Dorothy Daugherty-Davis v. U.S. Attorney General
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOROTHY DAUGHERTY-DAVIS
Case Number: 21-11189
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction.; Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis is DENIED as MOOT. [ # 9385488-2 ]; Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis is DENIED as MOOT. [ # 9385488-3 ] CRW, BBM and ELB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 05/21/2021 03:32 PM]
May 17, 2021 Notice of receipt: Notice regarding corrected transcript order form as to Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:03 PM]
May 17, 2021 CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:02 PM]
May 14, 2021 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:13 AM]
May 13, 2021 The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 31-1(b), a motion for appointment of counsel and/or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis stays the briefing schedule. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:26 PM]
May 13, 2021 USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis was filed on 05/04/2017. Docket Entry 4. [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:16 PM]
May 11, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11189] (ECF: Elizabeth Parker) [Entered: 05/11/2021 11:32 AM]
May 10, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Elizabeth Barry Parker for U.S. Attorney General. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/10/2021 10:17 AM]
May 6, 2021 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:23 PM]
May 6, 2021 MOTION to proceed IFP, for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9385488-1] [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:20 PM]
May 4, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:31 PM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Barry Parker, AUSA - U.S. Attorney's Office for US Attorney General. U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for U.S. Attorney General. [21-11189] (ECF: Elizabeth Parker) [Entered: 04/26/2021 01:58 PM]
April 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis on 03/29/2021. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/19/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/23/2021 as to Appellant Dorothy Daugherty-Davis. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/07/2021 as to Appellee U.S. Attorney General [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dorothy Daugherty-Davis v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida
Represented By: Elizabeth Barry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOROTHY DAUGHERTY-DAVIS
Represented By: Dorothy Daugherty-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?