USA v. Mark Morrow
Defendant / Appellant: MARK MORROW
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-13929
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cynthia Smith for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13929] (ECF: Cynthia Smith) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:09 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cynthia Beckwith Smith for USA [20-13929] (ECF: Cynthia Smith) [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:47 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for USA [20-13929] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:37 PM]
October 20, 2020 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mark Morrow on 10/20/2020. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Appellant brief due 40 days from 10/20/2020. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Mark Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK MORROW
Represented By: Brian Mendelsohn
Represented By: Stephanie A. Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Cynthia Smith
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth McBath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?