Frank Chandler v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK CHANDLER, GLENDA TAYLOR, MARINA SPEKTOR, KEITH CLARK, MICHAEL WINTERS, DANIEL SMART, CATHERINE SMART, LORAINE COMERFORD, ROBERT COMERFORD, LOWELL HUNT, BARBARA HUNT, GARRETT MULLINS, ARNOLD BURNETT, MICHAEL KIBBEE, KETTY PORTAL, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sonia Rebollo, CAROL HRDLICKA, Individually, and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Hrdlicka,, CAROL SHABLESKY, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Shablesky,, SHARLENE HAYES, TIMOTHY MOORE, KATHERINE STOWELL, PATRICIA STEVENS, JIM HANEY, DELAND MCCOY, TRACEY KIRK, GREGORY MILES, JONNIE VASKO, DAVID WATSON, CARL DAVIS, JOHN R. SNYDER, KAYE M. SNYDER, PAMELA NEAL, CHRISTINE LOVETTE, ROBIE LOVETTE, MINNIE COOPER, JOHN COOPER, SHARON FOSTER, KENNETH FOSTER, SHERYL KALLBERG, PEGGY H. LINEBERRY, individually and as Anticipated Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Lineberry, JACQUELINE PERSON, SOHAIL MEHR, MARRIAM MEHR, PAUL BIEBER, FRANCES BODE, DONALD BODE, PAXTON FOSTER, ELISA GATHRIGHT, MARY LOUISE LEWIS, LOUISE KRETCHMAR, RAYMOND LAM, SANDRA TRUE, SUSAN YELTON, RICARDO BENEDICTO, HENRY WESSMAN, NESTER OSORIO, individually and as a Representative of the Estate of Mary Osorio, deceased, TANNAZ HORRIYATKHAH, RUTH COLBERT, JASON HOBACK, HOPE MCLEOD, RAYMOND WISHOP, JOSHUA BODEY, ALVA TAYLOR, LA TONYA DAROCHA, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beatrice Bess, JEFFREY JOHNSON, NICOLAS REYNA, JEANETTE JAY, KENNETH FELTY, JAMES MOSES, anticipated representative and heir to the Estate of Sylvia Shafer, PEGGY FORD, anticipated representative and heir to the Estate of Violene McGill, PATRICIA O'DRISCOLL, DONALD FLEISCHHACKER, surviving spouse, anticipated representative and anticipated heir to the Estate of Diane Fleischhacker, BRENDA BURGESS, TABITHA WILSON, GEORGE COLE, JR., JAMES BOLNER, BETTY SUE BOLNER, CLARENCE DIMOND, WALTER KANTROWITZ, GLORIA DOBY, MARYJO MOORE, DONALD MOORE, BRIAN DAVID NELSON, DANIEL VALENCIA, LESLIE MOSES, VICKEY E. MOSES, MICHAEL EDWARD PEEBLES, GERALDO W. SCATENA, ALBERT ELLIOTT, FRANKLIN GUZMAN, HUGH LARKIN, DAMIEN BUCHWALD, MARILYN TURNER, STEPHEN MITCHELL, ESTATE OF LINDA CEPHAS and DORIS MOSES
Defendant / Appellee: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. USA, MARLENE GOLDENBERG, APOTEX CORP., MICHAEL MCCANDLESS, BRAD ALDRIDGE, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORPORATION, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION, AJANTA PHARMA LTD, AJANTA PHARMA USA, INC., TORRENT PHARMA, INC., L. PERRIGO COMPANY, PERRIGO COMPANY, PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, AUROHEALTH LLC, THE KROGER CO., FRED MEYER STORES, INC., SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG CENTERS, INC., GERI-CARE PHARMACEUTICALS CORP, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LIMITED, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LLC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCE HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, PAI HOLDINGS, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC, GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC, LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, WOCKHARDT LTD., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, NOSTRUM LABORATORIES INC., WALMART, INC., SAM'S WEST, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC., PFIZER, INC., RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP., WALGREEN CO., DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. and FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Case Number: 21-12618
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robyn S. Maguire for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. and Walgreen Co. [21-12618] (ECF: Robyn Maguire) [Entered: 10/10/2021 08:38 PM]
October 6, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maria Diamond for Michael Kibbee. [21-12618] (ECF: Maria Diamond) [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:20 PM]
October 4, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite filed by Appellant Frank Chandler [ # 9492590-2 ] filed by Attorney Madison Kitchens for Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. [21-12618] (ECF: Madison Kitchens) [Entered: 10/04/2021 08:20 PM]
October 4, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katz, Clifford on behalf of Wockhardt USA LLC (f/k/a Wockhardt USA Inc.) and Wockhardt Ltd. [21-12618] (ECF: Clifford Katz) [Entered: 10/04/2021 05:14 PM]
September 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ilana H. Eisenstein for Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. and Family Dollar, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:55 PM]
September 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel A.H. Horton for sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Rachel Horton) [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:46 PM]
September 28, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah E. Johnston for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. and Walgreen Co. [21-12618] (ECF: Sarah Johnston) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:08 PM]
September 28, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sarah E. Johnston for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. and Walgreen Co.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Sarah Johnston) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:09 PM]
September 24, 2021 MOTION to expedite filed by Frank Chandler. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9492590-1] [21-12618] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 09/24/2021 03:14 PM]
September 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew D. Kaplan for Cardinal Health, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Andrew Kaplan) [Entered: 09/14/2021 10:42 AM]
September 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lyndsay A. Gorton for Cardinal Health, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Lyndsay Gorton) [Entered: 09/14/2021 10:47 AM]
September 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry R. "Buzz" Wood, Jr. of Blank Rome LLP for AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging [21-12618] (ECF: Larry Wood) [Entered: 09/14/2021 04:47 PM]
September 8, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren E. O'Donnell of Blank Rome LLP for AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging [21-12618] (ECF: Lauren O'Donnell) [Entered: 09/08/2021 05:06 PM]
September 7, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: William Northrip) [Entered: 09/07/2021 12:37 PM]
September 7, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elaine Stoll for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LLC; Dr, Reddy's Laboratories, SA [21-12618] (ECF: Elaine Stoll) [Entered: 09/07/2021 11:13 AM]
September 7, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Sohail Mehr. [Entered: 09/07/2021 12:53 PM]
September 3, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ilana Hope Eisenstein for Appellees Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 09/03/2021 01:03 PM]
September 2, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Douglas Tween) [Entered: 09/02/2021 01:08 PM]
September 2, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles L. McCloud for Pfizer Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Charles McCloud) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:47 PM]
September 2, 2021 Reply to response filed by Appellants Betty Sue Bolner, James Bolner, Frank Chandler, Clarence Dimond, Gloria Doby, Donald Moore, MaryJo Moore, Leslie Moses, Vickey E. Moses and Daniel Valencia. [21-12618] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 09/02/2021 09:46 PM]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Douglas Michael Tween is GRANTED by clerk. [9474636-2] [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:51 PM]
September 1, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Fredrick H. L. McClure for Appellees Fred Meyer Stores, Inc., Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. and The Kroger Co.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Fredrick McClure) [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:51 PM]
September 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neil Merkl for Wockhardt USA LLC (f/k/a Wockhardt USA Inc.) and Wockhardt Ltd. [21-12618] (ECF: Neil Merkl) [Entered: 09/01/2021 02:11 PM]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by John Walter Eichlin is GRANTED by clerk. [9474618-2] [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:41 PM]
September 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas Michael Tween for Strides Pharma, Inc.. [21-12618] (ECF: Douglas Tween) [Entered: 09/01/2021 03:15 PM]
September 1, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Clifton Scott Elgarten for Appellee CAH. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Clifton Elgarten) [Entered: 09/01/2021 04:51 PM]
September 1, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Walter Eichlin for Strides Pharma, Inc.. [21-12618] (ECF: John Eichlin) [Entered: 09/01/2021 03:20 PM]
August 31, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Richards Ford for Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Richards Ford) [Entered: 08/31/2021 11:15 AM]
August 31, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert Elgidely for Appellee Lannett Company, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Robert Elgidely) [Entered: 08/31/2021 10:18 AM]
August 31, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cosgrove, Paul Joseph; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Paul Cosgrove) [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:21 PM]
August 31, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Douglas Michael Tween for Appellee Strides Pharma, Inc.. [9474636-1] [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:50 PM]
August 31, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney John Walter Eichlin for Appellee Strides Pharma, Inc.. [9474618-1] [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:39 PM]
August 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Diane H. Tutt for Nostrum Laboratories, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Diane Tutt) [Entered: 08/30/2021 11:17 AM]
August 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lindsay P. Lopez for The Kroger Co. (KR)-Defendant Appellee; Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.-Defendant Appellee; and Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.-Defendant-Appellee. [21-12618] (ECF: Lindsay Lopez) [Entered: 08/30/2021 12:03 PM]
August 30, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William F. Northrip for Walmart, Inc. and Sam's West, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: William Northrip) [Entered: 08/30/2021 01:12 PM]
August 30, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Diane H. Tutt for Appellee Nostrum Laboratories Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Diane Tutt) [Entered: 08/30/2021 05:03 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer Snyder Heis for PAI Holdings, LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Jennifer Heis) [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:42 PM]
August 27, 2021 DOCKETED IN ERROR***Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Steven D. Hamilton for Carl Davis is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:20 PM]
August 27, 2021 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Neal Seth for AJANTPHARM, Ajanta Pharma USA, Inc. and Torrent Pharma, Inc. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:50 AM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jennifer Snyder Heis for PAI Holdings, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Jennifer Heis) [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:47 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard M. Barnes for L. Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company and Perrigo Research & Development Company [21-12618] (ECF: Richard Barnes) [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:18 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin M. Bandy for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Aurohealth LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Kevin Bandy) [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:59 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Fredrick H. L. McClure for The Kroger Co.,; Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.; and Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Fredrick McClure) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:08 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kevin M. Bandy for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Aurohealth LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Kevin Bandy) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:07 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Julie B. Glassman for Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp. [21-12618] (ECF: Julie Glassman) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:29 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Willis J. Hamilton for Carl Davis [21-12618] (ECF: Willis Hamilton) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:45 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Seth for Torrent Pharma Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:22 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Seth for Ajanta Pharma Ltd. and Ajanta Pharma USA Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:20 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Philip E. Rothschild for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA. [21-12618] (ECF: Philip Rothschild) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:19 AM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Julie B. Glassman for Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Julie Glassman) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:33 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Neal Seth for Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:24 AM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Neal Seth for Ajanta Pharma Ltd. and Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:31 AM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Neal Seth for Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:36 AM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Neal Seth for Torrent Pharma Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Neal Seth) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:34 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert F. Elgidely for Lannett Company, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Robert Elgidely) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:32 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry M. Henry for Apotex Corp.. [21-12618] (ECF: Terry Henry) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:43 AM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Glenn T. Graham for Appellee Wockhardt USA LLC (f/k/a Wockhardt USA Inc.) and Wockhardt Ltd. [21-12618] (ECF: Glenn Graham) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:13 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Glenn T. Graham for DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES WOCKHARDT USA LLC AND WOCKHARDT LTD.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Glenn Graham) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:52 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brigid F. Cech Samole for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Ivax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC and Watson Laboratories, Inc [21-12618] (ECF: Brigid Cech Samole) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:43 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elliot H. Scherker for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Ivax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC and Watson Laboratories, Inc [21-12618] (ECF: Elliot Scherker) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:41 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cohen, Lori G. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Ivax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Lori Cohen) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:54 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thompson, Sara K. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Ivax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Sara Thompson) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:57 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richards H. Ford for Golden State Medical Supply, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Richards Ford) [Entered: 08/27/2021 06:47 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Richard Barnes) [Entered: 08/27/2021 06:44 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by GEORGIA HATZIS FOR APPELLEES AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC AND AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Georgia Hatzis) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:29 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richards Ford for Golden State Medical Supply, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Richards Ford) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:04 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Thompson, Sara K. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Ivax Pharmaceuticals, LLC f/k/a Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Sara Thompson) [Entered: 08/27/2021 05:59 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Linda E. Maichl for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited, and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Linda Maichl) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:47 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John R. Ipsaro for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited, and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA [21-12618] (ECF: Linda Maichl) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:40 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda E. Maichl for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited, and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA [21-12618] (ECF: Linda Maichl) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:37 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lisa Marie Baird for Appellee Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Lisa Baird) [Entered: 08/27/2021 04:12 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GEORGIA HATZIS FOR DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC AND AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Georgia Hatzis) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:40 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip E. Rothschild for Appellee Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Philip Rothschild) [Entered: 08/27/2021 04:12 PM]
August 27, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Terry M. Henry for Appellee Apotex Corp.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Terry Henry) [Entered: 08/27/2021 04:39 PM]
August 27, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa F. Murphy of Blank Rome LLP for Apotex Corp. [21-12618] (ECF: Melissa Murphy) [Entered: 08/27/2021 04:13 PM]
August 26, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nicole R. Topper of Blank Rome LLP for AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Nicole Topper) [Entered: 08/26/2021 03:50 PM]
August 26, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spencer H. Silverglate on behalf of McKesson Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12618] (ECF: Spencer Silverglate) [Entered: 08/26/2021 04:58 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicole R. Topper of Blank Rome LLP for AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging [21-12618] (ECF: Nicole Topper) [Entered: 08/26/2021 03:48 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay Lefkowitz for GlaxoSmithKline LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:41 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael R. D'Lugo for Golden State Medical Supply, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Michael D'Lugo) [Entered: 08/26/2021 05:19 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cole Carter for GlaxoSmithKline LLC [21-12618] (ECF: Cole Carter) [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:43 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Alessio Mezzina, Attorney for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation & Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation [21-12618] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 08/26/2021 08:01 PM]
August 26, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Frank Chandler [ # 9460503-2 ] filed by Attorney Madison Kitchens for Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. [21-12618] (ECF: Madison Kitchens) [Entered: 08/26/2021 10:02 PM]
August 26, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Frank Chandler [ # 9460503-2 ] filed by Attorney Clifton Scott Elgarten for Appellee CAH. [21-12618] (ECF: Clifton Elgarten) [Entered: 08/26/2021 05:55 PM]
August 26, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Frank Chandler [ # 9460503-2 ] filed by Attorney Lisa Marie Baird for Appellee Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. [21-12618] (ECF: Lisa Baird) [Entered: 08/26/2021 08:18 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Madison H. Kitchens, Attorney for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation & Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation [21-12618] (ECF: Madison Kitchens) [Entered: 08/26/2021 07:55 PM]
August 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa M. Baird for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Lisa Baird) [Entered: 08/26/2021 06:20 PM]
August 25, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ilana H. Eisenstein for sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 08/25/2021 02:57 PM]
August 24, 2021 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Craig Salner for McKesson Corporation is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/24/2021 03:59 PM]
August 20, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig Salner for McKesson Corporation [21-12618] (ECF: Craig Salner) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:32 PM]
August 20, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Spencer H. Silverglate for McKesson Corporation [21-12618] (ECF: Spencer Silverglate) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:23 PM]
August 19, 2021 Transcript Order form has not been processed. According to our records, Christopher A. Seeger for Christine Lovette, Leslie Moses, Robie Lovette, Minnie Cooper, John Cooper, Sharon Foster, Kenneth Foster, Sheryl Kallberg, Peggy H. Lineberry, Jacqueline Person and Vickey E. Moses is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:37 AM]
August 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dennis G. Pantazis, II for Keith Clark. [21-12618] (ECF: Dennis Pantazis) [Entered: 08/19/2021 06:17 PM]
August 19, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clifton S. Elgarten for Cardinal Health, Inc. [21-12618] (ECF: Clifton Elgarten) [Entered: 08/19/2021 02:04 PM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Damien Buchwald. [Entered: 08/18/2021 10:09 AM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Hugh Larkin. [Entered: 08/18/2021 09:21 AM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Franklin Guzman. [Entered: 08/18/2021 08:26 AM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Stephen Mitchell. [Entered: 08/18/2021 11:40 AM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Marilyn Turner. [Entered: 08/18/2021 11:19 AM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Doris Moses. [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:19 PM]
August 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Michael Ragain for Arnold Burnett. [21-12618] (ECF: James Ragain) [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:25 PM]
August 18, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Estate of Linda Cephas. [Entered: 08/18/2021 11:54 AM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/12/2021 as to Appellant Brian David Nelson. [Entered: 08/17/2021 11:23 AM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants Donald Moore and MaryJo Moore. [Entered: 08/17/2021 10:03 AM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Walter Kantrowitz. [Entered: 08/17/2021 08:46 AM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Daniel Valencia. [Entered: 08/17/2021 12:00 PM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Gloria Doby. [Entered: 08/17/2021 09:04 AM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Albert Elliott. [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:54 PM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants Leslie Moses and Vickey E. Moses. [Entered: 08/17/2021 12:29 PM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Geraldo W. Scatena. [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:12 PM]
August 17, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Michael Edward Peebles. [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:31 PM]
August 16, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant George Cole, Jr.. [Entered: 08/16/2021 11:14 AM]
August 16, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants Brenda Burgess, Kenneth Felty, Donald Fleischhacker, Peggy Ford, James Moses, Patricia O'Driscoll and Tabitha Wilson. [Entered: 08/16/2021 09:58 AM]
August 16, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants Betty Sue Bolner and James Bolner. [Entered: 08/16/2021 12:29 PM]
August 16, 2021 MOTION to consolidate appeals 21-12618 filed by Frank Chandler. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9460503-1] [21-12618] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 08/14/2021 12:00 AM]
August 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven L. Nicholas for Frank Chandler and Glenda Taylor. [21-12618] (ECF: Steven Nicholas) [Entered: 08/16/2021 04:45 PM]
August 16, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Clarence Dimond. [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:47 PM]
August 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lucy Elizabeth Tufts for Frank Chandler and Glenda Taylor. [21-12618] (ECF: Lucy Tufts) [Entered: 08/16/2021 05:01 PM]
August 16, 2021 Public Communication: Notice to parties: All deadlines for this appeal are suspended until further notice. The only exception is the response deadline for Appellees as to the motion to consolidate filed by Appellants. The Appellees' response to this motion remains due 10-days from the date of service. [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:54 PM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Hope McLeod. [Entered: 08/13/2021 10:53 AM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Jason Hoback. [Entered: 08/13/2021 10:02 AM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Joshua Bodey. [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:22 PM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Ruth Colbert. [Entered: 08/13/2021 08:58 AM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Raymond Wishop. [Entered: 08/13/2021 11:22 AM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Alva Taylor. [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:44 PM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Jeffrey Johnson. [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:01 PM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants Jeanette Jay and Nicolas Reyna. [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:42 PM]
August 13, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant La Tonya Darocha. [Entered: 08/13/2021 01:12 PM]
August 12, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Ricardo Benedicto. [Entered: 08/12/2021 02:53 PM]
August 12, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants John Cooper, Minnie Cooper, Kenneth Foster, Sharon Foster, Sheryl Kallberg, Peggy H. Lineberry, Christine Lovette, Robie Lovette and Jacqueline Person. [Entered: 08/12/2021 10:13 AM]
August 12, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Henry Wessman. [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:21 PM]
August 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley Keller for Frank Chandler [21-12618] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 08/12/2021 07:14 PM]
August 12, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Nester Osorio. [Entered: 08/12/2021 04:04 PM]
August 12, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Tannaz Horriyatkhah. [Entered: 08/12/2021 04:41 PM]
August 11, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellants Jim Haney, Sharlene Hayes, Carol Hrdlicka, Tracey Kirk, Deland McCoy, Gregory Miles, Timothy Moore, Carol Shablesky, Patricia Stevens, Katherine Stowell, Jonnie Vasko and David Watson. [Entered: 08/11/2021 11:12 AM]
August 11, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Carl Davis. [Entered: 08/11/2021 01:06 PM]
August 11, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellants John R. Snyder and Kaye M. Snyder. [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:52 PM]
August 11, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Pamela Neal. [Entered: 08/11/2021 03:44 PM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/09/2021 as to Appellant Ketty Portal. [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:56 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants John Cooper, Minnie Cooper, Kenneth Foster, Sharon Foster, Sheryl Kallberg, Peggy H. Lineberry, Christine Lovette, Robie Lovette and Jacqueline Person on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/24/2021 as to Appellant Christine Lovette [Entered: 08/12/2021 10:00 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Henry Wessman on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/24/2021 as to Appellant Henry Wessman [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:17 PM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Michael Kibbee. [Entered: 08/10/2021 01:02 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ricardo Benedicto on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/24/2021 as to Appellant Ricardo Benedicto [Entered: 08/12/2021 02:49 PM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Garrett Mullins. [Entered: 08/10/2021 11:24 AM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Michael Winters. [Entered: 08/10/2021 08:43 AM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellants Catherine Smart and Daniel Smart. [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:05 AM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellants Barbara Hunt and Lowell Hunt. [Entered: 08/10/2021 10:43 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Nester Osorio on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/24/2021 as to Appellant Nester Osorio [Entered: 08/12/2021 03:59 PM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Arnold Burnett. [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:14 PM]
August 10, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellants Loraine Comerford and Robert Comerford. [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:31 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant La Tonya Darocha on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 01:11 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jeffrey Johnson on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:00 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jeanette Jay and Nicolas Reyna on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:41 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Tannaz Horriyatkhah on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/12/2021 04:38 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joshua Bodey on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:21 PM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alva Taylor on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:43 PM]
August 10, 2021 MULTI-CROSS APPEAL DOCKETED. [Entered: 08/13/2021 09:58 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ruth Colbert on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 08:57 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Raymond Wishop on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 11:21 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jason Hoback on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 10:01 AM]
August 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Hope McLeod on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2021 10:49 AM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael Kibbee on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant Michael Kibbee [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:51 PM]
August 9, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Keith Clark. [Entered: 08/09/2021 04:30 PM]
August 9, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/04/2021 as to Appellant Glenda Taylor. [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:20 PM]
August 9, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/03/2021 as to Appellant Frank Chandler. [Entered: 08/09/2021 12:48 PM]
August 9, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 08/06/2021 as to Appellant Marina Spektor. [Entered: 08/09/2021 03:24 PM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Carl Davis on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant Carl Davis [Entered: 08/11/2021 01:02 PM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ketty Portal on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant Ketty Portal [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:52 PM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Paul Bieber, Donald Bode, Frances Bode, Paxton Foster, Elisa Gathright, Louise Kretchmar, Raymond Lam, Mary Louise Lewis, Marriam Mehr, Sohail Mehr, Sandra True and Susan Yelton on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant Sohail Mehr [Entered: 08/12/2021 02:17 PM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Pamela Neal on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant Pamela Neal [Entered: 08/11/2021 03:37 PM]
August 9, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants John R. Snyder and Kaye M. Snyder on 08/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2021 as to Appellant John R. Snyder [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:48 PM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Catherine Smart and Daniel Smart on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Daniel Smart [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:03 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael Winters on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Michael Winters [Entered: 08/10/2021 08:40 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Marina Spektor on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Marina Spektor [Entered: 08/09/2021 03:04 PM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Loraine Comerford and Robert Comerford on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Loraine Comerford [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:28 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Keith Clark on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Keith Clark [Entered: 08/09/2021 04:27 PM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Garrett Mullins on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Garrett Mullins [Entered: 08/10/2021 11:17 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Barbara Hunt and Lowell Hunt on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Lowell Hunt [Entered: 08/10/2021 10:38 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jim Haney, Sharlene Hayes, Carol Hrdlicka, Tracey Kirk, Deland McCoy, Gregory Miles, Timothy Moore, Carol Shablesky, Patricia Stevens, Katherine Stowell, Jonnie Vasko and David Watson on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Carol Hrdlicka [Entered: 08/11/2021 11:01 AM]
August 6, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Arnold Burnett on 08/06/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/20/2021 as to Appellant Arnold Burnett [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:03 PM]
August 4, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Glenda Taylor on 08/04/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/18/2021 as to Appellant Glenda Taylor [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:17 PM]
August 4, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Frank Chandler on 08/03/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/18/2021 as to Appellant Frank Chandler. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/01/2021 as to Appellees Brad Aldridge, Apotex Corp., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, Marlene Goldenberg and Michael McCandless [Entered: 08/09/2021 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Chandler v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK CHANDLER
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Steven L. Nicholas
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENDA TAYLOR
Represented By: Steven L. Nicholas
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARINA SPEKTOR
Represented By: John Bailly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH CLARK
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis Sr.
Represented By: Dennis G. Pantazis II
Represented By: Evan D. Pantazis
Represented By: Patrick L. Pantazis
Represented By: Matthew L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WINTERS
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL SMART
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE SMART
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORAINE COMERFORD
Represented By: Carolyn S. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT COMERFORD
Represented By: Carolyn S. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOWELL HUNT
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARBARA HUNT
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARRETT MULLINS
Represented By: Andrew G. Moore
Represented By: Joseph T. Waechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARNOLD BURNETT
Represented By: James M. Ragain
Represented By: James Michael Ragain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL KIBBEE
Represented By: Maria S. Diamond
Represented By: Maria Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KETTY PORTAL, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sonia Rebollo
Represented By: Andrew S. Freedman
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROL HRDLICKA, Individually, and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Hrdlicka,
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROL SHABLESKY, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Shablesky,
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARLENE HAYES
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY MOORE
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHERINE STOWELL
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA STEVENS
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIM HANEY
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DELAND MCCOY
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRACEY KIRK
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY MILES
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONNIE VASKO
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID WATSON
Represented By: Quinn R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARL DAVIS
Represented By: Steven D. Hamilton
Represented By: Willis J. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN R. SNYDER
Represented By: Mark D. Samson
Represented By: Michael Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAYE M. SNYDER
Represented By: Mark D. Samson
Represented By: Michael Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAMELA NEAL
Represented By: Jason C. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTINE LOVETTE
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBIE LOVETTE
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MINNIE COOPER
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN COOPER
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON FOSTER
Represented By: Asim Badaruzzaman
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Grand
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH FOSTER
Represented By: Asim Badaruzzaman
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Grand
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHERYL KALLBERG
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEGGY H. LINEBERRY, individually and as Anticipated Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Lineberry
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACQUELINE PERSON
Represented By: Asim Badaruzzaman
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOHAIL MEHR
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARRIAM MEHR
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL BIEBER
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCES BODE
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD BODE
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAXTON FOSTER
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELISA GATHRIGHT
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY LOUISE LEWIS
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISE KRETCHMAR
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAYMOND LAM
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA TRUE
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN YELTON
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICARDO BENEDICTO
Represented By: Lauren A. Levitt
Represented By: Curtis J. Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HENRY WESSMAN
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NESTER OSORIO, individually and as a Representative of the Estate of Mary Osorio, deceased
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TANNAZ HORRIYATKHAH
Represented By: Natali Shabani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUTH COLBERT
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON HOBACK
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOPE MCLEOD
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAYMOND WISHOP
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA BODEY
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALVA TAYLOR
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LA TONYA DAROCHA, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Beatrice Bess
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY JOHNSON
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLAS REYNA
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEANETTE JAY
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH FELTY
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES MOSES, anticipated representative and heir to the Estate of Sylvia Shafer
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEGGY FORD, anticipated representative and heir to the Estate of Violene McGill
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA O'DRISCOLL
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD FLEISCHHACKER, surviving spouse, anticipated representative and anticipated heir to the Estate of Diane Fleischhacker
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA BURGESS
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TABITHA WILSON
Represented By: Madeline E. Pendley
Represented By: Daniel A. Nigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE COLE, JR.
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES BOLNER
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETTY SUE BOLNER
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARENCE DIMOND
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER KANTROWITZ
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLORIA DOBY
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARYJO MOORE
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD MOORE
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN DAVID NELSON
Represented By: John D. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL VALENCIA
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Lawana S. Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESLIE MOSES
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICKEY E. MOSES
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL EDWARD PEEBLES
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: J. Revell Parrish
Represented By: Reggie N. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALDO W. SCATENA
Represented By: Michael F. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT ELLIOTT
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANKLIN GUZMAN
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUGH LARKIN
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAMIEN BUCHWALD
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN TURNER
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN MITCHELL
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF LINDA CEPHAS
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DORIS MOSES
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Moore
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. USA
Represented By: Jessica Sarah Kramer
Represented By: Daniel Mateo
Represented By: Danielle M. Mayer
Represented By: Amy McVeigh
Represented By: Philip E. Rothschild
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Daniel K. Winters
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARLENE GOLDENBERG
Represented By: Marlene J. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: Stephanie C. Chomentowski
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Represented By: Ann Querns
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Jane Thomas
Represented By: Melissa Fundora Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL MCCANDLESS
Represented By: Douglas A. Dellaccio Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Herring
Represented By: Lauren S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD ALDRIDGE
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Lea Pilar Bucciero
Represented By: Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid
Represented By: Jason A. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Clifton Scott Elgarten
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: Andrew D. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Craig Salner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Represented By: Rachel Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Represented By: Rachel Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Cole Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORPORATION
Represented By: Madison Kitchens
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Madison Kitchens
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION
Represented By: Madison Kitchens
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AJANTA PHARMA LTD
Represented By: Neal Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AJANTA PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: Neal Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TORRENT PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Neal Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. PERRIGO COMPANY
Represented By: Richard Matthew Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PERRIGO COMPANY
Represented By: Richard Matthew Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Richard Matthew Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUROHEALTH LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE KROGER CO.
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Lindsay Patrick Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRED MEYER STORES, INC.
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Lindsay Patrick Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SMITH'S FOOD & DRUG CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Lindsay Patrick Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERI-CARE PHARMACEUTICALS CORP
Represented By: Julie Bork Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: Elaine M. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD.
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: Elaine M. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LIMITED
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: Elaine M. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Represented By: Linda E. Maichl
Represented By: Elaine M. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Robert Elgidely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.
Represented By: Lauren E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Nicole R. Topper
Represented By: Larry Roger Wood Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERISOURCE HEALTH SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Lauren E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Nicole R. Topper
Represented By: Larry Roger Wood Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAI HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Snyder Heis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Cosgrove
Represented By: Georgia Hatzis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Cosgrove
Represented By: Georgia Hatzis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Cosgrove
Represented By: Georgia Hatzis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: Richards H. Ford
Represented By: Michael Ross D'Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Brigid Finerty Cech Samole
Represented By: Elliot H. Scherker
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Brigid Finerty Cech Samole
Represented By: Elliot H. Scherker
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC, LLC
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Brigid Finerty Cech Samole
Represented By: Elliot H. Scherker
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Brigid Finerty Cech Samole
Represented By: Elliot H. Scherker
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Brigid Finerty Cech Samole
Represented By: Elliot H. Scherker
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WOCKHARDT LTD.
Represented By: Neil Merkl
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: Neil Merkl
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOSTRUM LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: Diane H. Tutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM'S WEST, INC.
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STRIDES PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: John Walter Eichlin
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tween
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: Charles McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RITE AID HDQTRS. CORP.
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Represented By: Ilana Hope Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?