Dora Alvarenga-Palacios v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: DORA ALICIA ALVARENGA-PALACIOS
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 21-11155
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Michael Hartman for Respondent U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11155] (ECF: Jeffrey Hartman) [Entered: 04/13/2021 05:51 PM]
April 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Michael Hartman for U.S. Attorney General [21-11155] (ECF: Jeffrey Hartman) [Entered: 04/12/2021 12:38 PM]
April 8, 2021 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Dora Alicia Alvarenga-Palacios. Additional Documents Needed: Notice to Appear. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 04/12/2021 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dora Alvarenga-Palacios v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: William C. Peachey
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hartman
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DORA ALICIA ALVARENGA-PALACIOS
Represented By: Ellis D. Bingham III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?