Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, ALBERTELLI LAW, CHRISTIAN SEWING, CEO Deutsche and DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Case Number: 21-10398
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. [ # 9346140-2 ] filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellees Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 04/05/2021 04:56 PM]
March 26, 2021 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. in 20-12310, 20-13439, 21-10262, 21-10398. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9346140-1] [20-12310, 20-13439, 21-10262, 21-10398] [Entered: 03/30/2021 10:46 AM]
March 26, 2021 MOTION to consolidate appeals 20-12310, 20-13439, 21-10262 and 21-10398 filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. in 20-12310, 20-13439, 21-10262, 21-10398. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9346083-1] [20-12310, 20-13439, 21-10262, 21-10398] [Entered: 03/30/2021 10:25 AM]
March 26, 2021 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9344495-1] [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 03/26/2021 05:04 PM]
March 25, 2021 USDC FRAP 4 Order as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. was filed on 03/25/2021. Docket Entry 110. [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:29 PM]
March 25, 2021 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. DE #: DE#99 [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:35 PM]
March 25, 2021 Amended Notice of Appeal Construed from Motion for Reconsideration per the District Court filed by Party Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:20 AM]
March 16, 2021 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. was filed on 03/15/2021. Docket Entry 107. [Entered: 03/16/2021 05:14 PM]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9326297-3 ] [Entered: 03/16/2021 05:07 PM]
March 5, 2021 MOTION to reinstate appeal construed from a motion to reconsider of clerk's order filed by Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9326297-1] [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 03/05/2021 05:07 PM]
March 4, 2021 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 03/04/2021 08:24 PM]
February 16, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellees Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:33 PM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Nicholas Silloway for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:31 PM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mrs. Brooke Gram for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:29 PM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:28 PM]
February 16, 2021 **Atty Docketed in Error**APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Nicholas Silloway for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by DCB] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:11 PM]
February 16, 2021 **Atty Docketed in Error**APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mrs. Brooke Gram for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by DCB] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:10 PM]
February 16, 2021 **Atty Docketed in Error**APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Nationstar Mortgage. [21-10398]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by DCB] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:09 PM]
February 9, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Christopher M. Hunt, Sr.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10398] (ECF: Christopher Hunt) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:43 PM]
February 5, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christopher M. Hunt, Sr. on 02/04/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2021 as to Appellant Christopher M. Hunt Sr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/05/2021 as to Appellees Albertelli Law and Nationstar Mortgage [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Hunt, Sr. v. Nationstar Mortgage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY BRAY, CEO Nationstar
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERTELLI LAW
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIAN SEWING, CEO Deutsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Brooke Gram
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER M. HUNT, SR.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hunt Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?