USA v. Edward Walker
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: EDWARD WALKER
Case Number: 22-10164
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott I. Dion for USA [22-10164] (ECF: Scott Dion) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:08 PM]
January 20, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew L. Adler for Appellant Edward Walker. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10164] (ECF: Andrew Adler) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:42 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Caruso for Edward Walker. [22-10164] (ECF: Andrew Adler) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:37 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew L. Adler for Edward Walker. [22-10164] (ECF: Andrew Adler) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:36 PM]
January 19, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa Tobin Rubio for USA [22-10164] (ECF: Lisa Rubio) [Entered: 01/19/2022 10:33 AM]
January 14, 2022 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Edward Walker on 01/13/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Edward Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lisa Tobin Rubio
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWARD WALKER
Represented By: Andrew L. Adler
Represented By: Michael Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?