Darryl Vachon v. Travelers Home and Marine Ins.
Defendant / Appellant: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellee: DARRYL A. VACHON
Case Number: 20-12765
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:45 PM]
August 24, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Tracy Raffles Gunn for Appellee Darryl A. Vachon. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12765] (ECF: Tracy Gunn) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:24 PM]
August 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lee Delton Gunn, IV for Darryl A. Vachon. [20-12765] (ECF: Lee Gunn) [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:56 PM]
August 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimble Clark Bouchillon for Darryl A. Vachon. [20-12765] (ECF: Kimble Bouchillon) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:46 AM]
August 10, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:02 PM]
August 7, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jack Roy Reiter for Appellant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. [20-12765] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/07/2020 05:56 PM]
August 7, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jack Roy Reiter for Appellant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12765] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/07/2020 05:47 PM]
August 7, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jack Roy Reiter for Appellant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. No hearings. [20-12765] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:02 PM]
August 7, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack Roy Reiter for Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. [20-12765] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:00 PM]
July 28, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Tracy Raffles Gunn for Appellee [20-12765] (ECF: Tracy Gunn) [Entered: 07/28/2020 03:42 PM]
July 24, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 07/24/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/02/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/07/2020 as to Appellant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/21/2020 as to Appellee Darryl A. Vachon [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darryl Vachon v. Travelers Home and Marine Ins.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jack Roy Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARRYL A. VACHON
Represented By: Kimble Clark Bouchillon
Represented By: Tracy Raffles Gunn
Represented By: Lee Delton Gunn IV
Represented By: Scott Andrew Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?