USA v. Mordechai Korf, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: OPTIMA 777, LLC, FELMAN TRADING, INC., CHAIM SHOCHET, OPTIMA 1300, LLC, OPTIMA CBD INVESTMENTS, LLC, GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS MANAGEMENT, LLC, CC METALS AND ALLOYS, LLC, OPTIMA INTERNATINAL, LLC, OPTIMA GROUP, FELMAN TRADING AMERICAS, INC.,, GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS SARL, NIAGARA LASALLE CORPORATION, OPTIMA 500, LLC, OPTIMA VENTURES, LLC, OPTIMA 1375 II, LLC, FELMAN PRODUCTIONS, LLC, GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS, INC., OPTIMA 925 II, LLC, OPTIMA 1375, LLC, MORDECHAI KORF, OPTIMA 925, LLC, OPTIMA MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, URIEL LABER, CBD 500, LLC, OPTIMA ACQUISITIONS, LLC, OPTIMA HOSPITALITY, LLC, OPTIMA 55 PUBLIC SQUARE, LLC, OPTIMA FIXED INCOME, LLC and OPTIMA 7171, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-14223
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 30, 2021 Summary United States v. Korf

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellee USA is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9277409-2 ] Appellees brief due on 02/04/2021. [Entered: 01/08/2021 09:21 AM]
January 8, 2021 Notice of Intent to File Reply to Government's Opposition to Motion for Stay filed by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:31 PM]
January 7, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file appellee's brief to 02/04/2021, to expedite oral argument filed by USA. Motion is Unopposed. [9277409-1] [20-14223] (ECF: Shai Bronshtein) [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:10 PM]
January 6, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to stay lower court proceedings filed by Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet [ # 9268510-2 ] filed by Attorney Shai Bronshtein for Appellee USA. [20-14223] (ECF: Shai Bronshtein) [Entered: 01/06/2021 08:58 PM]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file response to motion filed by Appellee USA is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9269793-2 ] Response is due 01/06/2021. [Entered: 12/29/2020 08:26 AM]
December 28, 2020 Public Communication: Appellee's response to Appellant's Motion to Stay Lower Court Proceedings / Stay Pending Appeal is due December 30, 2020. [Entered: 12/28/2020 08:33 AM]
December 28, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:52 PM]
December 28, 2020 Appendix filed [Two VOLUMES] by Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:41 PM]
December 28, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion to 12/28/2020 filed by USA. Motion is Unopposed. [9269793-1] [20-14223] (ECF: Shai Bronshtein) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:12 PM]
December 23, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to stay lower court proceedings filed by CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9268508-1] [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/23/2020 07:37 PM]
December 23, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to stay lower court proceedings filed by CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC and Chaim Shochet. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9268510-1] [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:01 PM]
December 22, 2020 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Benjamin Samuel Waxman for CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC, Uriel Laber, Chaim Shochet, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima Group, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC and CBD 500, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 12/22/2020 07:54 AM]
December 21, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benjamin S. Waxman, Attorney for Appellants, Mordechai Korf, et. al. [20-14223] (ECF: Benjamin Waxman) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:24 PM]
December 21, 2020 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC and Optima Ventures, LLC. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:13 PM]
December 21, 2020 Appellant's brief filed by CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC, Uriel Laber and Chaim Shochet. [20-14223]--[Edited 12/22/2020 by TLS] Added Uriel Laber, Chaim Shochet to text of brief. (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:10 PM]
December 10, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Shai Bronshtein for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14223] (ECF: Shai Bronshtein) [Entered: 12/10/2020 03:53 PM]
December 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Shai Bronshtein for USA and U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:12 PM]
November 23, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Scott Alan Srebnick for Appellant Uriel Laber. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:25 PM]
November 23, 2020 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC, Chaim Shochet and optima 925, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/21/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:32 PM]
November 23, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC and Optima Ventures, LLC. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:01 PM]
November 23, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC and Optima Ventures, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:55 PM]
November 20, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Howard M. Srebnick for CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC and Optima Ventures, LLC. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:54 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Howard M. Srebnick for Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, optima 925, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC and Optima Ventures, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [20-14223] (ECF: Howard Srebnick) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:21 PM]
November 19, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shai Bronshtein for USA. [20-14223] (ECF: Shai Bronshtein) [Entered: 11/19/2020 02:03 PM]
November 10, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants CBD 500, LLC, CC Metals and Alloys, LLC, Felman Productions, LLC, Felman Trading Americas, Inc.,, Felman Trading, Inc., Georgian American Alloys Management, LLC, Georgian American Alloys Sarl, Georgian American Alloys, Inc., Mordechai Korf, Uriel Laber, Niagara LaSalle Corporation, Optima 1300, LLC, Optima 1375 II, LLC, Optima 1375, LLC, Optima 500, LLC, Optima 55 Public Square, LLC, Optima 7171, LLC, Optima 777, LLC, Optima 925 II, LLC, Optima Acquisitions, LLC, Optima CBD Investments, LLC, Optima Fixed Income, LLC, Optima Group, Optima Hospitality, LLC, Optima Internatinal, LLC, Optima Management Group, LLC, Optima Ventures, LLC, Chaim Shochet and optima 925, LLC on 11/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/24/2020 as to Appellant CBD 500, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/08/2020 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Mordechai Korf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 777, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FELMAN TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHAIM SHOCHET
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 1300, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA CBD INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CC METALS AND ALLOYS, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA INTERNATINAL, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA GROUP
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FELMAN TRADING AMERICAS, INC.,
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS SARL
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NIAGARA LASALLE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 500, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA VENTURES, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 1375 II, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FELMAN PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GEORGIAN AMERICAN ALLOYS, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 925 II, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 1375, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MORDECHAI KORF
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 925, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: URIEL LABER
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Scott Alan Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CBD 500, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA HOSPITALITY, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 55 PUBLIC SQUARE, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA FIXED INCOME, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OPTIMA 7171, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul
Represented By: Ronald R. Rossi
Represented By: Robert T. Dunlap
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Represented By: Marc E. Kasowitz
Represented By: Howard M. Srebnick
Represented By: Sarmad M. Khojasteh
Represented By: Benjamin Samuel Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Represented By: Shai Bronshtein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?