
Case Number: 20-12694
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester. [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:47 AM]
August 24, 2020 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9173499-1] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:32 AM]
August 24, 2020 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9173492-1] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:31 AM]
August 24, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester. [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:30 AM]
August 13, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Roderick Randolph Lester. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:03 AM]
July 31, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dawn A. Tiffin for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12694] (ECF: Dawn Tiffin) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:23 PM]
July 31, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dawn A. Tiffin for USA [20-12694] (ECF: Dawn Tiffin) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:22 PM]
July 20, 2020 USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester was filed on 04/20/2020. Docket Entry 18. [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:35 AM]
July 20, 2020 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Roderick Randolph Lester on 07/20/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roderick Lester v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Dawn A. Tiffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RODERICK RANDOLPH LESTER
Represented By: Roderick Randolph Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?