R.T.G. Furniture Corp. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Co., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: R.T.G. FURNITURE CORP.
Defendant / Appellee: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, MAXUM INDEMNITY COMPANY and HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE and UNITED POLICYHOLDERS
Case Number: 21-10490
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp. [ # 9352336-2 ] filed by Attorney Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for Appellee Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. [21-10490] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:00 PM]
April 12, 2021 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Cary D. Steklof for R.T.G. Furniture Corp. is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:00 PM]
April 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cary D. Steklof for R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:13 AM]
April 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William P. Sowers, Jr. for R.T.G. Furniture Corp. [21-10490] (ECF: William Sowers) [Entered: 04/12/2021 10:49 AM]
April 9, 2021 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Bennett Evan Cooper for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company, Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr. for Appellee Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Jonathan Freiman for Appellee Maxum Indemnity Company, Matthew L. Gonzalez for Appellees Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Gregory L. Mast for Appellee Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Patricia Anne McLean for Appellee Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Not Party Service, Antonio D. Morin for Appellee Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Gideon Reitblat for Appellee Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company and Kristian N. Smith for Appellees Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. All Appellees' Briefs due on 05/12/2021. [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:43 AM]
April 7, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory L. Mast for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company [21-10490] (ECF: Gregory Mast) [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:50 PM]
April 7, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul L. Fields, Jr. for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company [21-10490] (ECF: Paul Fields) [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:41 PM]
April 6, 2021 MOTION Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Oral Argument filed by R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9352336-1] [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:04 PM]
April 5, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by R. Hugh Lumpkin for United Policyholders. [9351610-1] [21-10490] (ECF: R. Lumpkin) [Entered: 04/05/2021 06:55 PM]
April 1, 2021 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:44 PM]
March 31, 2021 Appendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:31 PM]
March 30, 2021 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES --[Edited 04/02/2021 by GAF] [Entered: 04/02/2021 11:51 AM]
March 30, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [Entered: 04/02/2021 11:50 AM]
March 29, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/29/2021 07:07 PM]
March 26, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bennett Evan Cooper for Evanston Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/26/2021 04:09 PM]
March 26, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bennett Evan Cooper for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10490] (ECF: Bennett Cooper) [Entered: 03/26/2021 03:54 PM]
March 19, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Antonio D. Morin for Appellee Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10490] (ECF: Antonio Morin) [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:05 PM]
March 17, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kristian Smith for Aspen Specialty Ins. Co., Crum & Forster Specialty Ins. Co., Everest Indemnity Ins. Co., HDI Global Specialty SE, Landmark American Ins. Co., Maxum Indemnity Co., PartnerRe Ireland Insurance, Starr Plus Ins. Co., Underwriters at Lloyd's Attorney Kristian N. Smith for Appellees Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10490] (ECF: Kristian Smith) [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:34 PM]
March 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bennett Evan Cooper for Evanston Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:37 AM]
March 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Antonio D. Morin for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company and Gideon Reitblat for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:37 AM]
March 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Matthew L. Gonzalez for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Kristian N. Smith for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:34 AM]
March 17, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10490] (ECF: Patricia McLean) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:45 AM]
March 15, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kristian N. Smith for Appellees Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. [21-10490] (ECF: Kristian Smith) [Entered: 03/15/2021 05:31 PM]
March 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:32 PM]
March 8, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew L. Gonzalez for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. [21-10490] (ECF: Matthew Gonzalez) [Entered: 03/08/2021 10:21 AM]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Matthew L. Gonzalez is GRANTED by clerk. [9326429-2] [Entered: 03/08/2021 08:18 AM]
March 5, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Matthew L. Gonzalez for Appellees Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. [9326429-1] [Entered: 03/08/2021 08:17 AM]
March 5, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Walter J. Andrews for Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:20 PM]
March 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gideon Reitblat for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company [21-10490] (ECF: Gideon Reitblat) [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:38 PM]
March 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Antonio D. Morin for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. [21-10490] (ECF: Antonio Morin) [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:26 PM]
March 2, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Walter J. Andrews for Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. No hearings. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/02/2021 05:04 PM]
March 2, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:59 PM]
March 2, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter J. Andrews for R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. [21-10490] (ECF: Walter Andrews) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:52 PM]
March 2, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristian N. Smith - Crum & Forster, et al; Everest Indemnity et al.; HDI Global, et al.; Underwriters at Lloyd's, et al.; Partner Re Ireland, et al.; Starr Surplus, et al.; Aspen Specialty, et al., Landmark American et al.; Maxum Indemnity Company [21-10490] (ECF: Kristian Smith) [Entered: 03/02/2021 02:54 PM]
March 2, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan M. Freiman for Maxum Indemnity Company [21-10490] (ECF: Jonathan Freiman) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:46 AM]
March 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patricia Anne McLean for Service. [21-10490] (ECF: Patricia McLean) [Entered: 03/01/2021 08:05 PM]
March 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bennett Evan Cooper for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company [21-10490] (ECF: Bennett Cooper) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:13 PM]
February 16, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp. on 02/16/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/29/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/02/2021 as to Appellant R.T.G. Furniture Corp.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/16/2021 as to Appellees Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: R.T.G. Furniture Corp. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R.T.G. FURNITURE CORP.
Represented By: Cary D. Steklof
Represented By: Joshua Thorpe
Represented By: Walter J. Andrews
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey IV
Represented By: William P. Sowers Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christine Michelle Renella
Represented By: Matthew L. Gonzalez
Represented By: Kristian N. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christine Michelle Renella
Represented By: Matthew L. Gonzalez
Represented By: Kristian N. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Antonio D. Morin
Represented By: Gideon Reitblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Vijay Gibran Brijbasi
Represented By: Alan J. Perlman
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christine Michelle Renella
Represented By: Matthew L. Gonzalez
Represented By: Kristian N. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul Lindsey Fields Jr.
Represented By: Gregory L. Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXUM INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Freiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Patricia Anne McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Michael H. Ashy
Represented By: Paul Hudson Jones II
Represented By: Patricia Anne McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED POLICYHOLDERS
Represented By: R. Hugh Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?