Deandre Jackson v. JPAY, INC., et al
Defendant / Appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JPAY, INC. and UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEANDRE LOVERTUR JACKSON
Case Number: 20-13309
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Deandre Lovertur Jackson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9224052-1] [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:09 PM]
October 2, 2020 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN because appeal is closed Notice of receipt: Declaration in support of IFP as to Appellant Deandre Lovertur Jackson. [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:58 AM]
October 2, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Deandre Lovertur Jackson. [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:57 AM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Deandre Lovertur Jackson failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/29/2020 08:43 AM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan Adam Heller for JPAY, INC.. [20-13309] (ECF: Jonathan Heller) [Entered: 09/17/2020 05:54 PM]
September 17, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kelly M. Pena for Virginia Department of Corrections [20-13309] (ECF: Kelly Pena) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:49 AM]
September 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Deandre Lovertur Jackson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:24 AM]
September 2, 2020 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Deandre Lovertur Jackson on 08/31/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Deandre Jackson v. JPAY, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Michael Richard Tricarico
Represented By: Kelly Marie Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPAY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEANDRE LOVERTUR JACKSON
Represented By: Augusta Correctional Center Warden
Represented By: Deandre Lovertur Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?