Luke Estes v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: LUKE ESTES
Defendant / Appellant: 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING, LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE, LLC, AEARO, LLC and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Amicus Curiae: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART
Case Number: 21-13135
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury-Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 83 Oral argument held this date. Oral Argument presented by Paul D. Clement for Appellants MMM, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC and Aearo, LLC and Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellee Lloyd Eugene Baker in 21-12517. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 05/01/2023 12:27 PM]
March 1, 2023 Filing 82 Attorney Paul D. Clement for Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 05/01/2023. Paul D. Clement (202) 742-8900 will present argument. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 03/01/2023 02:00 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 81 Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellee Luke Estes hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 05/01/2023. Ashley Keller, 312-741-5222 will present argument. [21-13135] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/28/2023 12:04 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 80 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Monday, 05/01/2023 Argument Location: Montgomery, AL. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 02/28/2023 10:57 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 79 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 05/01/2023 in Montgomery, Alabama. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF (a document upload is not required). [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 02/28/2023 09:55 AM]
January 18, 2023 Filing 78 Additional copies of APPELLANT'S BRIEF, REPLY BRIEF AND SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX received from Paul D. Clement for MMM, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC and Aearo, LLC in 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135 and forwarded to the record room. [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 01/19/2023 04:23 PM]
January 18, 2023 Filing 77 Additional copies of Appellees Brief and Supplemental Appendix received from Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Lewis Keefer in 21-13131, Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Stephen Hacker in 21-13133, Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Luke Estes in 21-13135 and forwarded to the record room. [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 01/19/2023 03:49 PM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 76 Additional copies of Appendix received from Paul D. Clement for MMM, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC and Aearo, LLC and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:54 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 75 Assigned to tentative calendar number 16 in Montgomery during the week of May 1, 2023. You must file an additional 3 identical paper copies of the briefs and appendices within 7 days of the date of this notice, unless you previously provided the additional copies. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 01/11/2023 03:11 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 74 Corrected Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart in 21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. Service date: 11/07/2022. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 11/07/2022 12:59 PM]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees is GRANTED. The Clerks Office is DIRECTED to revise the docket to reflect Military Order of the Purple Heart as the name for Amicus Curiae. [ # 9711803-2 ], [ # 9711805-2 ], [ # 9711807-2 ], [ # 55 ]. BL (See attached order for complete text) [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:12 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 72 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC in 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. 1 VOLUMES - 6 COPIES [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 10/28/2022 01:41 PM]
October 27, 2022 Filing 71 SUPPLEMENTAL Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 10/27/2022 10:10 AM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 70 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellant 3M Occupational Safety LLC in 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 10/24/2022 11:25 AM]
October 20, 2022 Filing 69 Reply Brief filed by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 10/20/2022 11:40 PM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 68 Received 4 paper copies of corrected EBrief submitted by Military Order of the Purple Heart. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] [Entered: 10/14/2022 09:06 AM]
September 29, 2022 Filing 67 Notice of deficient brief sent to Attorney Patrick Strawbridge for Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart. Deficiency: 4 paper copies of the proposed corrected brief have not been received in the clerk's office. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] [Entered: 09/29/2022 01:51 PM]
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: On September 15, 2022, the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Indiana, in Case No. 22-02890, In re: Aearo Technologies LLC, issued an order modifying the automatic stay imposed by 11 U.S.C. 362(a) to allow certain appeals pending in this Court to be fully and finally resolved. In light of this order, the motions to lift any stay of those appealsspecifically, Baker v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-12517, Keefer v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13131, Hacker v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13133, Estes v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13135, Kelley v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-11607, Wilkerson v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12719, and Adkins v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12812is GRANTED. The stay of those appeals is LIFTED. The reply briefs in Baker v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-12517, Keefer v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13131, Hacker v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13133, and Estes v. 3M Company, et al., no. 21-13135, are due within 21 days after the date of this order. The initial brief in Kelley v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-11607, is due within 40 days after the date of this order. The initial brief in Wilkerson v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12719, is due within 40 days after the date of this order. The transcript order form in Adkins v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12812, is due within 7 days after the date of this order. This order does not lift the stay as it applies to Bonenfant, et al. v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-11897, Sylvain v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12273, or Torres v. 3M Company, et al., no. 22-12403. The debtors counsel should continue to file monthly status reports with respect to these appeals only. [ # 9768083-2 ] [ # 9768086-2 ] [ # 9768087-2 ] [ # 64 ] [ # 9768082-2 ] [ # 9768081-2 ] ALB [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135, 22-11607, 22-11897, 22-12273, 22-12403, 22-12812, 22-12719] [Entered: 09/29/2022 01:40 PM]
September 23, 2022 Filing 65 RESPONSE to to lift stay filed by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM [ # 64 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellee Luke Estes. [21-13135] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:48 PM]
September 23, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to lift stay filed by 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. Motion is Opposed. [64] [21-13135] (ECF: Charles Beall) [Entered: 09/23/2022 06:28 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 63 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George W. Hicks, Jr. for Appellants 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holdings LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, and Aearo LLC [21-13135] (ECF: George Hicks) [Entered: 09/22/2022 08:41 PM]
September 15, 2022 Filing 62 Status report filed as to Attorney Kasdin Miller Mitchell for Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. Status of case is unchanged [21-13135] (ECF: Kasdin Mitchell) [Entered: 09/15/2022 10:15 PM]
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: On July 26, 2022, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo, LLC, and 3M Occupational Safety LLC filed a Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition in Case No. 22-02890, In re: Aearo Technologies LLC, in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Indiana. These appeals are hereby STAYED pending further order of the bankruptcy court and this Court. See 11 U.S.C. 362(a). The debtors counsel is DIRECTED to file, by the 15th of each month, monthly status reports with this Court regarding the bankruptcy petition. [ # 9723872-2 ] [ # 9723871-2 ] [ # 9723870-2 ][ # 57 ] [ # 9723873-2 ] [ # 9723874-2 ] [ # 9724661-2 ] ALB [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135, 22-11607, 22-11897, 22-12273, 22-12403] [Entered: 08/22/2022 03:12 PM]
August 10, 2022 Filing 60 No action will be taken on the motions for extension of time to file reply briefs. These appeals are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the motions for suggestion of bankruptcy. [ # 9734935-2 ] [ # 9734948-2 ][ # 9734947-2 ] [ # 58 ] [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 08/10/2022 01:48 PM]
August 10, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION for extension of time to file reply brief to 08/31/2022 filed by 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. Motion is Opposed. [58] [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:59 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION for suggestion of bankruptcy filed by 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [57] [21-13135] (ECF: Kasdin Mitchell) [Entered: 07/27/2022 12:07 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 56 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Luke Estes. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:00 PM]
July 11, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to correct or amend brief filed by Military Order of the Purple Heart. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [55] [21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] (ECF: Patrick Strawbridge) [Entered: 07/11/2022 07:13 PM]
July 11, 2022 Filing 54 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Strawbridge for Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart [21-13135] (ECF: Patrick Strawbridge) [Entered: 07/11/2022 07:12 PM]
July 8, 2022 Filing 53 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Kasdin Miller Mitchell for Appellants MMM, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC and Aearo, LLC in 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. Reply Brief due on 08/17/2022. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:19 AM]
July 8, 2022 Filing 52 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart in 21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:11 AM]
July 5, 2022 Filing 51 Supplemental Appendix [4 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Luke Estes. [21-13135] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:04 PM]
July 5, 2022 Filing 50 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Luke Estes. [21-13135] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:00 PM]
July 5, 2022 Filing 49 *** SEE CORRECTED BRIEF FILED 11/7/22***Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Patrick N. Strawbridge on behalf of Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart. [21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] (ECF: Patrick Strawbridge) [Entered: 07/05/2022 06:59 PM]
July 5, 2022 Filing 48 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick N. Strawbridge on behalf of Amicus Curiae Military Order of the Purple Heart [21-13135]--[Edited 11/07/2022 by CB in accordance with the Courts 11/7/22 Order] (ECF: Patrick Strawbridge) [Entered: 07/05/2022 06:58 PM]
July 5, 2022 Filing 47 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley C. Keller for Appellee Luke Estes [21-13135] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 07/05/2022 01:57 PM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 46 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan F. Aylstock for Luke Estes. [21-13135] (ECF: Bryan Aylstock) [Entered: 06/24/2022 11:38 AM]
April 13, 2022 Filing 45 PROBABLE JURISDICTION noted after issuance of a Jurisdictional Question as to Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. [Entered: 04/13/2022 04:47 PM]
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Luke Estess motion to amend the jurisdictional allegations in his amended short form complaint, contained in his response to the initial jurisdictional question in Appeal No. 21 13135, is GRANTED. As amended, the pleadings will demonstrate that Estes was a citizen of California; 3M Company was a Delaware corporation having its principal place of business in Minnesota; 3M Occupational Safety, LLCs sole member was 3M Company; and Aearo Technologies, LLCs sole member was Aearo, LLC, whose sole member was Aearo Intermediate, LLC, whose sole member was Aearo Holding, LLC, whose sole member was 3M Occupational Safety, LLC. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1); Travaglio v. Am. Express Co., 735 F.3d 1266, 1269 (11th Cir. 2013); Mallory & Evans Contractors & Engrs, LLC v. Tuskegee Univ., 663 F.3d 1304, 1305 (11th Cir. 2011). Therefore, the requirements of diversity will be met. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(1). The parties shall notify the district court of this order by filing copies of the order and the short form complaint, as amended, with that court. Additionally, Appeal No. 21-13135 MAY PROCEED despite the lack of a formal adjudication regarding Count X Fraud and Deceit and Count XI Gross Negligence. We are satisfied that these claims were effectively resolved for purposes of our appellate jurisdiction because Estes omitted the claims from the joint pretrial stipulation and similarly omitted the claims from the jury verdict despite discussing the jury instructions and jury verdict form with the court. See Mid City Mgmt. Corp. v. Loewi Realty Corp., 643 F.2d 386, 388 n.2 (5th Cir. Unit A Apr. 1981) (noting that the Court had appellate jurisdiction when a defendant abandoned its counterclaim at trial in response to questioning from the trial judge); see also Olmsted v. Taco Bell Corp., 141 F.3d 1457, 146163 (11th Cir. 1998). CRW and RJL [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 04/13/2022 04:44 PM]
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to and including June 27, 2022, in which to file Appellees brief is GRANTED, with the appendix, if any, due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 40 ] ALB [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 03/17/2022 11:04 AM]
March 9, 2022 Filing 41 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. 14 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES (ALL INSIDE 2 BOX) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:32 PM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for extension of time to file appellee's brief to 06/27/2022 filed by Luke Estes. Motion is Opposed. [40] [21-13135] (ECF: David Cooper) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:54 PM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 39 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Granich Unikowsky for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [21-13135] (ECF: Adam Unikowsky) [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:38 PM]
March 8, 2022 Filing 38 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Adam G. Unikowsky for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [21-13135] (ECF: Adam Unikowsky) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:59 AM]
March 7, 2022 Filing 37 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:09 AM]
March 4, 2022 Filing 36 Appendix filed [14 VOLUMES] by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:20 PM]
March 1, 2022 Filing 35 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC in 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135. [21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:13 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 34 Appellant's brief filed by 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:57 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 33 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Luke Estes [21-13135] (ECF: David Cooper) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:42 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 32 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:38 PM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. [Entered: 02/02/2022 04:24 PM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 30 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:01 PM]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including February 25, 2022, to file the Appellants briefs is GRANTED, with the appendices due within seven days of the filing of the briefs. RSR [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 01/10/2022 03:52 PM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 02/25/2022 filed by 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM. Motion is Unopposed. [28] [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 01/07/2022 03:15 PM]
December 29, 2021 Filing 27 Public Communication: The over the phone extension for appellants' brief granted by the clerk on 12/29/21 is hereby rescinded pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 31-2. Appellants must file a written motion for a brief extension to be acted upon by the court. [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 12/29/2021 04:33 PM]
December 29, 2021 Filing 26 ***Entered in Error***Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellants' brief is due on 02/25/2022. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135]--[Edited 12/29/2021 by JC] [Entered: 12/29/2021 03:57 PM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Before the Court is the Joint Notice of Docket Entries to be Included in Record on Appeal, filed in response to the Courts November 19, 2021 order. The district court clerk is DIRECTED to include all docket entries identified in the Joint Notice of Docket Entries to be Included in Record on Appeal when certifying to the circuit court clerk that the record on appeal for nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135 is complete pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 11(c). The circuit court clerk is DIRECTED to provide copies of this order and the Joint Notice of Docket Entries to be Included in Record on Appeal to the district court clerk. The stay of the briefing schedule is LIFTED. The initial brief for no. 21-12517 and the consolidated initial brief for nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135 are due within 30 days after the date of this order, with the appendices due 7 days after the filing of the initial brief. RSR [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 12/27/2021 03:42 PM]
December 20, 2021 Filing 24 Joint Notice of Docket Entries to be Included in Record on Appeal filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement for Appellants MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 12/20/2021 04:49 PM]
December 8, 2021 Filing 23 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Luke Estes [21-13135] (ECF: David Cooper) [Entered: 12/08/2021 12:09 PM]
December 8, 2021 Filing 22 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo, LLC and MMM [21-13135] (ECF: Paul Clement) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:37 AM]
November 24, 2021 Filing 21 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to MMM, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo, LLC. [Entered: 11/24/2021 02:20 PM]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Appellants Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Appeal Nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135 is GRANTED. Plaintiff-Appellees Motion for Consolidation of Appeals for Briefing and Argument is GRANTED IN PART. Appeal nos. 21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135 are CONSOLIDATED. Briefing in appeal no. 21-12517, however, shall proceed separately from the consolidated briefing in appeal nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135. In light of the volume of district court docket entries in multiple district court case numbers relevant to consolidated appeal nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135, the parties are DIRECTED to confer and file a joint notice with the Court, within 30 days after the date of this order, identifying which district court docket entries in which district court case numbers should be included in the record on appeal for consolidated appeal nos. 21-13131, 21-13133, and 21-13135 The briefing schedule for all appeals is STAYED pending further order of the Court. [ # 9519267-2 ] [ # 9519273-2 ] [ # 9518110-2 ] [ # 9519285-2 ] [ # 9518113-2 ] [ # 17 ] [ # 16 ] RSR [21-12517, 21-13131, 21-13133, 21-13135] [Entered: 11/19/2021 09:11 AM]
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 Reply to response filed by Appellee Luke Estes. [21-13135] (ECF: David Cooper) [Entered: 11/15/2021 08:48 PM]
September 14, 2021 MULTI-CROSS APPEAL DOCKETED. [Entered: 09/16/2021 05:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Luke Estes v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUKE ESTES
Represented By: Michael A. Sacchet
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: David M. Cooper
Represented By: Katherine Cornell
Represented By: Jennifer Hoekstra
Represented By: Neil Duane Overholtz
Represented By: Thomas Pirtle
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AEARO HOLDING, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AEARO, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly O. Branscome
Represented By: Robert C. Brock
Represented By: Cole Carter
Represented By: Barry E. Fields
Represented By: Thomas Larry Hill
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Represented By: Mark J. Nomellini
Represented By: Haley J. VanFleteren
Represented By: Nicholas F. Wasdin
Represented By: George W. Hicks Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Adam Granich Unikowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?