John Klaas, et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUZANNE WILLINGHAM, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, HERBERT VIDALES, DAVID R. SANGSTON, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, JAMES CARTRETTE, HERB WOFFORD, TERRY G. MOUNTFORD, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, FRANK M. BERARDI, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, JOHN E. KLAAS, CHARLIE DRAKE, DONALD KERR, TED SPEIWAK, BILL HUFF, GARNET TURNER, VERNON BENTLEY, KATHY SHEPHERD, RICHARD SCHOLL and ALBERTA NIXON
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Defendant / Appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 20-14104
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Christopher Boyce Hood for Appellants Garnet Turner, Suzanne Willingham, Donald Kerr, James Cartrette, Bill Huff, Kathy Shepherd, Vernon Bentley, Ted Speiwak, Herb Wofford, Alberta Nixon, Charlie Drake, Herbert Vidales and Richard Scholl and Robert Jay Pearl for Appellant John E. Klaas. Appendix due on 01/19/2021. [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:32 PM]
December 29, 2020 Appellant's corrected brief filed by John E. Klaas. [20-14104]--[Edited 12/29/2020 by MLM] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:26 PM]
December 29, 2020 Public Communication: Appellant John Klass' brief is missing the Summary of the Argument. The opening brief shall contain a Summary of Argument, suitably paragraphed, which should be a clear, accurate and succinct condensation of the argument made in the body of the brief. It should not be a mere repetition of the heading under which the argument is arranged. It should seldom exceed two and never five pages. Please make necessary corrections and re-upload the entire corrected brief and submit the required number of corrected paper copies within fourteen days. [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:59 AM]
December 28, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by Vernon Bentley, James Cartrette, Bill Huff, Richard Scholl, Kathy Shepherd, Ted Speiwak, Garnet Turner and Herbert Vidales. [20-14104] (ECF: Christopher Hood) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:51 PM]
December 28, 2020 SEE CORRECTED BRIEF DATED 12/29/2020. Appellant's brief filed by John E. Klaas. [20-14104]--[Edited 12/29/2020 by MLM] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:16 PM]
December 28, 2020 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Charlie Drake, Donald Kerr, Alberta Nixon, Suzanne Willingham and Herb Wofford. Motion is Unopposed. [9269536-1] [20-14104] (ECF: Christopher Hood) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:36 PM]
December 17, 2020 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants Frank M. Berardi, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston's (ONLY) motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 12/17/2020 12:35 PM]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Frank M. Berardi, David R. Sangston and Terry G. Mountford (only), is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9258803-2 ] [Entered: 12/17/2020 12:33 PM]
December 11, 2020 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Frank M. Berardi, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston. Motion is Unopposed. [9258803-1] [20-14104] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:46 PM]
December 10, 2020 14-Day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Robert Jay Pearl for Appellants John E. Klaas, Frank M. Berardi, David R. Sangston and Terry G. Mountford. Appellants brief due on 12/28/2020 as to Appellant John E. Klaas. Appendix due on 01/04/2021 as to Appellant John E. Klaas. [Entered: 12/10/2020 12:04 PM]
December 10, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Jay Pearl for Frank M. Berardi, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston. [20-14104] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:53 AM]
December 10, 2020 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Christopher Boyce Hood for Appellants Garnet Turner, Suzanne Willingham, Donald Kerr, James Cartrette, Bill Huff, Kathy Shepherd, Vernon Bentley, Ted Speiwak, Herb Wofford, Alberta Nixon, Charlie Drake, Herbert Vidales and Richard Scholl. Appellants brief due on 12/28/2020 as to Appellant Vernon Bentley. Appendix due on 01/04/2021 as to Appellant Vernon Bentley. [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:12 AM]
December 9, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [20-14104, 20-14105] [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:54 PM]
December 3, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Vernon Bentley, Frank M. Berardi, James Cartrette, Charlie Drake, Bill Huff, Donald Kerr, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford, Alberta Nixon, David R. Sangston, Richard Scholl, Kathy Shepherd, Ted Speiwak, Garnet Turner, Herbert Vidales, Suzanne Willingham and Herb Wofford. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/14/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants brief. [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:45 AM]
November 30, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14104] (ECF: Richard Fenton) [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:32 PM]
November 24, 2020 TRANSCRIPTS ALREADY FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Risa Entrekin, Filer: Garnet Turner, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/17/2015. DKT ENTRY #91 [Entered: 11/24/2020 01:35 PM]
November 18, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert Jay Pearl for Appellants Frank M. Berardi, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston. [20-14104] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:02 PM]
November 18, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Boyce Hood for Appellants Vernon Bentley, James Cartrette, Charlie Drake, Bill Huff, Donald Kerr, Alberta Nixon, Richard Scholl, Kathy Shepherd, Ted Speiwak, Garnet Turner, Herbert Vidales, Suzanne Willingham and Herb Wofford. [20-14104] (ECF: Christopher Hood) [Entered: 11/18/2020 05:17 PM]
November 18, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Garnet Turner, Suzanne Willingham, Donald Kerr, James Cartrette, Bill Huff, Kathy Shepherd, Vernon Bentley, Ted Speiwak, Herb Wofford, Alberta Nixon, Charlie Drake, Herbert Vidales and Richard Scholl is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:03 AM]
November 16, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Klaas, et al. Attorney Robert Jay Pearl for Appellants Frank M. Berardi, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14104] (ECF: Robert Pearl) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:55 PM]
November 13, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wade P. K. Carr for Allstate Insurance Company [20-14104] (ECF: Wade Carr) [Entered: 11/13/2020 05:58 PM]
November 13, 2020 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Garnet Turner, Suzanne Willingham, Donald Kerr, James Cartrette, Bill Huff, Kathy Shepherd, Vernon Bentley, Ted Speiwak, Herb Wofford, Alberta Nixon, Charlie Drake, Herbert Vidales and Richard Scholl is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed.--[Edited 11/18/2020 by RAV] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:49 PM]
November 13, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Garnet Turner, Court Reporter: Risa Entrekin, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/17/2015. [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:41 PM]
November 13, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Robert Jay Pearl for Appellants John E. Klaas, Frank M. Berardi, David R. Sangston and Terry G. Mountford. No hearings. [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:35 PM]
November 12, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Christopher Boyce Hood for Appellants Vernon Bentley, James Cartrette, Charlie Drake, Bill Huff, Donald Kerr, Alberta Nixon, Richard Scholl, Kathy Shepherd, Ted Speiwak, Garnet Turner, Herbert Vidales, Suzanne Willingham and Herb Wofford. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-14104] (ECF: Christopher Hood) [Entered: 11/11/2020 06:17 PM]
November 10, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David James Middlebrooks for Allstate Insurance Company. [20-14104] (ECF: David Middlebrooks) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:57 AM]
November 9, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard L. Fenton - Appellee [20-14104] (ECF: Richard Fenton) [Entered: 11/09/2020 05:26 PM]
November 9, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Uchenna Ekuma-Nkama - Appellee [20-14104] (ECF: Uchenna Ekuma-Nkama) [Entered: 11/09/2020 05:03 PM]
November 9, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Albert L. Vreeland, II for Allstate Insurance Company [20-14104] (ECF: Albert Vreeland) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:39 PM]
November 5, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 11/04/2020 as to Appellants Frank M. Berardi, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston. [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:29 AM]
November 4, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 10/30/2020 as to Appellant Vernon Bentley. [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:00 PM]
November 4, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Robert Jay Pearl for Appellants John E. Klaas, Frank M. Berardi, David R. Sangston and Terry G. Mountford. No hearings. [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:44 AM]
November 2, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Vernon Bentley, James Cartrette, Charlie Drake, Bill Huff, Donald Kerr, Alberta Nixon, Richard Scholl, Kathy Shepherd, Ted Speiwak, Garnet Turner, Herbert Vidales, Suzanne Willingham and Herb Wofford on 10/29/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:37 AM]
November 2, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Frank M. Berardi, John E. Klaas, Terry G. Mountford and David R. Sangston on 10/29/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/16/2020 as to Appellant Frank M. Berardi. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/30/2020 as to Appellee Allstate Insurance Company [Entered: 11/04/2020 10:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Klaas, et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUZANNE WILLINGHAM, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: B. Glenn Murdock
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Represented By: Billy G. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HERBERT VIDALES
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID R. SANGSTON, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Kearney Dee Hutsler III
Represented By: Robert Jay Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES CARTRETTE
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HERB WOFFORD
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY G. MOUNTFORD, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Kearney Dee Hutsler III
Represented By: Robert Jay Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK M. BERARDI, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Kearney Dee Hutsler III
Represented By: Robert Jay Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN E. KLAAS
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Kearney Dee Hutsler III
Represented By: Robert Jay Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLIE DRAKE
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD KERR
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TED SPEIWAK
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BILL HUFF
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARNET TURNER
Represented By: B. Glenn Murdock
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Represented By: Billy G. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VERNON BENTLEY
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHY SHEPHERD
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD SCHOLL
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERTA NIXON
Represented By: Taylor Bartlett
Represented By: Jeanie Snipes Sleadd
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Yale Taitz Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David James Middlebrooks
Represented By: Anne E. Rea
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Meyer
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Uchenna Ekuma-Nkama
Represented By: Albert Loring Vreeland II
Represented By: Wade Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?