Kamaljit Sing v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: KAMALJIT SING
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 21-11308
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel L. Browning for U.S. Attorney General [21-11308] (ECF: Rachel Browning) [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:06 PM]
April 22, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 04/21/2021 as to Petitioner Kamaljit Sing. [Entered: 04/22/2021 12:06 PM]
April 21, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bhavya Chaudhary for Petitioner Kamaljit Sing. [Entered: 04/22/2021 12:04 PM]
April 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Bhavya Chaudhary for Petitioner Kamaljit Sing in 21-11308. [Entered: 04/22/2021 12:04 PM]
April 21, 2021 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Kamaljit Sing. Additional Documents Needed: Certificate of Interested Persons IJ's Decision. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 04/22/2021 11:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kamaljit Sing v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KAMALJIT SING
Represented By: Bhavya Chaudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?