Ryan Maglana, et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA, on his own behalf and as a class representatives of all other similarly situated Filipino crewmembers trapped aboard CELEBRITY cruise vessels and FRANCIS KARL BUGAYONG, on his own behalf and as a class representatives of all other similarly situated Filipino crewmembers trapped aboard CELEBRITY cruise vessels
Defendant / Appellee: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Case Number: 20-14206
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Evan Gutwein for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [20-14206] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:10 PM]
December 3, 2020 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce for Appellee Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14206] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:07 AM]
December 3, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce for Appellee Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14206] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 12/03/2020 08:50 AM]
December 2, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Jerry Dean Hamilton for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:31 PM]
December 2, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jerry Dean Hamilton for Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. [20-14206] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:36 PM]
November 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alex M. Gonzalez for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. Sanford L. Bohrer for Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Michael John Dono for Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Annalisa Gutierrez for Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Jerry Dean Hamilton for Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Scott Daniel Ponce for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. and Raul Gabriel Delgado, II for Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana and Philip D. Parrish for Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana. [20-14206] (ECF: Alex Gonzalez) [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:14 AM]
November 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. [20-14206] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:35 AM]
November 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford L. Bohrer for Appellee [20-14206] (ECF: Sanford Bohrer) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:33 AM]
November 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Raul Gabriel Delgado, II for Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana. [20-14206] (ECF: Raul Delgado) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:59 PM]
November 18, 2020 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/18/2020 01:03 PM]
November 13, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael John Dono for Celebrity Cruises Inc. [20-14206] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:49 PM]
November 12, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Philip D. Parrish for Appellants Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana. [20-14206] (ECF: Philip Parrish) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:18 AM]
November 12, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Philip D. Parrish, Esq. for Appellants. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14206] (ECF: Philip Parrish) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:17 AM]
November 12, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip D. Parrish for Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana. [20-14206] (ECF: Philip Parrish) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:10 AM]
November 6, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Francis Karl Bugayong and Ryan Maunes Maglana on 11/05/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/16/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/20/2020 as to Appellant Francis Karl Bugayong. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/04/2020 as to Appellee Celebrity Cruises, Inc. [Entered: 11/10/2020 08:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ryan Maglana, et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN MAUNES MAGLANA, on his own behalf and as a class representatives of all other similarly situated Filipino crewmembers trapped aboard CELEBRITY cruise vessels
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado II
Represented By: Philip D. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCIS KARL BUGAYONG, on his own behalf and as a class representatives of all other similarly situated Filipino crewmembers trapped aboard CELEBRITY cruise vessels
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado II
Represented By: Philip D. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Annalisa Gutierrez
Represented By: Evan Seth Gutwein
Represented By: Michael John Dono
Represented By: Sanford L. Bohrer
Represented By: Alex Mario Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?