Peggy Griffin, et al v. BP Exploration & Production, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRYANT HAND, JR., CHASON NORRIS, DERRICK LEE, GREGORY WARREN, JAMES COOPER, CALVIN NETTLES, JACKIE ROBERTSON, DEWAYNE VEASEY, DOROTHY LYNN HILL, MICHAEL TURNER, LINDA SINGLETON and PEGGY A. GRIFFIN
Defendant / Appellee: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY and BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Case Number: 20-14544
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/14/2021 05:19 PM]
January 8, 2021 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Natasha N. Harrison for Appellants Michael Turner, Peggy A. Griffin, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Gregory Warren, James Cooper, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee and Dewayne Veasey. IN RE: Docketing letter [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:08 PM]
January 6, 2021 28-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Appellants Michael Turner, Peggy A. Griffin, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Gregory Warren, James Cooper, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee and Dewayne Veasey. Appellants brief due on 02/10/2021 as to Appellant James Cooper. Appendix due on 02/17/2021 as to Appellant James Cooper. [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:58 PM]
January 5, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants James Cooper, Peggy A. Griffin, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Michael Turner, Dewayne Veasey and Gregory Warren. The appellants' brief is due on or before 01/13/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 01/05/2021 09:48 AM]
January 5, 2021 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Donna Boland, Filer: James Cooper, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 12/04/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 03/30/2020. [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:01 AM]
December 30, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McDonald, Francis M., Jr., BP Exploration & Production Inc. & BP America Production Company, Appellees.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [20-14544] (ECF: Francis McDonald) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:18 AM]
December 29, 2020 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Appellants James Cooper, Peggy A. Griffin, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Michael Turner, Dewayne Veasey and Gregory Warren. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [20-14544] (ECF: Allen Lindsay) [Entered: 12/29/2020 01:13 PM]
December 29, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Appellants James Cooper, Peggy A. Griffin, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Michael Turner, Dewayne Veasey and Gregory Warren. [20-14544] (ECF: Allen Lindsay) [Entered: 12/29/2020 01:11 PM]
December 28, 2020 Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Donna Boland as to Appellant James Cooper. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 12/04/2020. [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:41 AM]
December 25, 2020 Civil Appeal Statement and CIP filed by Attorney Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Appellants Michael Turner, Peggy A. Griffin, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Gregory Warren, James Cooper, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee and Dewayne Veasey were filed along with the appearance of counsel form in error. Each document must be filed as a separate filing through CM/ECF. [Entered: 12/25/2020 09:46 AM]
December 22, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George W. Hicks, Jr. for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [20-14544] (ECF: George Hicks) [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:46 PM]
December 21, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Jessica Marie Kennedy for Appellees BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company. IN RE: Docketing letter [Entered: 12/25/2020 08:44 AM]
December 21, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for James Cooper, Peggy A. Griffin, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Michael Turner, Dewayne Veasey and Gregory Warren. [20-14544] (ECF: Allen Lindsay) [Entered: 12/21/2020 06:57 PM]
December 18, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Francis M. McDonald, Jr. for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc and Sarah A. Long for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [20-14544] (ECF: Francis McDonald) [Entered: 12/18/2020 09:07 AM]
December 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Frank Jacob D'Amico for Michael Turner, Peggy A. Griffin, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Gregory Warren, James Cooper, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee and Dewayne Veasey. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/18/2020 08:17 AM]
December 7, 2020 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: James Cooper, Court Reporter: Donna Boland, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 03/30/2020. [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:00 PM]
December 7, 2020 Appellate fee was paid on 12/03/2020 as to Appellant James Cooper. [Entered: 12/07/2020 11:59 AM]
December 3, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants James Cooper, Peggy A. Griffin, Bryant Hand, Jr., Dorothy Lynn Hill, Derrick Lee, Calvin Nettles, Chason Norris, Jackie Robertson, Linda Singleton, Michael Turner, Dewayne Veasey and Gregory Warren on 12/03/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/17/2020 as to Appellant James Cooper. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/31/2020 as to Appellee BP America Production Company [Entered: 12/07/2020 11:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Peggy Griffin, et al v. BP Exploration & Production, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYANT HAND, JR.
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHASON NORRIS
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DERRICK LEE
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY WARREN
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES COOPER
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALVIN NETTLES
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACKIE ROBERTSON
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEWAYNE VEASEY
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOROTHY LYNN HILL
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL TURNER
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA SINGLETON
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEGGY A. GRIFFIN
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Natasha N. Harrison
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Jason Matthew Larey
Represented By: Gary L. Fuller
Represented By: Allen W. Lindsay Jr.
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Adrianne Katrine Jakola
Represented By: Charles Bradford Wilmore
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLoone
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Scott Christopher Seiler
Represented By: Jessica Marie Kennedy
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre I
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Francis M. McDonald Jr.
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: Adrianne Katrine Jakola
Represented By: Charles Bradford Wilmore
Represented By: Jennifer A. McLoone
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Scott Christopher Seiler
Represented By: Jessica Marie Kennedy
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre I
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Sarah A. Long
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Francis M. McDonald Jr.
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?