Aldaress Carter v. The City of Montgomery, et al
Petitioner: ALDARESS CARTER
Respondent: BRANCH D. KLOESS, JUDICIAL CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. and THE CITY OF MONTGOMERY
Not Classified By Court: PUBLIC GOOD LAW CENTER, SUZETTE MALVEAUX, MYRIAM GILLES, DEBORAH ARCHER, HEATHER ELLIOTT, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, CIVIL RIGHTS CORPS and ADAM N. STEINMAN
Case Number: 21-90002
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Alexandra Jordan for Amici Curiae the Southern Poverty Law Center, Civil Rights Corps, Public Good Law Center, Deborah Archer, Myriam Gilles, Heather Elliott, Suzette Malveaux, and Adam N. Steinman. [9282952-1] [21-90002] (ECF: Alexandra Jordan) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:19 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Jordan for Amici Curiae the Southern Poverty Law Center, Civil Rights Corps, Public Good Law Center, Deborah Archer, Myriam Gilles, Heather Elliott, Suzette Malveaux, and Adam N. Steinman [21-90002] (ECF: Alexandra Jordan) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:13 PM]
January 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Holliday for The City of Montgomery Shannon L. Holliday for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:21 PM]
January 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Gill for The City of Montgomery Richard Hamilton Gill for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Richard Gill) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:14 PM]
January 12, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert D. Segall for The City of Montgomery. [21-90002] (ECF: Robert Segall) [Entered: 01/12/2021 01:48 PM]
January 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Leslie Andrea Bailey for Aldaress Carter. [21-90002] (ECF: Leslie Bailey) [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:25 PM]
January 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correction Services Larry Logsdon for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Larry Logsdon) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:57 AM]
January 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. Jackson for Judicial Correction Services Michael Leon Jackson for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Michael Jackson) [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:52 AM]
January 11, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correction Services Wilson Franklin Green for Judicial Correctional Services, Inc.. [21-90002] (ECF: Wilson Green) [Entered: 01/10/2021 06:45 PM]
January 11, 2021 Notice of inability to comply with the paper copy requirement due to COVID-19 filed by Attorney George Daniel Evans for Petitioner Aldaress Carter. Paper copies will be submitted at a future date established by the Court. [21-90002] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 01/09/2021 05:00 PM]
January 8, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Daniel Evans for Aldaress Carter. [21-90002] (ECF: George Evans) [Entered: 01/08/2021 05:48 PM]
January 6, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE DOCKETED. Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 23(f) filed by Petitioner Aldaress Carter. Served 01/06/2021 email - Attorney for Respondents: Brymer, Fehl, Gill, Green, Holliday, Jackson, Logsdon, Segall; US mail - Attorney for Respondents: Griffith, Jackson, Winborn. [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aldaress Carter v. The City of Montgomery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRANCH D. KLOESS
Represented By: Micheal Stewart Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JUDICIAL CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Griffith
Represented By: Wesley Kyle Winborn
Represented By: Wilson Franklin Green
Represented By: Larry Logsdon
Represented By: Michael Leon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE CITY OF MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Kimberly Owen Fehl
Represented By: Shannon L. Holliday
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Robert D. Segall
Represented By: Michael David Brymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PUBLIC GOOD LAW CENTER
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SUZETTE MALVEAUX
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MYRIAM GILLES
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEBORAH ARCHER
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: HEATHER ELLIOTT
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CIVIL RIGHTS CORPS
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADAM N. STEINMAN
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALDARESS CARTER
Represented By: George Daniel Evans
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Leslie Andrea Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?