Captain Jacks's Crab Shack Inc, et al v. K. David Cooke, Jr., et al
Defendant / Appellee: K. DAVID COOKE, JR., District Attorney of the Macon Judicial Circuit, in his individual capacity,, CHRISTINE WELCH, Police Officer, City of Centerville Police Department, Centerville, Georgia, in her individual capacity,, MICHAEL G. LAMBROS, Special Assistant District Attorney of the Macon Judicial Circuit, in his individual capacity, and MELANIE BICKFORD, Investigator, City of Byron Police Department, Byron, Georgia, in her individual capacity,
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEE BARTLETT and RONNIE BARTLETT
Case Number: 21-11114
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-11112, 21-11113, 21-11114] [Entered: 05/10/2021 06:43 PM]
May 7, 2021 Appellants' brief is currently due on 05/17/2021. Over the phone 14 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellants Ronnie Bartlett and Lee Bartlett. Appellants' brief is now due on 06/01/2021; Appendix due on 06/08/2021 as to Appellant Ronnie Bartlett. [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:01 PM]
May 4, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Johannes S. Kingma for Michael G. Lambros. [21-11114] (ECF: Johannes Kingma) [Entered: 05/04/2021 08:18 AM]
May 4, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11114] (ECF: Nathan Garroway) [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:48 AM]
May 4, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11114] (ECF: Jeffrey Hoffmeyer) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:04 PM]
May 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Lowell Appel for Melanie Bickford. [21-11114] (ECF: Adam Appel) [Entered: 05/03/2021 03:07 PM]
May 3, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew A. Ericksen, Sr. for Melanie Bickford. [21-11114] (ECF: Matthew Ericksen) [Entered: 05/03/2021 03:14 PM]
May 3, 2021 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellants Ronnie Bartlett and Lee Bartlett. [Entered: 05/03/2021 03:20 PM]
April 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Charles Hoffmeyer for Michael G. Lambros. [21-11114] (ECF: Jeffrey Hoffmeyer) [Entered: 04/30/2021 02:16 PM]
April 23, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Frances L. Clay for Appellee Christine Welch. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11114] (ECF: Frances Clay) [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:55 AM]
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Frances L. Clay for Christine Welch. [21-11114] (ECF: Frances Clay) [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:54 AM]
April 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark A. Silver for K. David Cooke, Jr. [21-11114] (ECF: Mark Silver) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:36 AM]
April 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nathan L. Garroway for K. David Cooke, Jr.. [21-11114] (ECF: Nathan Garroway) [Entered: 04/21/2021 04:25 PM]
April 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maxwell R. Jones for K. David Cooke, Jr. [21-11114] (ECF: Maxwell Jones) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:13 PM]
April 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey A. Zachman for Melanie Bickford, K. David Cooke, Jr., Michael G. Lambros and Christine Welch. [21-11114] (ECF: Jeffrey Zachman) [Entered: 04/21/2021 04:42 PM]
April 20, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Lee Bartlett and Ronnie Bartlett. [21-11114] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:43 PM]
April 20, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellants Lee Bartlett and Ronnie Bartlett. [21-11114] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:48 PM]
April 20, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Scott Anulewicz for Appellants Lee Bartlett and Ronnie Bartlett. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11114] (ECF: Christopher Anulewicz) [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:50 PM]
April 7, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 04/06/2021 as to Appellants Lee Bartlett and Ronnie Bartlett. [Entered: 04/07/2021 04:52 PM]
April 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Lee Bartlett and Ronnie Bartlett on 04/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/17/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/20/2021 as to Appellant Ronnie Bartlett. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/04/2021 as to Appellees Melanie Bickford, K. David Cooke Jr., Michael G. Lambros and Christine Welch [Entered: 04/07/2021 04:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Captain Jacks's Crab Shack Inc, et al v. K. David Cooke, Jr., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. DAVID COOKE, JR., District Attorney of the Macon Judicial Circuit, in his individual capacity,
Represented By: Nathan L. Garroway
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Maxwell Ryan Jones
Represented By: Mark A. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE WELCH, Police Officer, City of Centerville Police Department, Centerville, Georgia, in her individual capacity,
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Thomas F. Richardson
Represented By: Frances L. Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL G. LAMBROS, Special Assistant District Attorney of the Macon Judicial Circuit, in his individual capacity,
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Hoffmeyer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Johannes S. Kingma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELANIE BICKFORD, Investigator, City of Byron Police Department, Byron, Georgia, in her individual capacity,
Represented By: Matthew A. Ericksen Sr.
Represented By: Adam Lowell Appel
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Kim M. Ruder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEE BARTLETT
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Matthew B. Ames
Represented By: Michael Joseph Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONNIE BARTLETT
Represented By: Christopher Scott Anulewicz
Represented By: Matthew B. Ames
Represented By: Michael Joseph Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?