Nathan Crisp v. The State of Georgia, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: SERGEANT NATHAN D. CRISP
Defendant / Appellee: THE STATE OF GEORGIA, GWINNETT COUNTY, MS. TOOLE, Gwinnett County Assistant District Attorney, TUWANDA RUSH WILLIAMS, Gwinnett County Law Office, WARREN P. DAVIS, Gwinnett County Superior Court Judge, DAVID D. PRITCHETT, Gwinnett County Law Office, KENNETH A. PARKER, Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County Judge, RICHARD ALEXANDER, Clerk of Superior Court Gwinnett County, BRITTANIE BROWNING, Assistant Attorney General Georgia, LAURIA TATE, Magistrate Court Judge, Gwinnett County, KEITH MILES, Gwinnett County Magistrate Court Judge, ELEANOR L. ROSS, United States District Judge Northern District of Georgia and DANIEL J. PORTER, Former Gwinnett County District Attorney
Case Number: 21-14190
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 23, 2022 Sergeant Nathan D. Crisp v. The State of Georgia, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Writ of Certiorari filed as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. SC# 22-750. [Entered: 02/14/2023 04:13 PM]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of receipt: MOTION for a stay of the mandate pending petition for certiorari as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN because the mandate was issued on 10/28/2022.. [Entered: 11/09/2022 03:38 PM]
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION for a stay of the mandate pending petition for certiorari filed by Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9801876-1] [Entered: 11/09/2022 03:35 PM]
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Mandate issued as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:13 AM]
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellant Nathan D. Crisp is DENIED. [9785312-1] [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:43 AM]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. [Entered: 09/12/2022 12:21 PM]
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:10 AM]
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Judgment entered as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:13 AM]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Reply Brief filed by Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. Service 03/08/2022 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Beranek, Carr, Champlin, Ludwiczak, Mendel; email - Attorney for Appellees: Taylor, U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia. [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:22 AM]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 03/04/2022 11:23 AM]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Brittanie Browning, Warren P. Davis, Daniel J. Porter and The State of Georgia. [Entered: 03/03/2022 02:41 PM]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Gwinnett County and Tuwanda Rush Williams. [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:52 PM]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Supplemental Appendix [4 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. [21-14190] (ECF: Lori Beranek) [Entered: 03/01/2022 01:38 PM]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Brittanie Browning, Warren P. Davis, Daniel J. Porter and The State of Georgia. [21-14190] (ECF: James Champlin) [Entered: 02/25/2022 10:56 AM]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:31 AM]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Gwinnett County and Tuwanda Rush Williams. [21-14190] (ECF: Elizabeth Taylor) [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:33 AM]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. [21-14190] (ECF: Lori Beranek) [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:50 PM]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Elizabeth B. Taylor for Appellees Gwinnett County and Tuwanda Rush Williams. Appellees' Brief due on 02/25/2022. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/14/2022 09:54 AM]
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Lori Beranek for Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. Appellee's Brief due on 02/25/2022 as to Appellee Eleanor L. Ross.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/13/2022 02:20 PM]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order 30-Day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney James Charles Champlin, IV for Appellees Daniel J. Porter, The State of Georgia, Warren P. Davis and Brittanie Browning. Appellee's Brief due on 02/25/2022 as to Appellees The State of Georgia, Warren P. Davis, Brittanie Browning and Daniel J. Porter.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:18 PM]
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Taylor for Appellees Gwinnett County and Tuwanda Rush Williams. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14190] (ECF: Elizabeth Taylor) [Entered: 12/28/2021 02:00 PM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Appellant's brief filed by Nathan D. Crisp. Service date: 12/24/2021 [21-14190] Attorney for Appellee: Beranek - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Carr - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Champlin - email; Attorney for Appellee: Ludwiczak - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Mendel - email; Attorney for Appellee: Taylor - email. [Entered: 12/29/2021 08:27 AM]
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 2 copies] by Party Nathan D. Crisp. Service date: 12/27/2021 email - Attorney for Appellees: Beranek, Carr, Champlin, Mendel, Taylor; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Ludwiczak. [Entered: 12/29/2021 09:24 AM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James Charles Champlin, IV for Daniel J. Porter, The State of Georgia, Warren P. Davis and Brittanie Browning. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:23 AM]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Nathan D. Crisp. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:41 AM]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth B. Taylor for Gwinnett County and Tuwanda Rush Williams. [21-14190] (ECF: Elizabeth Taylor) [Entered: 12/15/2021 01:40 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James Charles Champlin, IV for Appellees Brittanie Browning, Warren P. Davis, Daniel J. Porter and The State of Georgia. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14190] (ECF: James Champlin) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:25 AM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Charles Champlin, IV for Brittanie Browning, Warren P. Davis, Daniel J. Porter and The State of Georgia. [21-14190] (ECF: James Champlin) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:24 AM]
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabriel A. Mendel for Hon. Judge Eleanor L. Ross [21-14190] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 12/07/2021 09:17 AM]
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lori Beranek for Eleanor L. Ross. [21-14190] (ECF: Lori Beranek) [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:41 PM]
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lori Beranek for Appellee Eleanor L. Ross. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14190] (ECF: Lori Beranek) [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:58 PM]
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Nathan D. Crisp on 11/24/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/10/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/14/2021 as to Appellant Nathan D. Crisp. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/28/2021 as to Appellees Richard Alexander, Brittanie Browning, Warren Davis, Gwinnett County, Keith Miles, Kenneth A. Parker, Daniel J. Porter, David D. Pritchett, Eleanor L. Ross, Lauria Tate, The State of Georgia, Toole and Tuwanda Rush Williams [Entered: 12/03/2021 11:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nathan Crisp v. The State of Georgia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SERGEANT NATHAN D. CRISP
Represented By: Nathan D. Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: James Charles Champlin IV
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GWINNETT COUNTY
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. TOOLE, Gwinnett County Assistant District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUWANDA RUSH WILLIAMS, Gwinnett County Law Office
Represented By: Michael P. Ludwiczak
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARREN P. DAVIS, Gwinnett County Superior Court Judge
Represented By: James Charles Champlin IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID D. PRITCHETT, Gwinnett County Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH A. PARKER, Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD ALEXANDER, Clerk of Superior Court Gwinnett County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITTANIE BROWNING, Assistant Attorney General Georgia
Represented By: James Charles Champlin IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURIA TATE, Magistrate Court Judge, Gwinnett County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH MILES, Gwinnett County Magistrate Court Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELEANOR L. ROSS, United States District Judge Northern District of Georgia
Represented By: Lori Beranek
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Mendel
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL J. PORTER, Former Gwinnett County District Attorney
Represented By: James Charles Champlin IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?