Victor Gavillan Martinez v. Secretary, Florida Department, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WARDEN, PAULA GRICE, Assistant Warden of Programs and SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff / Appellant: VICTOR GAVILLAN MARTINEZ
Case Number: 21-10444
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez is GRANTED. [ # 9338427-2 ] Certificate of Interested Persons due on 04/28/2021. ALB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/23/2021 11:28 AM]
March 23, 2021 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/27/2021. [Entered: 03/23/2021 09:34 AM]
March 18, 2021 Consent Form filed by Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez. [Entered: 03/22/2021 07:57 AM]
March 18, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file Certificate of Interested Persons to 04/28/2021 filed by Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9338427-1] [Entered: 03/22/2021 07:51 AM]
March 15, 2021 Notice of receipt: Request for another Consent Form (form was lost) as to Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez.. [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:25 AM]
March 11, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lori Huskisson for Appellee Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10444] (ECF: Lori Huskisson) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:24 AM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lori Huskisson for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. [21-10444] (ECF: Lori Huskisson) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:41 AM]
February 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lori Huskisson for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. [21-10444] (ECF: Lori Huskisson) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:41 AM]
February 12, 2021 USDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 02/11/2021. Docket Entry 129. [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:41 AM]
February 10, 2021 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Victor Gavillan Martinez on 02/10/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victor Gavillan Martinez v. Secretary, Florida Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAULA GRICE, Assistant Warden of Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Florida Attorney General Service
Represented By: Lori Huskisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR GAVILLAN MARTINEZ
Represented By: Victor Gavillan Martinez
Represented By: Century CI Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?