State of Georgia, et al v. President of the United States, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF ALABAMA, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF IDAHO, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM OF GEORGIA, COMMISSIONER OF THE GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND INDUSTRIES, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF REHABILITATION SERVICES, IDAHO STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION and ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT AND CO-CHAIR SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, ACTING DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET AND MEMBER OF THE SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, ADMINISTRATOR, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION AND CO-CHAIR OF SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE, CO-CHAIR OF SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE AND COVID-19 RESPONSE COORDINATOR, DIRECTOR, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, DIRECTOR, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, ADMINISTRATOR, FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, DIRECTOR, CENTER FOR DISEASE CONTROL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, DIRECTOR, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, DIRECTOR, NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, ADMINISTRATOR, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, DIRECTOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY and SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGY, ASTHMA & IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CHEST PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF MEDICAL GENETICS AND GENOMICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, AMERICAN THORACIS SOCIETY and SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE and AMERICAN PSYCHIATRICS INSTITUTE
Case Number: 21-14269
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Friday, 04/08/2022 Argument Location: Atlanta. [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:27 PM]
January 20, 2022 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. 2 VOLUMES - 4 COPIES [Entered: 01/24/2022 10:41 AM]
January 19, 2022 Appendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. [21-14269] (ECF: Daniel Winik) [Entered: 01/19/2022 03:56 PM]
January 19, 2022 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:32 AM]
January 18, 2022 Appellant's brief filed by Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:43 PM]
January 12, 2022 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Dayton P. Reed for Appellees State of Idaho, Governor of the State of Idaho and Idaho State Board of Education. [9573388-1] [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:50 PM]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Dayton P. Reed is GRANTED by clerk. [9573388-2] [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:51 PM]
January 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dayton P. Reed for Governor of the State of Idaho, Idaho State Board of Education and State of Idaho. [21-14269] (ECF: Dayton Reed) [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:26 PM]
January 4, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen John Petrany for Appellees Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14269] (ECF: Stephen Petrany) [Entered: 01/04/2022 03:31 PM]
December 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David Peters for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, United States Office of Personnel Management, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Defense, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, President of the United States, National Institutes of Health, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Office of Management and Budget, Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, General Services Administration, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, United States Secret Service, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, National Institute of Health, National Science Foundation, Director, National Science Foundation, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Director, Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Energy and Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/29/2021 08:51 AM]
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: On December 17 and 21, 2021, the Court expedited briefing and oral argument for this case. The government has moved to further expedite the briefing and oral argument schedule. After a thorough review, the governments motion is DENIED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION [ # 9560390-2 ] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/29/2021 01:49 PM]
December 28, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Patrick Kane for State of Idaho [21-14269] (ECF: Brian Kane) [Entered: 12/28/2021 12:56 PM]
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: No Judge in regular active service on the Court having requested that the Court be polled on hearing en banc, the Petition for Hearing En Banc is DENIED. See FRAP 35. [ # 9551569-2 ] WHP, CRW, AJ, RSR, JP, KCN, ELB, BCG, RJL, BL and ALB [Entered: 12/28/2021 05:06 PM]
December 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas T. Hydrick for State of South Carolina. [21-14269] (ECF: Thomas Hydrick) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:23 AM]
December 23, 2021 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Peters for Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:41 AM]
December 23, 2021 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Peters for Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:43 AM]
December 23, 2021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David Peters for Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 12/23/2021 01:16 PM]
December 22, 2021 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by William Scott Zanzig for State of Idaho, Governor of the State of Idaho and Idaho State Board of Education. Document Not Complete. Appearance of Counsel form must list all parties represented. Counsel must file a corrected Appearance of Counsel form within 3-days of this notice. [Entered: 12/22/2021 10:24 AM]
December 22, 2021 MOTION to expedite oral argument filed by Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. Motion is Unopposed. [9560390-1] [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:06 PM]
December 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Scott Zanzig for Governor of the State of Idaho, Idaho State Board of Education and State of Idaho. [21-14269] (ECF: William Zanzig) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:31 PM]
December 21, 2021 Assigned to tentative calendar number 15 in Atlanta during the week of April 4, 2022. [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:06 PM]
December 21, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney William Scott Zanzig for Appellees State of Idaho, Governor of the State of Idaho and Idaho State Board of Education. [9559744-1] [Entered: 12/21/2021 04:23 PM]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by William Scott Zanzig is GRANTED. (CK) [9559744-2] [Entered: 12/21/2021 04:25 PM]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: "The Court hereby amends the briefing schedule set forth in its December 17, 2021 order as follows: The government must file its initial brief no later than January 18, 2022. The plaintiffs and intervenors must file their answer briefs no later than February 8, 2022. And any reply brief must be filed no later than February 22, 2022." CRW, BCG and RJL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/21/2021 05:56 PM]
December 21, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Scott Zanzig for Governor of the State of Idaho, Idaho State Board of Education and State of Idaho. [21-14269] (ECF: William Zanzig) [Entered: 12/21/2021 06:26 PM]
December 20, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Winik for Federal Defendants [21-14269] (ECF: Daniel Winik) [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:25 AM]
December 17, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Allergy, Asthma & Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Medical Genetics and Genomics, American College of Physicians, American Geriatrics Society, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society for Clinical Pathology, American Society of Hematology, American Thoracis Society and Society of Interventional Radiology. [Entered: 12/20/2021 03:06 PM]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court DENY the motion for stay because the government has not established one of "the most critical" factors-- that it will be irreparably injured absent a stay. The Court also expedite the government's appeal of the district court's preliminary injunction and set the case for the next available oral argument. The government must file its initial brief no later than January 3, 2022. The plaintiffs and intervenors must file their answer briefs no later than January 17, 2022. And any reply brief must be filed no later than January 24, 2022. [ # 9551506-2 ] CRW, BCG and RJL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/17/2021 05:25 PM]
December 16, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa Holyoak for State of Utah. [21-14269] (ECF: Melissa Holyoak) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:03 AM]
December 16, 2021 Reply to response filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. [21-14269] (ECF: Joshua Revesz) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:44 PM]
December 15, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management [ # 9551506-2 ] filed by Attorney Harold D. Melton for Appellees Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. [21-14269] (ECF: Harold Melton) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:33 PM]
December 15, 2021 RESPONSE to Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management [ # 9551506-2 ] filed by Attorney James Larry Stine for Appellee Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. [21-14269] (ECF: James Stine) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:21 PM]
December 15, 2021 Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Allergy, Asthma & Immunology, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Medical Genetics and Genomics, American College of Physicians, American Geriatrics Society, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society for Clinical Pathology, American Society of Hematology, American Thoracis Society and Society of Interventional Radiology. Service date: 12/14/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Caplan, Dubner, Fried, Kintz, Morton; Attorney for Appellants: Josephson, Mohan, Patrick, Revesz, U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia; Attorney for Appellees: Holyoak, Jennings, LaCour, Lambert, Melton, Parker, Peeler, Petrany, See, Smith, Stine, Tseytlin, Waldbeser, Wilson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Andrapalliyal; Attorney for Appellees: Dunbar, Hydrick, Laue, Limehouse, Shedd, Zanzig [Entered: 12/15/2021 03:00 PM]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to file Brief as Amici Curiae in support of Defendants-Appellants' Motion for Stay of the District Court's December 7, 2021 Order Pending Appeal is GRANTED. [ # 9553962-2 ]. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/15/2021 02:37 PM]
December 15, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Peters for Federal Defendants [21-14269] (ECF: David Peters) [Entered: 12/15/2021 06:54 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey B. Dubner for Amici, American Medical Association and fourteen other organizations Jeffrey B. Dubner for Service. [21-14269] (ECF: Jeffrey Dubner) [Entered: 12/14/2021 06:26 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Caplan for Amici Curiae American Medical Association, et al. [21-14269] (ECF: Michael Caplan) [Entered: 12/14/2021 04:37 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Emory Smith, Jr. for State of South Carolina. [21-14269] (ECF: James Smith) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:53 AM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica Anne Morton for Amici, American Medical Association and fourteen other organizations. Jessica Morton for Service. [21-14269] (ECF: Jessica Morton) [Entered: 12/14/2021 06:29 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Glenn Parker, Jr. for Governor of the State of Alabama. [21-14269] (ECF: William Parker) [Entered: 12/14/2021 03:37 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by JoAnn L. Kintz for Amici, American Medical Association and fourteen other organizations. [21-14269] (ECF: JoAnn Kintz) [Entered: 12/14/2021 06:36 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Caplan for Amici Curiae American Medical Association, et al. [21-14269] (ECF: Michael Caplan) [Entered: 12/14/2021 09:08 PM]
December 14, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel L. Fried for Amici, American Medical Association and fourteen other organizations. Rachel L. Fried for Service. [21-14269] (ECF: Rachel Fried) [Entered: 12/14/2021 06:31 PM]
December 14, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Michael A. Caplan for Amici Curiae American Medical Association, et al.. [9553962-1] [21-14269] (ECF: Michael Caplan) [Entered: 12/14/2021 09:12 PM]
December 13, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anna Mohan for Federal Defendants [21-14269] (ECF: Anna Mohan) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:14 PM]
December 13, 2021 Appellants wishing to file a reply in support of their motion for a stay pending appeal must do so by Thursday, December 16, 2021. [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:56 PM]
December 10, 2021 MOTION to stay pending appeal filed by Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary, U.S. of Commerce, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management. Motion is Opposed. [9551506-1] [21-14269] (ECF: Joshua Revesz) [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:48 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Harold D. Melton for Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. [21-14269] (ECF: Harold Melton) [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:58 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles E. Peeler for Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia, and State of Georgia. [21-14269]--[Edited 12/13/2021 by CB] (ECF: Charles Peeler) [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:06 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Revesz for Federal Defendants [21-14269] (ECF: Joshua Revesz) [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:51 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Drew Waldbeser for Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. [21-14269] (ECF: Drew Waldbeser) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:50 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Larry Stine for Associated Builders & Contractors Inc. James Larry Stine for Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. [21-14269] (ECF: James Stine) [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:46 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kathleen J. Jennings for Associated Builders & Contractors, Inc. Kathleen J. Jennings for Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. [21-14269] (ECF: Kathleen Jennings) [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:53 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Misha Tseytlin for Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. [21-14269] (ECF: Misha Tseytlin) [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:08 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr. for Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services, Governor of the State of Alabama and State of Alabama. [21-14269] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:30 PM]
December 10, 2021 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for initial hearing en banc filed by Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9551569-1] [21-14269] (ECF: Harold Melton) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:02 PM]
December 10, 2021 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture, Governor of the State of Georgia and State of Georgia. [21-14269] (ECF: Harold Melton) [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:07 PM]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellees are directed to file a response to Appellants Motion for Stay by Wednesday, December 15, 2021. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/10/2021 08:32 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen J. Petrany for State of Georgia, Governor of Georgia, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, and Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Agriculture [21-14269] (ECF: Stephen Petrany) [Entered: 12/10/2021 07:20 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Alexander Wilson for Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services and State of Alabama. [21-14269] (ECF: Thomas Wilson) [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:31 PM]
December 10, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Grayson Lambert for Governor of the State of South Carolina. [21-14269] (ECF: William Lambert) [Entered: 12/10/2021 06:29 PM]
December 10, 2021 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Administrator, General Services Administration and Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Co-chair of Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Department of Defense, Director, Center for Disease Control, Director, Department of Transportation, Director, Federal Protective Service, Director, National Institute of Health, Director, National Science Foundation, Director, Office of Personnel Management and Co-Chair Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Director, United States Secret Service, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Office of Management and Budget, President of the United States, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Secretary, Department of Defense, Secretary, U.S. Department of Energy, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary, U.S. of Commerce, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Office of Personnel Management on 12/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/27/2021 as to Appellant Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget and member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/07/2022 as to Appellees [Entered: 12/10/2021 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Georgia, et al v. President of the United States, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Harold D. Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Drew Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: William Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Brian Patrick Kane
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Brant M. Laue
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: James Emory Smith Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Thomas T. Hydrick
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Melissa Holyoak
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Lindsay S. See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Harold D. Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Drew Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: William Glenn Parker Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: William Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Thomas A. Limehouse Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Michael G. Shedd
Represented By: Thomas Ashley Limehouse Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Harold D. Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Drew Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMISSIONER OF THE GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Harold D. Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Drew Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND INDUSTRIES
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF REHABILITATION SERVICES
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IDAHO STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: William Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC.
Represented By: Kathleen J. Jennings
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT AND CO-CHAIR SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ACTING DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET AND MEMBER OF THE SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ADMINISTRATOR, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION AND CO-CHAIR OF SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CO-CHAIR OF SAFER FEDERAL WORKFORCE TASK FORCE AND COVID-19 RESPONSE COORDINATOR
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ADMINISTRATOR, FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, CENTER FOR DISEASE CONTROL
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, NATIONAL SCIENCE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ADMINISTRATOR, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIRECTOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGY, ASTHMA & IMMUNOLOGY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CHEST PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF MEDICAL GENETICS AND GENOMICS
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN GERIATRICS SOCIETY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL PATHOLOGY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN THORACIS SOCIETY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Jarred Alexander Klorfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AMERICAN PSYCHIATRICS INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?