Langston Austin, et al v. Glynn County, Georgia, et al
Defendant / Appellee: GLYNN COUNTY, GEORGIA and E. NEAL JUMP, Individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: LANGSTON AUSTIN, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated and ERNEST FULLER, III, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 21-10162
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9311495-2 ] Appellants' brief is due on 03/17/2021, with the appendix due (7) days thereafter. [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:33 AM]
February 17, 2021 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/17/2021 filed by Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. Motion is Unopposed. [9311495-1] [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:06 PM]
February 12, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:09 AM]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9306252-2 ] [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:30 AM]
February 11, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin. [Entered: 02/11/2021 09:35 AM]
February 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily Rose Hancock for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Emily Hancock) [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:50 PM]
February 10, 2021 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. Motion is Unopposed. [9306252-1] [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/10/2021 04:08 PM]
February 10, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Patrick J. Hannon for Appellants Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:42 PM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Hannon for Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller III [21-10162] (ECF: Patrick Hannon) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:10 PM]
February 4, 2021 Attorney Thomas A Withers for Appellants Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:14 AM]
February 1, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Thomas A Withers for Ernest Fuller, III and Langston Austin. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/01/2021 01:10 PM]
January 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Glynn County, Georgia and E. Neal Jump. [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:27 AM]
January 29, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10162] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:28 AM]
January 20, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 01/15/2021 as to Appellant Langston Austin. [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:25 PM]
January 15, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Langston Austin and Ernest Fuller, III on 01/15/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/24/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/29/2021 as to Appellant Langston Austin. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/12/2021 as to Appellee Glynn County, Georgia [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Langston Austin, et al v. Glynn County, Georgia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLYNN COUNTY, GEORGIA
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Aaron W. Mumford
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. NEAL JUMP, Individually
Represented By: Richard K. Strickland
Represented By: Aaron W. Mumford
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LANGSTON AUSTIN, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Joseph Richard Padgett
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen
Represented By: Thomas A. Withers
Represented By: Peter Lampros
Represented By: Patrick J. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERNEST FULLER, III, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Joseph Richard Padgett
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen
Represented By: Thomas A. Withers
Represented By: Peter Lampros
Represented By: Patrick J. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?