Uzezi Ajomale v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: UZEZI AJOMALE
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Defendant / Appellee: QUICKEN LOANS, INC.
Case Number: 20-12952
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Uzezi Ajomale. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/19/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/10/2020 09:43 AM]
September 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cheryl Powell, Filer: Uzezi Ajomale, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/09/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/22/2020. [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:42 PM]
September 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Uzezi Ajomale, Court Reporter: Cheryl Powell, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 05/22/2020. [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:41 PM]
September 3, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney William M. Jay for Appellee Quicken Loans, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12952] (ECF: William Jay) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:25 PM]
August 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/28/2020 05:51 PM]
August 20, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12952] (ECF: Earl Underwood) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:57 PM]
August 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Uzezi Ajomale. [20-12952] (ECF: Earl Underwood) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:39 AM]
August 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas L. McCoy for Quicken Loans, Inc.. [20-12952] (ECF: Douglas McCoy) [Entered: 08/18/2020 05:39 PM]
August 18, 2020 Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Uzezi Ajomale. Document filed without filing Appearance of Counsel Form. Please file an appearance in this appeal by using the Court's appearance of counsel form. [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:27 PM]
August 17, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Earl Price Underwood, Jr. for Appellant Uzezi Ajomale. [20-12952] (ECF: Earl Underwood) [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:47 AM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Tierney Smith for Quicken Loans, LLC, f/k/a Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-12952] (ECF: Tierney Smith) [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:39 PM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edwina B. Clarke for Quicken Loans, LLC, f/k/a Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-12952] (ECF: Edwina Clarke) [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:33 PM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph F. Yenouskas for Quicken Loans, LLC, f/k/a Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-12952] (ECF: Joseph Yenouskas) [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:15 PM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brooks R. Brown for Quicken Loans, LLC, f/k/a Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-12952] (ECF: Brooks Brown) [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:12 PM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William M. Jay for Quicken Loans, LLC, f/k/a Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-12952] (ECF: William Jay) [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:05 PM]
August 7, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 08/04/2020 as to Appellant Uzezi Ajomale. [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:20 PM]
August 6, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Uzezi Ajomale on 08/04/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2020 as to Appellant Uzezi Ajomale. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/03/2020 as to Appellee Quicken Loans, Inc. [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Uzezi Ajomale v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UZEZI AJOMALE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Represented By: Earl Price Underwood Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Represented By: Christopher Scott Tribbey Jr.
Represented By: Christi A. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUICKEN LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Brooks R. Brown
Represented By: Joseph F. Yenouskas
Represented By: Edward T. Rowe
Represented By: Douglas L. McCoy
Represented By: Edwina Clarke
Represented By: Tierney E. Smith
Represented By: William M. Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?