Bert Combs, et al v. American Strategic Insurance
Defendant / Appellant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Plaintiff / Appellee: APRIL COMBS, JUNIOUS BROWN, BERT COMBS and MONESIA BROWN
Case Number: 20-14685
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant American Strategic Insurance Corp.'s motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:59 AM]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant American Strategic Insurance Corp. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9268446-2 ] [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:58 AM]
December 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John M. Pennekamp for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:41 AM]
December 23, 2020 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Motion is Unopposed. [9268446-1] [20-14685] (ECF: John Pennekamp) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:57 PM]
December 23, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John M. Pennekamp for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. [20-14685] (ECF: John Pennekamp) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:51 PM]
December 14, 2020 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant American Strategic Insurance Corp. on 12/11/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/28/2020 as to Appellant American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/11/2021 as to Appellees Junious Brown, Monesia Brown, April Combs and Bert Combs [Entered: 12/17/2020 08:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bert Combs, et al v. American Strategic Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: Keith Michael Detweiler
Represented By: Joseph J. Aguda Jr.
Represented By: John M. Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: APRIL COMBS
Represented By: Damian Scott Sullivent
Represented By: Amy D. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUNIOUS BROWN
Represented By: Damian Scott Sullivent
Represented By: Amy D. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERT COMBS
Represented By: Damian Scott Sullivent
Represented By: Amy D. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONESIA BROWN
Represented By: Damian Scott Sullivent
Represented By: Amy D. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?