Donnahue George v. Ken Griffin, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DONNAHUE GEORGE
Defendant / Appellee: KEN GRIFFIN, CITADEL SECURITIES MARKET MAKER, CITADEL CONNECT DARK POOL, CITADEL LLC HEDGE FUND, SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION, FINRA, DTCC, ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL, LLC, WEBULL FINANCIAL LLC and CFTC
Case Number: 21-14208
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David S. Mandel for FINRA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14208] (ECF: David Mandel) [Entered: 01/04/2022 03:15 PM]
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Gregory M. Boyle is GRANTED by clerk. [9566476-2] [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:13 AM]
January 3, 2022 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David Scott Mandel for FINRA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:16 PM]
December 30, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joshua Clark Webb for Appellee Robinhood Financial, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14208] (ECF: Joshua Webb) [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:24 PM]
December 30, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Derek L. Shaffer for Appellees Citadel LLC Hedge Fund, Citadel Securities Market Maker and Ken Griffin. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14208] (ECF: Derek Shaffer) [Entered: 12/30/2021 11:39 AM]
December 30, 2021 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellees' Briefs are due on 02/09/2022. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:54 PM]
December 30, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Gregory M. Boyle for Appellee DTCC. [9566476-1] [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:11 AM]
December 30, 2021 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR, WEB BASED CIP PREVIOUSLY FILED***NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Derek L. Shaffer for Ken Griffin, Citadel Securities Market Maker and Citadel LLC Hedge Fund. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b).--[Edited 01/04/2022 by BWH] [Entered: 12/30/2021 04:30 PM]
December 29, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Adam Granich Unikowsky for Appellee DTCC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14208] (ECF: Adam Unikowsky) [Entered: 12/29/2021 11:57 AM]
December 21, 2021 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Citadel LLC Hedge Fund, Citadel Securities Market Maker and Ken Griffin. Motion is Opposed. [9559934-1] [21-14208] (ECF: Derek Shaffer) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:35 PM]
December 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Granich Unikowsky for DTCC. [21-14208] (ECF: Adam Unikowsky) [Entered: 12/21/2021 12:33 PM]
December 17, 2021 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Donnahue George.***Extracted from Appellant's 12/09/2021 Brief*** [Entered: 12/17/2021 09:05 AM]
December 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua C. Webb for Robinhood Financial LLC [21-14208] (ECF: Joshua Webb) [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:23 AM]
December 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Derek L. Shaffer for Ken Griffin; Citadel Securities LLC; Citadel Enterprise Americas LLC (formerly Citadel LLC) [21-14208] (ECF: Derek Shaffer) [Entered: 12/16/2021 02:35 PM]
December 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Scott Mandel for FINRA. [21-14208] (ECF: David Mandel) [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:58 AM]
December 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Sternberg for Citadel LLC Hedge Fund, Citadel Securities Market Maker and Ken Griffin. [21-14208] (ECF: Jason Sternberg) [Entered: 12/16/2021 03:05 PM]
December 13, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Donnahue George. [Entered: 12/15/2021 11:58 AM]
December 9, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by Donnahue George. [21-14208] (ECF: Donnahue George) [Entered: 12/09/2021 01:21 PM]
December 9, 2021 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Party Donnahue George. Service date: 12/09/2021 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Carlson, Danon, Mandel, Membiela, Ryan, Smachetti, Sternberg, Unikowsky. [Entered: 12/15/2021 11:56 AM]
December 3, 2021 Appellate fee was paid on 12/02/2021 as to Appellant Donnahue George. [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:13 PM]
December 2, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Donnahue George on 12/02/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/11/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/16/2021 as to Appellant Donnahue George. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/30/2021 as to Appellees DTCC, FINRA, Ken Griffin, Robinhood Financial, LLC and Securities Exchange Commission [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donnahue George v. Ken Griffin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONNAHUE GEORGE
Represented By: Donnahue George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEN GRIFFIN
Represented By: Jason Sternberg
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITADEL SECURITIES MARKET MAKER
Represented By: Jason Sternberg
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITADEL CONNECT DARK POOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITADEL LLC HEDGE FUND
Represented By: Jason Sternberg
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECURITIES EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Emily M. Smachetti
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FINRA
Represented By: David Scott Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DTCC
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Represented By: Curtis David Carlson
Represented By: Adam Granich Unikowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Represented By: Samuel Danon
Represented By: Gustavo J. Membiela
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Brittany L. Sukiennik
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEBULL FINANCIAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CFTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?