Karina Cisneros Preciado v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: KARINA CISNEROS PRECIADO
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 21-11344
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Fatma Marouf for Karina Cisneros Preciado. [21-11344] (ECF: Fatma Marouf) [Entered: 04/30/2021 12:03 PM]
April 30, 2021 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Fatma Marouf for Karina Cisneros Preciado. Incorrect Document Attached to Event Counsel must file a correct appearance of counsel form within 3 days. [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:42 AM]
April 30, 2021 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Petitioner Karina Cisneros Preciado. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9373639-1] [21-11344] (ECF: Fatma Marouf) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:25 AM]
April 29, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Fatma Marouf for Karina Cisneros Preciado. [21-11344] (ECF: Fatma Marouf) [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:40 PM]
April 29, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Fatma Marouf for Petitioner Karina Cisneros Preciado. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11344] (ECF: Fatma Marouf) [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:34 PM]
April 28, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robbin Kinmonth Blaya for Respondent U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11344] (ECF: Robbin Blaya) [Entered: 04/28/2021 09:23 AM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robbin Blaya [21-11344] (ECF: Robbin Blaya) [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:51 PM]
April 23, 2021 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Karina Cisneros Preciado. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. 04/23/2021. [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Karina Cisneros Preciado v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Robbin Kinmonth Blaya
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KARINA CISNEROS PRECIADO
Represented By: Fatma Marouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?