Center for a Sustainable Coast, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CENTER FOR A SUSTAINABLE COAST and KAREN GRAINEY
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEER, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Savannah District
Case Number: 22-11079
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Debbie Gilbert, Filer: Center for a Sustainable Coast, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/11/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/26/2021. [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:44 PM]
May 5, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/05/2022 03:33 PM]
May 3, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. Appellants' brief is due on 06/22/2022. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/03/2022 04:45 PM]
April 21, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11079] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 04/21/2022 02:30 PM]
April 21, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. [22-11079] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 04/21/2022 02:29 PM]
April 14, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael Thomas Gray for Appellees District Commander and District Engineer and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11079] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:27 AM]
April 12, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael T. Gray for United States Army Corps of Engineers; United States Park Service; SUPERINTENDENT, Cumberland Island National Seashore, DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEER, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Savannah District [22-11079] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:54 PM]
April 11, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jon L. Schwartz for Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. [22-11079] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:54 AM]
April 11, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jon L. Schwartz for Appellants Center for a Sustainable Coast and Karen Grainey. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-11079] (ECF: Jon Schwartz) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:55 AM]
April 11, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Center for a Sustainable Coast, Court Reporter: Debbie Gilbert, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/26/2021. [Entered: 04/11/2022 12:26 PM]
April 1, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Center for a Sustainable Coast on 03/28/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/21/2022 as to Appellant Center for a Sustainable Coast. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/05/2022 as to Appellees.--[Edited 04/08/2022 by JDB to update docket text] [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Center for a Sustainable Coast, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CENTER FOR A SUSTAINABLE COAST
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson IV
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN GRAINEY
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson IV
Represented By: Jon L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Patrick James Schwedler
Represented By: Amanda Stoner
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT COMMANDER AND DISTRICT ENGINEER, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Savannah District
Represented By: Patrick James Schwedler
Represented By: Amanda Stoner
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Georgia
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?