Susan Smith v. Attorney General, State of Ala, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, a governmental agency and LUTHER STRANGE, in his individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUSAN SMITH
Case Number: 20-13121
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Blake Edward Brookshire for Attorney General, State of Alabama and Luther Strange. [20-13121] (ECF: Blake Brookshire) [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:15 PM]
October 6, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Susan Smith. [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:08 PM]
October 5, 2020 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Susan Smith. [20-13121]--[Edited 10/06/2020 by BWH] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:16 PM]
October 5, 2020 Appendix filed [Volume I VOLUMES] by Appellant Susan Smith. [20-13121] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:45 AM]
September 28, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Susan Smith. [20-13121] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:05 PM]
September 18, 2020 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Susan Smith. [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:55 AM]
September 17, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 09/17/2020 07:33 PM]
September 14, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barbara J. Wells for Attorney General, State of Alabama and Luther Strange. [20-13121] (ECF: Barbara Wells) [Entered: 09/14/2020 12:55 PM]
September 14, 2020 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Barbara J. Wells for Attorney General, State of Alabama and Luther Strange. Please file the Appearance of Counsel form. [Entered: 09/14/2020 12:45 PM]
September 14, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13121] (ECF: Barbara Wells) [Entered: 09/14/2020 08:48 AM]
August 31, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Heather Newsom Leonard for Appellant Susan Smith. [20-13121] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:23 PM]
August 31, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Heather Newsom Leonard for Appellant Susan Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13121] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:05 PM]
August 31, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Heather Newsom Leonard for Susan Smith. [20-13121] (ECF: Heather Leonard) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:00 PM]
August 24, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Susan Smith. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/28/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:02 PM]
August 24, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 08/21/2020 as to Appellant Susan Smith. [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:36 AM]
August 24, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Heather Newsom Leonard for Appellant Susan Smith. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:59 AM]
August 19, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Susan Smith on 08/14/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/02/2020 as to Appellant Susan Smith. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/16/2020 as to Appellee Attorney General, State of Alabama [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Smith v. Attorney General, State of Ala, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, a governmental agency
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Alice A. Byrne
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Represented By: Barbara J. Wells
Represented By: Laury Baswell Morgan
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUTHER STRANGE, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Alice A. Byrne
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Represented By: Barbara J. Wells
Represented By: Laury Baswell Morgan
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN SMITH
Represented By: Heather Newsom Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?