Jennifer Cromartie v. Adrian Baker, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ADRIAN BAKER, JONATHAN BIRMINGHAM, TERMAINE BALDWIN, QUINETTER SMITH, SHAKITA BOZEMAN, SONJA ROSE, LAGRETA MCCLAIN, TERRAL BROWN, BRANDON THORNTON, DEIDRA WRIGHT, JULIA TUTWILER PRISON FOR WOMEN, NAPOLEAN GOODSON, TRACY FLOYD, BRIAN COLEMAN, KENNETH R. DRAKE and DARRYL FINCH
Plaintiff / Appellant: JENNIFER CROMARTIE and JENNIFER JEAN CROMARTIE
Case Number: 20-14174
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mary A. Goldthwaite for Appellees Adrian Baker, Termaine Baldwin, Jonathan Birmingham, Lagreta McClain, Sonja Rose and Quinetter Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14174] (ECF: Mary Goldthwaite) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:30 PM]
December 7, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary A. Goldthwaite for Adrian Baker, Termaine Baldwin, Jonathan Birmingham, Lagreta McClain, Sonja Rose and Quinetter Smith. [20-14174] (ECF: Mary Goldthwaite) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:29 PM]
December 2, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robbie Alexander Hyde for Appellee Shakita Bozeman. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14174] (ECF: Robbie Hyde) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:04 PM]
December 2, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robbie Alexander Hyde for Shakita Bozeman. [20-14174] (ECF: Robbie Hyde) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:02 PM]
November 27, 2020 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Jennifer Jean Cromartie. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9250233-1] [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:35 AM]
November 27, 2020 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jennifer Jean Cromartie. [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:32 AM]
November 10, 2020 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Jennifer Cromartie was filed on 11/05/2020. Docket Entry 77. [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:33 PM]
November 5, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jennifer Cromartie on 11/02/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/19/2020 as to Appellant Jennifer Cromartie. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/03/2020 as to Appellees Adrian Baker and Shakita Bozeman [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jennifer Cromartie v. Adrian Baker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADRIAN BAKER
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN BIRMINGHAM
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERMAINE BALDWIN
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUINETTER SMITH
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAKITA BOZEMAN
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONJA ROSE
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAGRETA MCCLAIN
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRAL BROWN
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDON THORNTON
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEIDRA WRIGHT
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIA TUTWILER PRISON FOR WOMEN
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAPOLEAN GOODSON
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY FLOYD
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN COLEMAN
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH R. DRAKE
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARRYL FINCH
Represented By: Mary A. Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER CROMARTIE
Represented By: Jennifer Cromartie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER JEAN CROMARTIE
Represented By: Jennifer Jean Cromartie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?